CZABAN v. BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC
Plaintiff: Radoslaw Czaban
Defendant: BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00591
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #17 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 7/22/2019). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/8/2019. (alb)
July 5, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #17 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (alb)
July 5, 2019 Filing 17 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by RADOSLAW CZABAN. (GINGO, GEORGE)
June 24, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings re #16 Motion to Dismiss. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 7/8/2019). (alb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4 Part I, #5 Exhibit 4 Part II, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7 Part I, #9 Exhibit 7 Part II, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9 Part I, #12 Exhibit 9 Part II) (EVANS, DALE)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #14 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC answer due 6/24/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 6/14/2019. (alb)
June 14, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #14 Consent MOTION to Extend Timeto Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (alb)
June 14, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION to Extend Timeto Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC. (EVANS, DALE)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL, Re: #12 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Pursuant to the parties proposal, the parties will commence discovery in time for it to be completed on or before 1/2/2020. The Court accepts the parties' proposal and establishes 2/1/2020 as the deadline for filing potentially dispositive motions as well as Daubert motions. Mediation in this case must be completed on or before 1/30/2020. Mediation Report due by 2/13/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/29/2019. (alb) Modified on 6/6/2019 to correct typo error(alb).
May 10, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #12 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (alb)
May 10, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (COPUS, JENNIFER)
May 7, 2019 Filing 11 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #10 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PERSONS AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. The referenced document has been filed incorrectly. For future reference to insure the accuracy of the docket and proper reporting, the document should be posted using the correct event located under >Civil Other>Other Documents> Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons. There is no need to refile this document. (alb)
May 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PERSONS AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RADOSLAW CZABAN (COPUS, JENNIFER)
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTIONS by RADOSLAW CZABAN (COPUS, JENNIFER)
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC identifying Corporate Parent Bayview Asset Management, LLC for BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC.. (EVANS, DALE)
April 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by DALE A EVANS, JR on behalf of BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC (EVANS, DALE)
April 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by BRENDAN IAN HERBERT on behalf of BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC (HERBERT, BRENDAN)
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Radoslaw Czaban. BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC waiver sent on 4/18/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (GINGO, GEORGE)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC. (alb)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (alb)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE MICHAEL GINGO on behalf of Radoslaw Czaban (GINGO, GEORGE)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Against Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC against Radoslaw Czaban ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4458048.), filed by Radoslaw Czaban. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Composite Exhibit A Pages 1-44, #2 Exhibit Composite Exhibit A Pages 45-84, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons) (COPUS, JENNIFER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CZABAN v. BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Radoslaw Czaban
Represented By: JENNIFER HANSON COPUS
Represented By: GEORGE MICHAEL GINGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC
Represented By: DALE A EVANS, JR
Represented By: BRENDAN IAN HERBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?