WALKER v. BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY LONG TERM INCOME DISABILITY PLAN

Plaintiff: CINDY WALKER
Defendant: BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY LONG TERM INCOME DISABILITY PLAN
Case Number: 3:2019cv01710
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: ROGER VINSON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN on 07/25/2019 by CINDY WALKER. Waiver of Service due by 9/23/2019. (MACLAREN, ROBERT)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY LONG TERM INCOME DISABILITY PLAN and Northern Trust (agent for the plan.) (Attachments: #1 NORTHERN TRUST) (alb)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY LONG TERM INCOME DISABILITY PLAN ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4526464.), filed by CINDY WALKER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 SUMMONS TO SENIOR VICE PRESIDENT GENERAL COUNSEL, #3 SUMMONS TO THE NORTHERN TRUST) (MACLAREN, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WALKER v. BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY LONG TERM INCOME DISABILITY PLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY LONG TERM INCOME DISABILITY PLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CINDY WALKER
Represented By: ROBERT IAN MACLAREN, III
Represented By: DANIEL MARK SOLOWAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?