DORADO et al v 3M COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: ARON FARMER, ANDREW DUTIL, CHRIS HAGEN, MATTHEW FARE, JARIS HOLLIER, CHASE HANAHAN, MITCHELL HAMMOCK, SEBASTIAN GORCZYNSKI, DERRICK JONES, DYLAN GOKEY, JAYME JOEL, FRANK JOYNER, ANTHONY GINNETTI, MATTHEW HAMPTON, THOMAS HARTZELL, VINCENT FLOYD, JAMES EVERETTE, KENNETH KOON, CASEY DOW, JOSE FERNANDEZ, JASON HOMMES, JAMARIO JONES, HENRY FRANCIS, RUSSELL KNORR, JACOB DUNCAN, ANDREA JACKSON, ERIC GRIFFIN, KIESHANA GARRISON, JOSEPH DYTRT, FORREST HUNT, GREGG HOGE, JOHN HIGGINS, WESLEY JOSEPH, LORENZO LAFOUNTAIN, PAUL DRAGICEVICH, GARY HAAG, CHRISTOPHER GOUBEAUX, MATTHEW KUES, STEPHEN GIBBONS, KIRK HERMAN, BERNAND FLORANDA, JUSTIN HOAG, ELIZABETH FRITZ, DON GRIFFIS, CHRISTOPHER DUNGAN, WILLIAM GONZALES, DOUG HENNEN, SCOTT EDWARDS, BRYCE GREIDER, ADAM DOTSON, KEVIN FELTON, WILLIE HOOKS, MIKEL JONES, KEVIN HOLMES, ALBERT HOPKINS, PATRICK HINKLE, RYAN GARCIA, DEREK HARGROVE, THOMAS FARRELL, LEON JACKSON, AUSTIN HOWE, AARON FACHINI, BARRY GAYNOR, TERRANCE FLAUGHER, DION DORADO, PAUL GREEN, JESSE HOSTETLER, RICHARD HARTLEY, LUIS JIMINEZ, JOHN HAMILTON, JOSEPH DUNCAN, SHARON FINCH, PETER JOHNSON, NICHOLAS HARBISON, EDONEL JEAN, TARRA JUNEAU, MARQUEA HOYETT, ANTHONY DUNN, STEVEN GRAY, SEAN KUSKY, KEVIN GODDARD, MACIEJ GOLONKA, KYLE GRIMM, JOSEPH LEE KING, CHRISTOPHER HEINRICH, GRESHAM GREGG, RYON KOSINO, DOUGLAS JONES, KYLE HOLMES, CHRISTIAN JONES, ROGER EDWARDS, MICHAEL GIBSON, JOHNATHON HENSON, JAMES HOLT, STEPHEN FLORES, JOHN HANDRAHAN, TRAVIS DOUGLAS, JAMES DURST and JOEY HOLSCLAW
Defendant: 3M COMPANY and AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01377
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by DION DORADO (TRACEY, SEAN)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 16 MULTI-PLAINTIFF ACTIONS. All plaintiffs named in any multi-plaintiff complaint currently pending in this MDL, except derivative plaintiffs, will be severed. For multi-plaintiff actions in which no remand motion is currently pending, all plaintiffs, except for the first-named plaintiff, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with the right to refile an individual short form complaint in the approved form, currently available on the master docket for the MDL at ECF No. 705. The Clerk is directed to file a copy of this Order on the master docket for the MDL, and also on the individual docket for each action refiled by a severed plaintiff pursuant to this Order, whether the action is direct filed in this district or transferred here by the Panel. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/15/2019. CASEY DOW, PAUL DRAGICEVICH, JACOB DUNCAN, JOSEPH DUNCAN, CHRISTOPHER DUNGAN, ANTHONY DUNN, JAMES DURST, ANDREW DUTIL, JOSEPH DYTRT, ROGER EDWARDS, SCOTT EDWARDS, JAMES EVERETTE, AARON FACHINI, MATTHEW FARE, ARON FARMER, THOMAS FARRELL, KEVIN FELTON, JOSE FERNANDEZ, SHARON FINCH, TERRANCE FLAUGHER, BERNAND FLORANDA, STEPHEN FLORES, VINCENT FLOYD, HENRY FRANCIS, ELIZABETH FRITZ, RYAN GARCIA, KIESHANA GARRISON, BARRY GAYNOR, STEPHEN GIBBONS, MICHAEL GIBSON, ANTHONY GINNETTI, KEVIN GODDARD, DYLAN GOKEY, MACIEJ GOLONKA, WILLIAM GONZALES, SEBASTIAN GORCZYNSKI, CHRISTOPHER GOUBEAUX, STEVEN GRAY, PAUL GREEN, GRESHAM GREGG, BRYCE GREIDER, ERIC GRIFFIN, DON GRIFFIS, KYLE GRIMM, GARY HAAG, CHRIS HAGEN, JOHN HAMILTON, MITCHELL HAMMOCK, MATTHEW HAMPTON, CHASE HANAHAN, JOHN HANDRAHAN, NICHOLAS HARBISON, DEREK HARGROVE, RICHARD HARTLEY, THOMAS HARTZELL, CHRISTOPHER HEINRICH, DOUG HENNEN, JOHNATHON HENSON, KIRK HERMAN, JOHN HIGGINS, PATRICK HINKLE, JUSTIN HOAG, GREGG HOGE, JARIS HOLLIER, KEVIN HOLMES, KYLE HOLMES, JOEY HOLSCLAW, JAMES HOLT, JASON HOMMES, WILLIE HOOKS, ALBERT HOPKINS, JESSE HOSTETLER, AUSTIN HOWE, MARQUEA HOYETT, FORREST HUNT, ANDREA JACKSON, LEON JACKSON, EDONEL JEAN, LUIS JIMINEZ, JAYME JOEL, PETER JOHNSON, CHRISTIAN JONES, DERRICK JONES, DOUGLAS JONES, JAMARIO JONES, MIKEL JONES, WESLEY JOSEPH, FRANK JOYNER, TARRA JUNEAU, JOSEPH LEE KING, RUSSELL KNORR, KENNETH KOON, RYON KOSINO, MATTHEW KUES, SEAN KUSKY, LORENZO LAFOUNTAIN, ADAM DOTSON and TRAVIS DOUGLAS terminated. (djb)
May 6, 2019 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-00969. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 30, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-6) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/6/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL by 3M Company. Jointly Signed by Dion Dorado, et al. and Aero Technologies, LLC. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/6/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/6/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Aearo Technologies, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/6/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Sean Patrick Tracey, Shawn P. Fox, Rebecca King, Clinton Casperson, Nick H. Johnson as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MMG) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/6/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Aearo Technologies, LLC. (MMG) Modified text on 4/10/2019 (MMG). [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/6/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 19-cv-969 ECT/BRT. (MMG) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/6/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/6/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/6/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial District, Hennepin County, case number 27-cv-19-4499 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6793477) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) State Order Companioning Cases, #3 Exhibit(s) State Notice of Judicial Assignment, #4 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/6/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DORADO et al v 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARON FARMER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW DUTIL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRIS HAGEN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW FARE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JARIS HOLLIER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHASE HANAHAN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MITCHELL HAMMOCK
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEBASTIAN GORCZYNSKI
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DERRICK JONES
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DYLAN GOKEY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAYME JOEL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK JOYNER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY GINNETTI
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW HAMPTON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS HARTZELL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VINCENT FLOYD
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES EVERETTE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH KOON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CASEY DOW
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE FERNANDEZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON HOMMES
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMARIO JONES
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRY FRANCIS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUSSELL KNORR
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACOB DUNCAN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREA JACKSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC GRIFFIN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIESHANA GARRISON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH DYTRT
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FORREST HUNT
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGG HOGE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN HIGGINS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESLEY JOSEPH
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORENZO LAFOUNTAIN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL DRAGICEVICH
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY HAAG
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER GOUBEAUX
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW KUES
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN GIBBONS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIRK HERMAN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BERNAND FLORANDA
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN HOAG
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH FRITZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DON GRIFFIS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER DUNGAN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM GONZALES
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOUG HENNEN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT EDWARDS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYCE GREIDER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM DOTSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN FELTON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIE HOOKS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIKEL JONES
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN HOLMES
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBERT HOPKINS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK HINKLE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN GARCIA
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEREK HARGROVE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS FARRELL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEON JACKSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUSTIN HOWE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AARON FACHINI
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARRY GAYNOR
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRANCE FLAUGHER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DION DORADO
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL GREEN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSE HOSTETLER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD HARTLEY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUIS JIMINEZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN HAMILTON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH DUNCAN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON FINCH
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PETER JOHNSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS HARBISON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDONEL JEAN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TARRA JUNEAU
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARQUEA HOYETT
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY DUNN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN GRAY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEAN KUSKY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN GODDARD
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MACIEJ GOLONKA
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KYLE GRIMM
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH LEE KING
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER HEINRICH
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRESHAM GREGG
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYON KOSINO
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOUGLAS JONES
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KYLE HOLMES
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTIAN JONES
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROGER EDWARDS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL GIBSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHNATHON HENSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES HOLT
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN FLORES
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN HANDRAHAN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRAVIS DOUGLAS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES DURST
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOEY HOLSCLAW
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: BENJAMIN W HULSE
Represented By: JERRY W BLACKWELL
Represented By: S Jamal Faleel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?