VENTURA v. PRINCIPLE INFO TECH INC

Plaintiff: TIMOTHY VENTURA
Defendant: PRINCIPLE INFO TECH INC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01315
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT re 9 Case Transferred Out to Another District. Case transferred from Florida Northern has been opened in SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS as case 4:19cv1877, filed 05/24/2019. (MB)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 Interdistrict Transfer to the SOUTHERN TEXAS HOUSTON DIVISION, located at BOB CASEY U S COURTHOUSE, 515 RUSK AVENUE, HOUSTON, TX 77002. (MB)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Unopposed MOTION To Transfer Case to U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division. The case will be transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division, where it should be docketed as a related case to Case No. 4:19-cv-01063; Principle Information Technology Company d/b/a Principle Info-Tech v. Timothy Ventura. The Clerk is DIRECTED to take the necessary steps to effectuate the transfer and close the file. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/23/2019. (MB)
May 23, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #7 Plaintiff's Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (MB)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 Plaintiff's Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by TIMOTHY VENTURA. (STORCH, NOAH)
May 22, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #6 Defendant's Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division by PRINCIPLE INFO TECH INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (MB)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division by PRINCIPLE INFO TECH INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (HARRELL, DANIEL)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by PRINCIPLE INFO TECH INC. (HARRELL, DANIEL)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by PRINCIPLE INFO TECH INC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 5/22/2019). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (HARRELL, DANIEL) (MB).
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 5/16/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/17/2019. Discovery due by 11/1/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/2/2019. (MB)
May 1, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal (please see proposed ISO). (MB)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (HARRELL, DANIEL)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PRINCIPLE INFO TECH INC from TIMOTHY VENTURA v PRINCIPLE INFO TECH INC, case number 2019 CA 000260. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4477096.), filed by PRINCIPLE INFO TECH INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (HARRELL, DANIEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VENTURA v. PRINCIPLE INFO TECH INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY VENTURA
Represented By: NOAH E STORCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRINCIPLE INFO TECH INC
Represented By: DANIEL EUGENE HARRELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?