WOMBACHER v 3M COMPANY et al

Plaintiff: ANDREW WOMBACHER
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC and 3M COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2019cv00666
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-01430. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order of MDL Transfer to District of Florida Northern. MDL case number is 2885. Electronic file sent. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(ajn) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/16/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2885. (ajn) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/16/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/16/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against 3M Company, Aearo Technologies, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7431557) filed by Andrew Wombacher. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Richard Lee Root added to party ANDREW WOMBACHER(pty:selreq).(Root, Richard) Modified text on 2/19/2019 (ajn). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WOMBACHER v 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW WOMBACHER
Represented By: RICHARD L ROOT
Represented By: BETSY J. BARNES
Represented By: JOHN C. ENOCHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?