FORMOSO v 3M COMPANY

Plaintiff: GILBERT FORMOSO
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2019cv01497
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION and #1 NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT. (mailed to Adam Wolfson and Paul J Pennock) (djb)
May 16, 2019 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 1:19-cv-00476. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 16, 2019 Filing 11 Conditional Transfer Order entered by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (dm) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/16/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Adam Wolfson. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/16/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Paul J. Pennock. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/16/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Harold A. Barza. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/16/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Karl S. Stern of Adam Wolfson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12101704) by on behalf of Gilbert Formoso. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Stern, Karl) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/16/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Karl S. Stern Paul J. Pennock ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12101669) by on behalf of Gilbert Formoso. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Stern, Karl) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/16/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Karl S. Stern of Harold A. Barza ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12101552) by on behalf of Gilbert Formoso. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Stern, Karl) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/16/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 Pro Hac Vice Letters mailed to Harold A. Barza, Paul J. Pennock, and Adam B. Wolfson for Plaintiff Gilbert Formoso re: non-admitted status. (cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/16/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to 3M Company. (cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/16/2019.]
May 2, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Gilbert Formoso. (cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/16/2019.]
May 2, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/16/2019.]
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Gilbert Formoso. (Stern, Karl) (Main Document 2 replaced and flattened on 5/3/2019) (cj). [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/16/2019.]
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12070906), filed by Gilbert Formoso. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stern, Karl) (Attachment 1 replaced and flattened on 5/3/2019) (cj). [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FORMOSO v 3M COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GILBERT FORMOSO
Represented By: PAUL J PENNOCK
Represented By: Adam Wolfson
Represented By: Karl S. Stern
Represented By: HAROLD A BARZA
Represented By: ADAM BRYAN WOLFSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?