TAUNTON v 3M COMPANY

Plaintiff: Mr. TRAVIS TAUNTON
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2019cv00658
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 7:19-cv-00050. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 15, 2019 Filing 15 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER - This case is transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of Florida for the reasons stated in the order of April 3, 2019, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable M. Casey Rodgers. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Stay lifted on 4/15/2019.) (Sellers, N.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 14 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Travis Taunton served on 3M Company on March 25, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Delivery Notification) (Bagley, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Stay. This matter shall be stayed until a final determination by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation regarding whether this action, and numerous other related actions, should be consolidated pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 3/19/2019. (Sellers, N.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #8 Consent MOTION to Stay. (Sellers, N.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to 3M Company. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Sellers, N.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.]
March 18, 2019 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge James C. Dever III for all further proceedings. United States District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan is no longer assigned to the case. All future filings shall reflect the revised case number of 7:19-CV-50-D. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/18/2019. (Hockaday, A.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher R. Bagley on behalf of Travis Taunton. (Bagley, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew S. DeAntonio on behalf of 3M Company. (DeAntonio, Matthew) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support regarding #8 Consent MOTION to Stay filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Schedule of Related Actions) (Lendino, Timothy) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Stay filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Lendino, Timothy) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by 3M Company (Lendino, Timothy) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Timothy Patrick Lendino on behalf of 3M Company. (Lendino, Timothy) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Related Filings filed by Travis Taunton . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Interested Party Response in MDL No. 2885, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Motion to Transfer in MDL No. 2885) (Bagley, Christopher) Modified on 3/18/2019 - changed docket text to correctly identify the document attached. (Sellers, N.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Gary W. Jackson on behalf of Travis Taunton. (Jackson, Gary) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Hoyt G. Tessener on behalf of Travis Taunton. (Tessener, Hoyt) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Travis Taunton (Bagley, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 3M Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4863764.), filed by Travis Taunton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Bagley, Christopher) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 4/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TAUNTON v 3M COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. TRAVIS TAUNTON
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER R BAGLEY
Represented By: GARY W JACKSON
Represented By: HOYT G. TESSENER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: MATTHEW S. DEANTONIO
Represented By: TIMOTHY P LENDINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?