ANDERSON et al v. 3M COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: FRANK JAMES, MATTHEW SNYDER, ANTHONY PARENTE, ROBERT ROBISON, CLIFFORD HEART, DAVID CYPHERS, DANIEL MENARD, JOE WHITNEY, ALTON BRENT, PATRICK ELLSWORTH, JOE SCHMITT, BENJAMIN STOVIC, TIMOTHY OVERSTREET, ERIC FOURNIER, ALBERT SALAZAR, BENJAMIN SHEFFIELD, JAMES MCDANIEL, MASON SIMS, BRANDON SAMPSON, FERNANDO BERRIOS, MICHAEL BURNETT, LUTHER ANDERSON, DEMARCO BELL, TYLER THOMAS, MATTHEW MULREY, SCOTT RIFE, BRIAN WEBB, KEVIN ERVINE, MICHAEL DAVIS, BRIAN STEPHEY, RANDY SALINA, JOHN SMARTT and JERROD SHARP
Defendant: 3M COMPANY and AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00864
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-00575. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 19, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO- 3) from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation; transferring case to the Northern District of Florida for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rogers. Associated Cases: 0:19-cv-00569-JRT-KMM et al.(JME) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/22/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. Case reassigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim and Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez for all further proceedings. Judge Eric C. Tostrud, Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-575 JRT/KMM. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim, Judge Patrick J. Schiltz, Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 3/12/2019. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 3/13/2019. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright 3/15/2019. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 3/19/2019.(MMG) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/22/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/22/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Aearo Technologies, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/22/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19cv575 ECT/TNL. (AKL) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/22/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Richard M. Paul III, Ashlea G. Schwarz, Laura C. Fellows as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (AKL) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/22/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL by 3M Company. Jointly Signed by Plaintiffs Luther Anderson, et al. and Aearo Technologies LLC. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/22/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal,, (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/22/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/22/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County, case number 27-cv-19-2017 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6718437) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Affidavit of Service Affidvit of Service on Aearo Technologies, LLC, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit(s) Notice of Judicial Assignment, #5 Exhibit(s) Order Companion Cases, #6 Exhibit(s) Letter to Court, #7 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/22/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ANDERSON et al v. 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK JAMES
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW SNYDER
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY PARENTE
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT ROBISON
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLIFFORD HEART
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID CYPHERS
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL MENARD
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOE WHITNEY
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALTON BRENT
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK ELLSWORTH
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOE SCHMITT
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENJAMIN STOVIC
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY OVERSTREET
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC FOURNIER
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBERT SALAZAR
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENJAMIN SHEFFIELD
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES MCDANIEL
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MASON SIMS
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON SAMPSON
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FERNANDO BERRIOS
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL BURNETT
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUTHER ANDERSON
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEMARCO BELL
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYLER THOMAS
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW MULREY
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT RIFE
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN WEBB
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN ERVINE
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL DAVIS
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN STEPHEY
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDY SALINA
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN SMARTT
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERROD SHARP
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: BENJAMIN W HULSE
Represented By: JERRY W BLACKWELL
Represented By: S Jamal Faleel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?