HANCOCK WHITNEY BANK v. DANCOR CONSTRUCTION INC et al
Plaintiff: HANCOCK WHITNEY BANK
Defendant: DANCOR, LLC, Deborah Policicchio, Daniel J. Policicchio, Sr., DANCOR CONSTRUCTION, INC, DANCOR CONSTRUCTION INC, DANIEL J POLICICCHIO, SR and DANCOR LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00451
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: CHARLES J KAHN
2 Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #24 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (sdw)
May 30, 2019 Filing 24 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (RUSHING, ROBERT)
May 30, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #18 Scheduling Order. (joint report not filed) (sdw)
May 14, 2019 Filing 23 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Initial Disclosures by DANCOR CONSTRUCTION INC, DANCOR LLC, DANIEL J POLICICCHIO, SR, DEBORAH POLICICCHIO. (WILSON, PAUL) Modified on 5/15/2019 to correct title of document(alb).
May 1, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY by HANCOCK WHITNEY BANK re #17 Answer to Complaint by HANCOCK WHITNEY BANK. (MOROCK, TRAVIS)
April 29, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by HANCOCK WHITNEY BANK identifying Corporate Parent Hancock Whitney Corporation for HANCOCK WHITNEY BANK.. (MOROCK, TRAVIS)
April 22, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by DANCOR CONSTRUCTION INC. (WILSON, PAUL)
April 22, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by DANCOR LLC. (WILSON, PAUL)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 4/29/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/29/2019. Discovery due by 10/15/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/15/2019. (alb)
April 12, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #17 Answer to Complaint. (See proposed ISO.) (alb)
April 12, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by DANCOR CONSTRUCTION INC, DANCOR LLC, DANIEL J POLICICCHIO, SR, DEBORAH POLICICCHIO. (WILSON, PAUL)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #13 MOTION to Extend Time until 4/12/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/1/2019. (alb)
April 1, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #13 MOTION to Extend Time, #14 Stipulation For Extension of Time. (alb)
April 1, 2019 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgment filed by DANIEL J POLICICCHIO, SR, DEBORAH POLICICCHIO. (WILSON, PAUL)
April 1, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION by DANCOR CONSTRUCTION INC. (WILSON, PAUL)
April 1, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Extend Time by DANCOR CONSTRUCTION INC. (WILSON, PAUL)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #10 MOTION for Extension of Time. Response to Complaint due 4/12/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/29/2019. (alb)
March 29, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #10 MOTION to Extend Time, #11 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. (alb)
March 28, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION re #10 MOTION to Extend Time by DANCOR CONSTRUCTION INC, DANCOR LLC, DANIEL J POLICICCHIO, SR, DEBORAH POLICICCHIO. (WILSON, PAUL)
March 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Extend Time by DANCOR CONSTRUCTION INC, DANCOR LLC, DANIEL J POLICICCHIO, SR, DEBORAH POLICICCHIO. (WILSON, PAUL)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 3/1/2019. (erl)**Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 3:19cv451-MCR/HTC.
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to DANCOR CONSTRUCTION INC, #1 DANCOR LLC, #2 DANIEL J POLICICCHIO, SR, #3 DEBORAH POLICICCHIO. (djb)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties named in the referenced documents were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. For future reference: All Party names (including Alias, Corporate parents, party text) are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or Chapter IV of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide" (both availableon the clerk's website). (djb)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Proposed Summons for Deborah Policicchio by HANCOCK WHITNEY BANK (RUSHING, ROBERT)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Proposed Summons for Daniel Policicchio by HANCOCK WHITNEY BANK (RUSHING, ROBERT)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Proposed Summons for Dancor LLC by HANCOCK WHITNEY BANK (RUSHING, ROBERT)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Proposed Summons for Dancor Construction by HANCOCK WHITNEY BANK (RUSHING, ROBERT)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4415614.), filed by HANCOCK WHITNEY BANK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Errata Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Errata Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Supplement Exhibit K-1, #13 Supplement Exhibit L) (RUSHING, ROBERT)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (RUSHING, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HANCOCK WHITNEY BANK v. DANCOR CONSTRUCTION INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANCOR, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Policicchio
Represented By: PAUL ALAN WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel J. Policicchio, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANCOR CONSTRUCTION, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANCOR CONSTRUCTION INC
Represented By: PAUL ALAN WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL J POLICICCHIO, SR
Represented By: PAUL ALAN WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANCOR LLC
Represented By: PAUL ALAN WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HANCOCK WHITNEY BANK
Represented By: ROBERT STERLING RUSHING
Represented By: TRAVIS MICHAEL MOROCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?