UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v $16,790.00 in UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $16,790.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Respondent: JAMIE CALDWELL
Case Number: 3:2019cv00510
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: ROGER VINSON
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER STAYING CASE until further order of the court. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 4/26/2019. (alb)
April 19, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re: #6 MOTION to Stay. (alb)
April 4, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 4/18/2019). (alb)
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (SMITH, COREY)
April 4, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re: #4 Answer to Complaint, #5 Response. (alb)
April 3, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE by JAMIE CALDWELL re #1 Complaint Statement of Interest. (DEWRELL, JOE)
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 Respondent's ANSWER to #1 Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem by JAMIE CALDWELL. (DEWRELL, JOE)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SMITH, COREY)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM) against $16,790 IN US CURRENCY, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit in Support of Civil Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem) (SMITH, COREY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v $16,790.00 in UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $16,790.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: COREY J SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JAMIE CALDWELL
Represented By: JOE LADON DEWRELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?