LIEURANCE v BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC et al
Plaintiff: TRACY SPERANZO and RAVEN E LIEURANCE
Defendant: BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC and BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2019cv02016
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Counsel of Record. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/26/2019. Added attorney COURTNEY MICHELLE KING,SARAH A LONG for BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY, BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC. (djb)
July 26, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Catherine Pyune McEldowney, Don Keller Haycraft and Georgia Lee Lucier and Substitute Counsel of Record (djb)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Catherine Pyune McEldowney, Don Keller Haycraft and Georgia Lee Lucier and Substitute Counsel of Record by BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY, BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC. (MCDONALD, FRANCIS)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by CALEB SCOTT SUGG on behalf of RAVEN E LIEURANCE (SUGG, CALEB)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: NOTICE TO COUNSEL - The docket has been corrected regarding the party plaintiff name. Raven E. Lieurance has been added as Plaintiff, Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Tracy Speranzo, to match the #1 Complaint. (djb)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-14111. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 7/9/2019. (NEF: Sect J)(caa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/10/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/10/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED THAT, no later than May 1, 2019, plaintiffs in the attached lists must providefull and complete initial disclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will resultin an order that plaintiffs and their counsel must appear in person before Judge Barbier to showcause why their cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant toFed.R.Civ.P.37(b)(2)(A)(v). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, as to all of the listed cases inwhich plaintiffs produce full and complete disclosures in compliance with this order, the deadlineby which the parties must submit their venue filing is extended to no later than June 1, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 04/04/2019.(am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/10/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/10/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/10/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/10/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7319115) filed by Tracy Speranzo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Election Not to Mediate, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Craig Downs added to party Tracy Speranzo(pty:pla).(Downs, Craig) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LIEURANCE v BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC
Represented By: KEVIN MICHAEL HODGES
Represented By: FRANCIS M MCDONALD, JR
Represented By: SARAH A LONG
Represented By: COURTNEY MICHELLE KING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Represented By: KEVIN MICHAEL HODGES
Represented By: FRANCIS M MCDONALD, JR
Represented By: SARAH A LONG
Represented By: COURTNEY MICHELLE KING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACY SPERANZO
Represented By: NATHAN LEE NELSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAVEN E LIEURANCE
Represented By: NATHAN LEE NELSON
Represented By: CALEB SCOTT SUGG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?