JOHNSON et al v. LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff: JACKIE JOHNSON and Bonnie Johnson
Defendant: LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2019cv01432
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Other Affiliate AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC., Other Affiliate AIUH, LLC, Other Affiliate AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY for LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY.. (MURPHY, EUGENE)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (MURPHY, EUGENE)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Complaint filed by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY answer due 5/31/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/20/2019. (alb)
May 20, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. (Plaintiff attorney is not admitted and has not filed notice of appearance in the case.) (alb)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Complaint by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (MURPHY, EUGENE)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENTS mailed to attorney Kimesha S. Smith. (alb) Modified on 6/11/2019 to edit docket text (alb).
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE, mailed to attorney Kimesha S. Smith. (alb) Modified on 6/11/2019 to edit docket text (alb).
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED DOCUMENT by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet. (MURPHY, EUGENE)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY from Circuit Court of the 14th Judicial Circuit, case number 19000083CAAXMX. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4488139.), filed by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (MURPHY, EUGENE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHNSON et al v. LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACKIE JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: EUGENE P MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?