HATTON HOUSE APARTMENTS LLC v. CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NUMBER AMR-61861
Plaintiff: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NUMBER AMR-61861 and HATTON HOUSE APARTMENTS
Case Number: 3:2019cv01542
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Referring Judge: ROGER VINSON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AGREED ORDER TO STAY LITIGATION PENDING RE-INSPECTION. All claims Plaintiff may have against Defendants with respect to the allegations raised in the Complaint and/or arising out of the facts alleged in the Complaint are stayed pending for 90 days. (SEE ORDER) Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 7/9/2019. Deadline for clerk to check status of stay by 10/7/2019. (alb)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT is GRANTED, for 14 days from the date of this order. I will also sua sponte grant the plaintiff a 14-day extension from the date of this order to respond to the motion to dismiss as well. (Internal deadline for response and corporate disclosure statement: 7/9/2019).) Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 6/25/2019. (alb)
June 25, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re: #11 Notice (Other), #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (alb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NUMBER AMR-61861. (STALLINGS, MICHAEL)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF FILING MOTION TO DISMISS by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NUMBER AMR-61861 re #5 Notice (Other), #10 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, #1 Notice of Removal, #8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Motion to Dismiss) (STALLINGS, MICHAEL)
June 24, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re: #10 Order. (Response or motion not filed.) (alb)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #8 Unopposed MOTION for Enlargement of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. The parties are advised, however, that the motion to dismiss itself has not yet been filed with this court nor was it included in the state court file attached to the notice of removal (docs. #1 , #5 ) (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/21/2019). Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 6/11/2019. (alb)
June 11, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re: #8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (alb)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by HATTON HOUSE APARTMENTS. (BOGGS, AMY)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 6/24/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/24/2019. Discovery due by 11/7/2019. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 6/10/2019. (alb)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by AMY D BOGGS on behalf of HATTON HOUSE APARTMENTS (BOGGS, AMY)
June 10, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (See proposed ISO.) (alb)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 DISREGARD FILED IN WRONG CASE SEE DOCKET ENTRY #7 . NOTICE of Appearance by AMY D BOGGS on behalf of HATTON HOUSE APARTMENTS (BOGGS, AMY) Modified on 6/11/2019 (alb).
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBIT "A' TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NUMBER AMR-61861 re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (GRIMLEY, JOHN)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT mailed to attorney Amy Boggs, Esq. and Scott Vieth, Esq. (alb)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE mailed to attorney Amy Boggs, Esq. and Scott Vieth, Esq. (alb)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #1 Notice of Removal. Pursuant to N.D. Fla. Loc. R. 5.2, a complete and executed Civil Cover Sheet is required in each civil case filed. Please file the civil cover sheet using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings," "Other Documents." (alb)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NUMBER AMR-61861 from Jackson County, case number 2019CA000128. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4501756.), filed by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NUMBER AMR-61861. (GRIMLEY, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HATTON HOUSE APARTMENTS LLC v. CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NUMBER AMR-61861
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NUMBER AMR-61861
Represented By: JOHN MICHAEL GRIMLEY, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HATTON HOUSE APARTMENTS
Represented By: AMY D BOGGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?