MILSTEAD v 3M COMPANY

Plaintiff: PATRICK R. MILSTEAD
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2019cv00682
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:19-cv-00325. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred to District of Northern District of Florida. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Northern District of Florida*. (Attachments: #1 MDL 2885 CTO-1) (jdt) [Transferred from California Southern on 4/16/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Patrick R. Milstead, as to 3M Company. (Akselrud, Michael) (rmc). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/16/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jrm) (jao). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/16/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against 3M Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12203367.), filed by Patrick R. Milstead. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-325-MMA-MDD. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case. (Akselrud, Michael)(jrm) (jao). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MILSTEAD v 3M COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK R. MILSTEAD
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?