HIGHSMITH et al v. 3M COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: JOSEPH BROWN, JONATHAN HESS, JAMES WINGFIELD, RICHARD HUGGINS, JEREMY GAY, JAMEISON MERCADO, LEVI LONGAKIT, WAYNE FROMDAHL, TERRY LOCKHART, LARRY YOUNG, GUY ETHOUSE, WILLIE WALTERS, DONALD BENJAMIN, BRANDAN KORITKO, ROSWELL DRAKE, JARROD HIGHSMITH, THOMAS MORTON, JASON HYATT, DEVIN WILBUR, JOSE PERALTA, DENNIS LESTER, RASHID MUHAMMAD, KIWANUAS HARRINGTON, ANTHONY DANG, TAD BOLON and AARON MITCHELL
Defendant: 3M COMPANY and AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01186
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIN J ROGIERS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (ROGIERS, ERIN)
May 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by MIKAL WATTS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (WATTS, MIKAL)
April 29, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-00975. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 25, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-5) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL by 3M Company. Jointly Signed by Jarrod Highsmith, et al. and Aearo Technologies LLC. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Aearo Technologies, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Mikal C. Watts, Francisco Guerra IV, Erin Rogiers, Paul Danziger, Rodrigo R. de Llano as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-975 ECT/ECW. (CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County, case number 27-cv-19-4680 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6794701) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) Order Companioning Cases, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 4/29/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HIGHSMITH et al v. 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH BROWN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ERIN J ROGIERS
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN HESS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ERIN J ROGIERS
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES WINGFIELD
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ERIN J ROGIERS
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD HUGGINS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ERIN J ROGIERS
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMY GAY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ERIN J ROGIERS
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMEISON MERCADO
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ERIN J ROGIERS
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEVI LONGAKIT
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ERIN J ROGIERS
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAYNE FROMDAHL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ERIN J ROGIERS
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRY LOCKHART
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ERIN J ROGIERS
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY YOUNG
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ERIN J ROGIERS
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GUY ETHOUSE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ERIN J ROGIERS
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIE WALTERS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ERIN J ROGIERS
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD BENJAMIN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ERIN J ROGIERS
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDAN KORITKO
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ERIN J ROGIERS
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSWELL DRAKE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ERIN J ROGIERS
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JARROD HIGHSMITH
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ERIN J ROGIERS
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS MORTON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ERIN J ROGIERS
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON HYATT
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ERIN J ROGIERS
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEVIN WILBUR
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ERIN J ROGIERS
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE PERALTA
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ERIN J ROGIERS
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS LESTER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ERIN J ROGIERS
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RASHID MUHAMMAD
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ERIN J ROGIERS
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIWANUAS HARRINGTON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ERIN J ROGIERS
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY DANG
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ERIN J ROGIERS
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAD BOLON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ERIN J ROGIERS
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AARON MITCHELL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ERIN J ROGIERS
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: BENJAMIN W HULSE
Represented By: JERRY W BLACKWELL
Represented By: S Jamal Faleel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?