AGUILAR v 3M COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL BROOKS, FRANK JAMES, KENNETH DAVIS, GARY WILLIAMS, JIMMIE CLAY, JASON WEBB, HENRY RAMIREZ, JOHN MOORE, JOSHUA PHELPS, CHARLES BAUMBACH, ANTHONY WATERS, JOHN MAULDIN, MORRIS RICHARDSON, LONNIE SORRELL, PAUL AGUILAR, FRANK SOUTHER, SHENNY SOLIS, JONATHAN CORWIN, LUCAS BARKER, KENDALL WHITFIELD, WILBERT RICHARDSON, RICHARD WOODRUFF, ROBERT BROCK, RICKY DETLEFSEN, PATRICK PHELAN, FRANK KEATING, ORLANDO PACHECO, BRANDON MILLER, HAROLD HAGOOD, BRIAN KOCEJA, JONATHON HAMILTON, JAMES GILBERT, ERIK JORGENSEN, DUSTIN SMITH, DERRICK SMOOT, JOSHUA PRITT, ADRIAN CHAVEZ, CHRISTOPHER MOORE, WILLIAM THOMPSON, JASON BLAIN, CARL DEUEL, BRAD MORA, BRANDON SIBLEY and JACK KECK
Defendant: 3M COMPANY and AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00891
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by ASHLEA SCHWARZ on behalf of PAUL AGUILAR (SCHWARZ, ASHLEA)
April 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD M PAUL, III on behalf of PAUL AGUILAR (PAUL, RICHARD)
April 22, 2019 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-00468. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 17, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO- 3) from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation; transferring case to the Northern District of Florida for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rogers. Associated Cases: 0:19-cv-00392-JRT-KMM et al.(JLB) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/22/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin W Hulse on behalf of 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/22/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Directing Clerk to Sever Cases. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 3/11/2019. (HAZ) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/22/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASE. This case is reassigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim and Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez for all further proceedings. Judge Eric C. Tostrud, Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-468 (JRT/KMM). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim, Judge Patrick J. Schiltz, and Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 2/28/2019. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/22/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-468 (ECT/LIB). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 2/27/2019. (MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/22/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Morris Richardson, Henry Ramirez, Jack Keck, Robert Brock, John Moore, Jonathon Hamilton, Frank James, Joshua Phelps, Harold Hagood, Kendall Whitfield, Brad Mora, Christopher Moore, Orlando Pacheco, Frank Souther, Frank Keating, Carl Deuel, Brandon Miller, Jimmie Clay, Joshua Pritt, Brandon Sibley, Jonathan Corwin, Anthony Waters, Brian Koceja, Richard Woodruff, Ricky Detlefsen, John Mauldin, Patrick Phelan, Jason Blain, Lonnie Sorrell, Paul Aguilar, Dustin Smith, Adrian Chavez, William Thompson, Kenneth Davis, James Gilbert, Shenny Solis, Michael Brooks, Lucas Barker, Wilbert Richardson, Gary Williams, Derrick Smoot, Jason Webb, Erik Jorgensen, Charles Baumbach. 3M Company, Aearo Technologies, LLC served on 2/27/2019, answer due 3/20/2019. (Barber, Matthew) Modified text on 2/28/2019 (CLK). [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/22/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Richard M. Paul III, Ashlea G. Schwarz, and Sean Cooper as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/22/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Aearo Technologies, LLC. (MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/22/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil 3rd, 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 19-cv-468 (ECT/BRT). (MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/22/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6695160) filed by Morris Richardson, Henry Ramirez, Jack Keck, Robert Brock, John Moore, Jonathon Hamilton, Frank James, Joshua Phelps, Harold Hagood, Kendall Whitfield, Brad Mora, Christopher Moore, Orlando Pacheco, Frank Souther, Frank Keating, Carl Deuel, Brandon Miller, Jimmie Clay, Joshua Pritt, Brandon Sibley, Jonathan Corwin, Anthony Waters, Brian Koceja, Richard Woodruff, Ricky Detlefsen, John Mauldin, Patrick Phelan, Jason Blain, Lonnie Sorrell, Paul Aguilar, Dustin Smith, Adrian Chavez, William Thompson, Kenneth Davis, James Gilbert, Shenny Solis, Michael Brooks, Lucas Barker, Wilbert Richardson, Gary Williams, Derrick Smoot, Jason Webb, Erik Jorgensen, Charles Baumbach. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (Barber, Matthew) Modified text on 2/27/2019 (MMP). [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/22/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AGUILAR v 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL BROOKS
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK JAMES
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH DAVIS
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY WILLIAMS
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIMMIE CLAY
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON WEBB
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRY RAMIREZ
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN MOORE
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA PHELPS
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES BAUMBACH
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY WATERS
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN MAULDIN
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MORRIS RICHARDSON
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LONNIE SORRELL
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL AGUILAR
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: ASHLEA SCHWARZ
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Represented By: RICHARD M PAUL, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK SOUTHER
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHENNY SOLIS
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN CORWIN
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUCAS BARKER
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENDALL WHITFIELD
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILBERT RICHARDSON
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD WOODRUFF
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT BROCK
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICKY DETLEFSEN
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK PHELAN
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK KEATING
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ORLANDO PACHECO
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON MILLER
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAROLD HAGOOD
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN KOCEJA
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHON HAMILTON
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES GILBERT
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIK JORGENSEN
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUSTIN SMITH
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DERRICK SMOOT
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA PRITT
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADRIAN CHAVEZ
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER MOORE
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM THOMPSON
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON BLAIN
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARL DEUEL
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRAD MORA
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON SIBLEY
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACK KECK
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: BENJAMIN W HULSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?