HEATH v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
Petitioner: DANIEL DAVID JACKTOO HEATH
Respondent: ICE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY and IMMIGRATION AND NATURALIZATION SERVICES
Case Number: 3:2019cv01688
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: LACEY A COLLIER
Referring Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #5 Order adopting #4 Report and Recommendation. (sdw)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER adopting #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Petitioner must pay the $5.00 filing fee no later than 29 August 2019. This case is REMANDED to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. (Fee due by 8/29/2019.) Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 8/8/2019. (sdw)
August 8, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER notified that action is needed Re: #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (no objections filed) (sdw)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by DANIEL DAVID JACKTOO HEATH - It is RECOMMENDED that the in forma pauperis motion, ECF No. #2 , be DENIED and Petitioner required to pay the $5.00 filing fee within twenty-one (21) days. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 07/12/2019. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 8/9/2019. (toy)
June 17, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (toy)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se (toy)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DANIEL DAVID JACKTOO HEATH. (toy)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by DANIEL DAVID JACKTOO HEATH. (No service copies) (toy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HEATH v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: IMMIGRATION AND NATURALIZATION SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DANIEL DAVID JACKTOO HEATH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?