MAYS et al v. FIRST CHOICE PAYMENT SOLUTIONS GP

Plaintiff: MARIA KOROLYZEN, GAIL SATULOFF, RON DUNCAN, FELIX ORTIZ, PAULETTE CRAFT, BARTH SATULOFF, ROBERT SHIRLEY, WAYNE PARIS, RONALD MILLER, FRANK MONCELLI, ANNIE REDDICK, CURTIS WHITESEL, CINDY ANDERSON, CHRISTIANE FRANCOIS, MARK DEEMER, PAMELA PYLES LINHART, ROBERT MAYS and RICHARD STEVEN LAWRENCE
Defendant: FIRST CHOICE PAYMENT SOLUTIONS GP
Case Number: 3:2019cv01628
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: ROGER VINSON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 8/15/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/16/2019. Discovery due by 12/30/2019. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 8/1/2019. (sdw)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint filed by FIRST CHOICE PAYMENT SOLUTIONS GP. (Answer due by 8/15/2019.) Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 8/1/2019. (sdw)
August 1, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re: #6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by FIRST CHOICE PAYMENT SOLUTIONS GP. (KRIMSKY, BETH-ANN)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PAULETTE CRAFT, MARIA KOROLYZEN, MARK DEEMER, CHRISTIANE FRANCOIS, RICHARD STEVEN LAWRENCE, RON DUNCAN, CINDY ANDERSON. FIRST CHOICE PAYMENT SOLUTIONS GP waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (LEMBERG, SERGEI)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to FIRST CHOICE PAYMENT SOLUTIONS GP. (sdw)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE Summons Request by Cindy Anderson, Paulette Craft, Mark Deemer, Ron Duncan, Christiane Francois, Maria Korolyzen, Richard Steven Lawrence, Pamela Pyles Linkhart, Robert Mays, Ronald Miller, Frank Moncelli, Felix Ortiz, Wayne Paris, Annie Reddick, Barth Satuloff, Gail Satuloff, Robert Shirley, Curtis Whitesel (LEMBERG, SERGEI)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (LEMBERG, SERGEI)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against First Choice Payment Solutions G.P., d/b/a Sekure Merchant Solutions ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4509619.), filed by Paulette Craft, Wayne Paris, Gail Satuloff, Annie Reddick, Robert Mays, Barth Satuloff, Felix Ortiz, Maria Korolyzen, Ronald Miller, Mark Deemer, Curtis Whitesel, Christiane Francois, Richard Steven Lawrence, Frank Moncelli, Robert Shirley, Ron Duncan, Cindy Anderson, Pamela Pyles Linkhart. (LEMBERG, SERGEI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAYS et al v. FIRST CHOICE PAYMENT SOLUTIONS GP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA KOROLYZEN
Represented By: SERGEI LEMBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GAIL SATULOFF
Represented By: SERGEI LEMBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RON DUNCAN
Represented By: SERGEI LEMBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FELIX ORTIZ
Represented By: SERGEI LEMBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAULETTE CRAFT
Represented By: SERGEI LEMBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARTH SATULOFF
Represented By: SERGEI LEMBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT SHIRLEY
Represented By: SERGEI LEMBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAYNE PARIS
Represented By: SERGEI LEMBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD MILLER
Represented By: SERGEI LEMBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK MONCELLI
Represented By: SERGEI LEMBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNIE REDDICK
Represented By: SERGEI LEMBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CURTIS WHITESEL
Represented By: SERGEI LEMBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CINDY ANDERSON
Represented By: SERGEI LEMBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTIANE FRANCOIS
Represented By: SERGEI LEMBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK DEEMER
Represented By: SERGEI LEMBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMELA PYLES LINHART
Represented By: SERGEI LEMBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT MAYS
Represented By: SERGEI LEMBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD STEVEN LAWRENCE
Represented By: SERGEI LEMBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRST CHOICE PAYMENT SOLUTIONS GP
Represented By: BETH-ANN E KRIMSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?