HARRIS v. SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS

Plaintiff: CHINIKE HARRIS
Defendant: SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS
Case Number: 3:2019cv01334
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL re #8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Discovery due by 1/17/2020. The deadline for filing potentially Dispositive Motions as well as Daubert motions to be filed by 2/7/2020. Mediation to take place by 2/14/2020. Mediation Report due by 2/28/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 6/12/2019. (MB)
June 7, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #8 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (MB)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (MINCHIN, JONATHAN)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS identifying Corporate Parent SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA for SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS.. (CRABTREE, ROBERT)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 5/29/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/28/2019. Discovery due by 11/15/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/15/2019. (MB)
May 14, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal (please see proposed ISO). (MB)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER APPROVING #4 STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. The clerk is directed to update the docket accordingly. Attorney JONATHAN BROCK MINCHIN for CHINIKE HARRIS added. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/14/2019. (MB)
May 14, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #4 STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by CHINIKE HARRIS. (MB)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by CHINIKE HARRIS. (MINCHIN, JONATHAN)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT for WYATT M. OAKEY. (MB)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE for WYATT M. OAKEY. (MB)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4478547.), filed by SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits) (CRABTREE, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARRIS v. SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHINIKE HARRIS
Represented By: JONATHAN BROCK MINCHIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS
Represented By: ROBERT C CRABTREE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?