ARIBUABO et al v 3M COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: IRA HORNE, MICHAEL COSGROVE, DUSTIN PRICE, BRETT CAVANAUGH, JOHN WATTS, DENISE CHERRY, DAWIT GEBREGIORGIS, MICHAEL SHACKLEFORD, TYLER WEESNER, JOSELITO ARIBUABO, DEVIN JENKINS, DONALD HOUSTON, BRIAN MOOBERRY, JEFF BUCKWALTER, BILLY MONKS, KEVIN TURNER, RICHARD CAMPBELL, CHASE BONDERER, JUSTIN STURGEON, BLAKE HUGHES, RILEY REITER, TIMOTHY CARNEY, NICHOLAUS KEMP, CHARLES CARLTON, CHRYSTIAN FINCH, DASHAD ROBINSON, MICHAEL MITCHUM, WYATT DUBE, JOSHUA GLESSNER, PETER PIERRE-PAUL, TIMOTHY KENNEDY, RORY WILLIAMS, DUANE JACKSON, JEFFREY HUNT, JEFFREY HOWELL, NATHANIEL CLARK, DANE CLARK, SHAWN BROWN, DAVID ANDERSON, CHRISTOPHER PETERSEN, JAMES MITCHELL, TROY STOCKTON, JAMES BAY, SERGIO CALDERON, NATHAN JENNINGS, ADAM DECAP, HAASAN JONES, WADE TRIPP, RODNEY RUSSO, JONATHAN GODDARD, MICHAEL LAZARUS, RAGAN BURNS, DANIEL LONGNECKER, GEOFFREY WITT, IVAN COSME, NOLAN CHOWANKSY, JUSTIN CANNON, DARRIN DISS, JADD JOSEPH, GIOVANNI CANTU, ANGEL MATEO, BRENNEN BRITT, CAMERON DINGER, ROBERT RYAN, ZACHARY SORROWS, ROBERT SWINDLE, KEVIN MOORE, DAVID BEARD, JAMES KENDALL, MATTHEW JACOBS, CARLOS BEATO, KENNETH BELL, CHARITY WRIGHT, DAVID JACKSON, CHARLES PHILLIPS, CHASE DAVIS, MATTHEW HERVOL, ADAN RUBIO, TODD OWEN, MATTHEW MITCHELL, IVAN KEZER, THOMAS TARVER, DANIEL MEANEY, CHRISTOPHER BLASDELL, MOSTAFA ELSAKA, JUSTIN WEAVER, RYAN BRUNER, DANIEL RESTIVO, MICHAEL SCHILLINGER, REX WHITE, JOHN MADDALENA and MARK HERMAN
Defendant: 3M COMPANY and AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00893
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-00475. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO- 3) from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation; transferring case to the Northern District of Florida for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rogers. Associated Cases: 0:19-cv-00392-JRT-KMM et al.(JLB) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/23/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DIRECTION TO THE CLERK OF COURT FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Case Nos. 19-473 and 19-475 be assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim and Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez, nunc pro tunc, by use of a card on the Civil (3rd, 4th Master) list of the automated case assignment system, and the Clerk of Court is directed to void and reuse a card on the same list pursuant to this Court's Assignment of Cases Order dated July 5, 2017. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that a copy of this order shall be filed in each of the above respective files. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 3/1/2019, Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 3/1/19 and Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 3/4/19. (AKL) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/23/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19cv475 ECT/TNL. (AKL) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/23/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Richard M. Paul III, Ashlea G. Schwarz, Sean Cooper as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (AKL) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/23/2019.]
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6695624) filed by Wyatt Dube, Darrin Diss, Tyler Weesner, Matthew Mitchell, Timothy Carney, Peter Pierre-Paul, Carlos Beato, Michael Shackleford, Nathaniel Clark, Justin Cannon, Dustin Price, Sergio Calderon, Blake Hughes, Timothy Kennedy, Robert Swindle, Daniel Restivo, Michael Cosgrove, Michael Lazarus, Daniel Meaney, Charles Carlton, Rory Williams, Justin Weaver, Chase Bonderer, Cameron Dinger, Chrystian Finch, Brennen Britt, Rex White, Robert Ryan, Matthew Jacobs, Kevin Turner, Geoffrey Witt, Rodney Russo, Billy Monks, Chase Davis, Nathan Jennings, Mark Herman, Michael Mitchum, Daniel Longnecker, Ira Horne, Shawn Brown, Ragan Burns, Zachary Sorrows, Jadd Joseph, Angel Mateo, Ivan Kezer, Riley Reiter, Brian Mooberry, Jeffrey Hunt, Wade Tripp, Adan Rubio, Giovanni Cantu, James Mitchell, James Kendall, Kevin Moore, Charles Phillips, Todd Owen, Richard Campbell, John Watts, Adam DeCap, Troy Stockton, Dane Clark, Ivan Cosme, Justin Sturgeon, Dashad Robinson, Matthew Hervol, Jeff Buckwalter, Christopher Petersen, John Maddalena, Devin Jenkins, Nolan Chowanksy, Nicholaus Kemp, Michael Schillinger, Brett Cavanaugh, Donald Houston, David Jackson, Denise Cherry, Ryan Bruner, David Beard, Thomas Tarver, Dawit Gebregiorgis, Joselito Aribuabo, Charity Wright, Christopher Blasdell, Haasan Jones, Duane Jackson, Kenneth Bell, Jonathan Goddard, David Anderson, Mostafa Elsaka, Joshua Glessner, Jeffrey Howell, James Bay. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (Barber, Matthew) Modified text on 2/28/2019 (AKL). [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/23/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ARIBUABO et al v 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRA HORNE
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL COSGROVE
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUSTIN PRICE
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRETT CAVANAUGH
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN WATTS
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENISE CHERRY
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAWIT GEBREGIORGIS
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL SHACKLEFORD
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYLER WEESNER
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSELITO ARIBUABO
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEVIN JENKINS
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD HOUSTON
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN MOOBERRY
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFF BUCKWALTER
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILLY MONKS
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN TURNER
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD CAMPBELL
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHASE BONDERER
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN STURGEON
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLAKE HUGHES
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RILEY REITER
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY CARNEY
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLAUS KEMP
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES CARLTON
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRYSTIAN FINCH
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DASHAD ROBINSON
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL MITCHUM
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WYATT DUBE
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA GLESSNER
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PETER PIERRE-PAUL
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY KENNEDY
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RORY WILLIAMS
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUANE JACKSON
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY HUNT
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY HOWELL
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATHANIEL CLARK
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANE CLARK
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAWN BROWN
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID ANDERSON
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER PETERSEN
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES MITCHELL
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TROY STOCKTON
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES BAY
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SERGIO CALDERON
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATHAN JENNINGS
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM DECAP
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAASAN JONES
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WADE TRIPP
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODNEY RUSSO
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN GODDARD
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL LAZARUS
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAGAN BURNS
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL LONGNECKER
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEOFFREY WITT
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IVAN COSME
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOLAN CHOWANKSY
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN CANNON
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARRIN DISS
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JADD JOSEPH
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GIOVANNI CANTU
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGEL MATEO
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENNEN BRITT
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAMERON DINGER
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT RYAN
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZACHARY SORROWS
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT SWINDLE
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN MOORE
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID BEARD
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES KENDALL
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW JACOBS
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLOS BEATO
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH BELL
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARITY WRIGHT
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID JACKSON
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES PHILLIPS
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHASE DAVIS
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW HERVOL
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAN RUBIO
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TODD OWEN
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW MITCHELL
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IVAN KEZER
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS TARVER
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL MEANEY
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER BLASDELL
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOSTAFA ELSAKA
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN WEAVER
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN BRUNER
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL RESTIVO
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL SCHILLINGER
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REX WHITE
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN MADDALENA
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK HERMAN
Represented By: ALICIA N SIEBEN
Represented By: WILLIAM R SIEBEN
Represented By: MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?