LAND et al v. 3M COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: SCOTT RIDER, ROBERT RUCKER, RYAN O'SULLIVAN, CHARLES LUBNOW, NATHAN MASSEY, DEREK LITTLE, TIMOTHY MOORE, WILLIAM LONGMORE, JOSEPH OLSON, ROBERT MILLER, JOSHUA REYNOLDS, MICHAEL RICCARDI, BRUCE PRYOR, DAVID OLIVER, ERIK ROMINE, ARRON MOMON, ANTHONY RHYMER, JONATHON MACKEY, TRAVIS MCNEIL, ROBERT RASELY, ERIC MIZNER, MARK MINA, PATRICK RIGGS, BRETT LEHR, FRANK MCKINLEY, JIMMY NEIGHBORS, STEVEN MUECK, NELSON RIVERA OCASIO, LUCAS PHILLIPS, MICHAEL PORRAZZO, JOSHUA RIDDLE, ROSS REED, ADAM LORENZETTI, TAYLOR PRIMACK, CALVIN POTTS, BRIAN PRYOR, CARLOS MUNOZ, JARED MITCHELL, JAMES LEWIS, EDUARDO MALDONADO, MICHAEL LEBOW, TIMOTHY MILLER, ROBBY PRICE, KENNETH PARKER, GEORGE NIPPER, CHACE READSHAW, ADAM LANDERS, MICHAEL NEWSOM, BINYAAMEN NOVUS-KHAN, JEFFREY LEVESQUE, TONY MITCHELL, ROBERT RUCKDESCHEL, JUSTIN MAZE, JESSE POWELL, DEREK PATSEY, CHRISTOPHER LYNCH, BLAINE MORGAN, JAMES MUELLER, JEREMY PEARSALL, ROB MENDENHALL, ADAM LEE, ANTHONY ROBERTS, JOSHUA PRYOR, JAY LAWSON, ANTHONY LEE, JOEL MOSS, ANGELINA ROMAN, TODD PIRICH, KAYLA MORRISON, JAMIE MOORE, CHRISTOPHER MARRERO, CHAD MANGHAM, CHRISTOPHER PENINGTON, MATTHEW MOEN, JOSEPH PENA, MICHAEL MOISER, DWIGHT OAKS, TONY ROBINSON, JACOB ROGGE, BERNADETTE OLAVE, JEFF MCDONALD, CHANCE LAND, TODD LEVIN, RYAMOND PATE, ANIBAL PAZ, MATTHEW MARSHALL, GREGORY PERKINS, BRETT ROZELLE, BRANDON LUKE, VICTOR POLANCO, CHRISTOPHER LEWIS, ERIC LIEBER, ROBERT MORRISON, KURT OLSEN, HERIBERTO MARRERO, RALPH PERSAUD, JONATHAN ROBEY, ROBERT MCDONALD and SCOTT MCAVOY
Defendant: 3M COMPANY and AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01179
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by SEAN PATRICK TRACEY on behalf of All Plaintiffs (TRACEY, SEAN)
April 30, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by SHAWN FOX on behalf of All Plaintiffs (FOX, SHAWN)
April 29, 2019 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-00962. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 25, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-5) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER on #8 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 4/17/2019. (SMD) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 Stipulation. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL by 3M Company. Jointly Signed by Plaintiffs and Aearo Technologies, LLC. (Hulse, Benjamin) Modified text on 4/16/2019 (CLK). [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.Aearo LLC, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of Aearo Intermediate LLC, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of Aearo Holding LLC, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of 3M Occupational Safety LLC, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of 3M Company. (Rashid, Faris) Modified text on 4/12/2019 (CLK). [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Aearo Technologies, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Sean Patrick Tracey, Shawn P. Fox, Rebecca King, Clinton Casperson, Nick Johnson as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (JLB) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-962 (SRN/ECW). (JLB) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County, case number 27-cv-19-4563 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6791255) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) Order Companioning Cases, #3 Exhibit(s) Notice of Judicial Assignment, #4 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LAND et al v. 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT RIDER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT RUCKER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN O'SULLIVAN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES LUBNOW
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATHAN MASSEY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEREK LITTLE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY MOORE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM LONGMORE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH OLSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT MILLER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA REYNOLDS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL RICCARDI
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUCE PRYOR
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID OLIVER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIK ROMINE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARRON MOMON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY RHYMER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHON MACKEY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRAVIS MCNEIL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT RASELY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC MIZNER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK MINA
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK RIGGS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRETT LEHR
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK MCKINLEY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIMMY NEIGHBORS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN MUECK
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NELSON RIVERA OCASIO
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUCAS PHILLIPS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL PORRAZZO
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA RIDDLE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSS REED
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM LORENZETTI
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAYLOR PRIMACK
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALVIN POTTS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN PRYOR
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLOS MUNOZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JARED MITCHELL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES LEWIS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDUARDO MALDONADO
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL LEBOW
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY MILLER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBBY PRICE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH PARKER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE NIPPER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHACE READSHAW
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM LANDERS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL NEWSOM
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BINYAAMEN NOVUS-KHAN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY LEVESQUE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONY MITCHELL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT RUCKDESCHEL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN MAZE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSE POWELL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEREK PATSEY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER LYNCH
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLAINE MORGAN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES MUELLER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMY PEARSALL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROB MENDENHALL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM LEE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY ROBERTS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA PRYOR
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAY LAWSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY LEE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOEL MOSS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELINA ROMAN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TODD PIRICH
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAYLA MORRISON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMIE MOORE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER MARRERO
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHAD MANGHAM
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER PENINGTON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW MOEN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH PENA
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL MOISER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DWIGHT OAKS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONY ROBINSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACOB ROGGE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BERNADETTE OLAVE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFF MCDONALD
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHANCE LAND
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TODD LEVIN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAMOND PATE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANIBAL PAZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW MARSHALL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY PERKINS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRETT ROZELLE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON LUKE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTOR POLANCO
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER LEWIS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC LIEBER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT MORRISON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KURT OLSEN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HERIBERTO MARRERO
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RALPH PERSAUD
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN ROBEY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT MCDONALD
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT MCAVOY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: SEAN PATRICK TRACEY
Represented By: SHAWN FOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: BENJAMIN W HULSE
Represented By: JERRY W BLACKWELL
Represented By: S Jamal Faleel
Represented By: MONICA L. DAVIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?