UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BLACKMAN COMMUNITY WATER SYSTEM, INC.
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: BLACKMAN COMMUNITY WATER SYSTEM, INC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00518
Filed: March 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to BLACKMAN COMMUNITY WATER SYSTEM, INC. (sdw)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to Blackman Community Water System, Inc.. (LINDSEY, HERBERT)
April 5, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. BLACKMAN COMMUNITY WATER SYSTEM, INC. waiver sent on 4/2/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (LINDSEY, HERBERT)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Ex Parte Motion to Appoint Receiver. ORDERED that the National Rural Water Association ("NRWA") is appointed receiver of the Blackman Community Water System, Inc. ("Blackman") and the subject premises. ORDERED that the government serve this order and the government's application for appointment of a receiver upon the defendant. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/27/2019. (sdw)
March 26, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #3 Ex Parte MOTION to Appoint Receiver , #4 Memorandum in Support. (sdw)
March 26, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 Ex Parte MOTION to Appoint Receiver by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Rcvr Acceptance) (LINDSEY, HERBERT)
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 Ex Parte MOTION to Appoint Receiver by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (LINDSEY, HERBERT)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (LINDSEY, HERBERT)
March 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Foreclosure Mortgage and Repossession of Chattels against BLACKMAN COMMUNITY WATER SYSTEM, INC., filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mortgage, #2 Exhibit B - Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit C - Loan Resolution & Security Agmt., #4 Exhibit D - UCC filing, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Acceleration) (LINDSEY, HERBERT) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/26/2019) (sdw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BLACKMAN COMMUNITY WATER SYSTEM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLACKMAN COMMUNITY WATER SYSTEM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: HERBERT STANLEY LINDSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?