TOM BARROW COMPANY v. AEROMECHANICAL, LLC

Plaintiff: TOM BARROW COMPANY
Defendant: AEROMECHANICAL, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01434
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 Clerk's Dismissal re #4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (MB)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TOM BARROW COMPANY (JONES II, ROBERT)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint with Exhibits A-D, Civil Cover Sheet and Summons served on Brian D. Carstens on May 15, 2019, filed by TOM BARROW COMPANY., SUMMONS Returned Executed by TOM BARROW COMPANY. AEROMECHANICAL, LLC served on 5/15/2019, answer due 6/5/2019. (JONES II, ROBERT)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to AEROMECHANICAL, LLC. (MB)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AEROMECHANICAL, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4488172.), filed by TOM BARROW COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 SUMMONS FOR AEROMECHANICAL LLC, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (JONES II, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TOM BARROW COMPANY v. AEROMECHANICAL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOM BARROW COMPANY
Represented By: ROBERT SAMUEL JONES II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEROMECHANICAL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?