HULSEY v. STATE OF FLORIDA et al
Plaintiff: OLIN DALE HULSEY
Defendant: STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF ALABAMA and DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN AFFAIRS
Case Number: 3:2019cv01979
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE denying without prejudice #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk shall send Plaintiff a complete set of forms needed to file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis (for non-prisoners). Within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall either file a completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis on the proper form or pay the $400 filing fee. (IFP motion/Fee due by 9/5/2019.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 8/22/2019. (form to Pla) (sdw)
August 20, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Titled: Showing Cause/Affidavit of Indigency). Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (sdw)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Titled: Showing Cause/Affidavit of Indigency) by OLIN DALE HULSEY. (sdw)
August 19, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #5 MOTION (Titled: Request for Imediate Court Intervention and Protective Order/Custody). Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (sdw)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION (Titled: Request for Imediate Court Intervention and Protective Order/Custody) by OLIN DALE HULSEY. (sdw)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of this order to show cause why this case should not be dismissed due to his failure to prosecute or failure to comply with a Court order. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 8/15/2019. Show Cause Response due by 8/29/2019. (sdw)
August 15, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #3 Order. (amended complaint/IFP motion/filing fee not received) (sdw)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. The clerk shall send Plaintiff a civil rights complaint form for pro se (non-prisoner) litigants in actions under 42 U.S.C. 1983 and a complete set of forms needed to file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis (for non-prisoners). Within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint. Within the same time, Plaintiff shall either file a completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the $400.00 filing fee. (Amended Complaint due by 8/14/2019. IFP motion/Fee due by 8/14/2019.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 7/15/2019. (forms to Pla) (sdw)
July 3, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (sdw)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se litigant OLIN DALE HULSEY. (sdw)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN AFFAIRS, STATE OF ALABAMA, and STATE OF FLORIDA filed by OLIN DALE HULSEY. (no service copies)(no filing fee/IFP motion) (sdw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HULSEY v. STATE OF FLORIDA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF ALABAMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN AFFAIRS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OLIN DALE HULSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?