CASON v BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC et al

Plaintiff: MYRON W. CASON
Defendant: BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC and BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2019cv01678
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-01014. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 6/11/2019. (NEF: Sect J)(caa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/12/2019.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/12/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Scott C. Seiler added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Scott C. Seiler added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Seiler, Scott) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/12/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(as) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/12/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/12/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7410189) filed by Myron W. Cason. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit BP Election Not to Mediate)Attorney Timothy John Falcon added to party Myron W. Cason(pty:pla).(Falcon, Timothy) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CASON v BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC
Represented By: KEVIN MICHAEL HODGES
Represented By: Don Keller Haycraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Represented By: KEVIN MICHAEL HODGES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MYRON W. CASON
Represented By: ALLEN WELDON LINDSAY, JR
Represented By: TIMOTHY JOHN FALCON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?