SAVOIA-MCHUGH et al. v. GLASS
Plaintiff: Lee Anne Savoia-McHugh and John Savoia-McHugh
Defendant: John W McCrary, Michael S Glass, Philip Krispin, Santa Fe Capital LLC, Waterfall LLC, Waterfall Group LLC and Eastern Union Funding LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv02018
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines re #153 MOTION to Compel Defendant Phillip Krispin's Compliance with ORDER Setting Pretrial Schedule. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 4/18/2022). (mb)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MOTION to Compel Defendant Phillip Krispin's Compliance With Order Setting Pretrial Schedule by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #153 MOTION to Compel Defendant Phillip Krispin's Compliance With Order Setting Pretrial Schedule (mb)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER. The Motion to Compel Compliance with the Order Setting Pretrial Schedule, ECF No. #149 , is MOOT. The parties are directed to work cooperatively to ensure timely preparation of the pretrial stipulation. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/1/2022. (mb)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 151 RESPONSE to Motion re #149 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Order Setting Trial Plaintiffs' Response to Eastern Union Funding, LLC's Motion to Compel Compliance with Order Setting Pretrial Schedule filed by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #151 RESPONSE to Motion re #149 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Order Setting Trial Plaintiffs' Response to Eastern Union Funding, LLC's Motion to Compel Compliance with Order Setting Pretrial Schedule. (mb)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER re #149 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Order Setting Trial. Plaintiffs' response to the motion is due on or before 12:00 Noon (Central Time) on Friday, April 1, 2022. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 4/1/2022). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/25/2022. (alb)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Order Setting Trial by EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (ELEBASH, WILLIAM)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #149 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Order Setting Trial (mb)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting #147 Motion for Leave to Conduct Attorney Conference via ZOOM. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/24/2022. (mb)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MOTION for Leave to Appear Via Zoom Unopposed Motion for Leave to Conduct Attorney Conference Via Zoom by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #147 MOTION for Leave to Appear Via Zoom Unopposed Motion for Leave to Conduct Attorney Conference Via Zoom (mb)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER re #144 Notice. Defendant Eastern Union's corporate representative, Abraham Bergman, is permitted to appear at trial via zoom video conference on Fridays during the trial period. Defendant Eastern Union's counsel must coordinate Mr. Bergman's appearance with the Court's information technology department at (850) 470-8186. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/17/2021. (mb)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 145 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES THOMAS WIGGINS on behalf of EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC (WIGGINS, CHARLES)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #144 NOTICE of Conflict During Trial by EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC. (mb)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 144 NOTICE of Conflict During Trial by EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC (ELEBASH, WILLIAM)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE. The trial of this matter is hereby scheduled on the Court's trial docket commencing Monday, 5/16/2022 @ 09:00 AM, before JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS. Any party with an unavoidable conflict during that trial period should promptly notify the court by 2/4/2022. A pretrial conference will be held on Monday, 5/9/2022 @ 01:00 PM, at the United States District Court located in the United States District Courthouse, One North Palafox Street, Courtroom 5, Pensacola, Florida. The attorney's conference required by paragraph II shall be held no later than 3/17/2022. The pretrial stipulation and other papers required by paragraphs III and IV shall be filed no later than 4/25/2022. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/28/2022. (mb)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER. Eastern Union's Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. #132 , is GRANTED in part as to vicarious liability to the extent it is based on the Legacy Rose transaction or conversion, and DENIED in part in all other respects. Trial will be scheduled by separate order. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/19/2022. (mb)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER. Re: #140 Notice to Set Action for Jury Trial (construed as a Motion to Set Jury Trial.) The motion is DENIED. The matter of trial schedulingwill be visited following disposition of the pending Motion for SummaryJudgment, ECF No. #132 . Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/9/2021. (alb)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 140 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #140 Jury Demand. (alb)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER re #130 Motion to Place Exhibits Under Seal. The motion is DENIED. No grounds are stated for filing Exhibit A and B under seal, and the Court can discern none within the exhibits themselves. Moreover, the time for responding has passed without a response from Plaintiffs to either the motion or Eastern Union's objection to the confidentiality designation. The Clerk is directed to file Exhibits A and B on the docket and link them to Eastern Union's Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. #132 . Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/27/2021. (mb)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #138 Defendant EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC's REPLY in Further Support Of Its #132 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC. (mb)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Defendant EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC's REPLY in Further Support Of Its #132 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC. (ELEBASH, WILLIAM)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting as requested #136 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (7 days, to July 20, 2021). (Reply Brief due by 7/20/2021.) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/8/2021. (mb)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC. (ELEBASH, WILLIAM)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #136 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (mb)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings re #135 Response to #132 Motion for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 7/13/2021. (alb)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 RESPONSE to Motion re #132 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 10, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 11 - 20, #3 Exhibit Exhibits 21 - 30) (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting as requested #133 Plaintiff's Unopposed MOTION for Enlargement of Time to Respond to #132 MOTION for Summary Judgment (to July 6, 2021). ((Response to motion due by 7/6/2021.) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 6/22/2021. (mb)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #133 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #132 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Unopposed). (mb)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #132 MOTION for Summary Judgment by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MOTION for Summary Judgment by EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response to summary judgment not filed earlier: 6/25/2021). (ELEBASH, WILLIAM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/27/2021, per #139 ORDER: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (mb).
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE of Filing in Support of Eastern Union's Motion For Summary Judgment by EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F) (ELEBASH, WILLIAM)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MOTION to Seal Document by EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC. (ELEBASH, WILLIAM)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #130 MOTION to Seal Document by EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC, #131 NOTICE of Filing in Support of Eastern Union's Motion For Summary Judgment by EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC. (mb)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MEDIATION REPORT - Impasse. (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting #127 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions and Allow One Additional Deposition Out of Time. (Dispositive Motions to be filed by 6/4/2021.) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/23/2021. (alb)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions and Allow Plaintiffs One Additional Deposition Out of Time by EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC. (ELEBASH, WILLIAM)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #127 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions and Allow Plaintiffs One Additional Deposition Out of Time (mb)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 126 First NOTICE OF MEDIATION re Scheduling by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #117 Motion to Compel. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 4/16/2021. (HTC)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER. Defendant Philip Krispin's motion to compel (ECF Doc. #116 ) is DENIED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 4/15/2021. (mb)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Minute Entry for motion hearing proceedings held 4/8/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON: re #116 MOTION to Compel Lee Ann Savoia-McHugh to Appear for Continued Deposition filed by PHILIP KRISPIN; and, #117 MOTION to Compel Additional Depositions of Plaintiffs and to Extend Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Completing Those Depositions filed by EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC. (Court Reporter Connie Morse, Phipps Court Reporting.) (kli)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 DISCOVERY ADVISORY: Re #121 Affidavit of Service filed by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH Counsels attention is directed to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5(d), which prohibits the filing of discovery materials (including notices of deposition, deposition transcripts, interrogatories and interrogatory responses and notices thereof, production requests and responses and notices thereof, and admissions requests and responses and notices thereof) and disclosures under Rules 26(a)(1) and 26(a)(2), unless and until needed for consideration of pending motions by the court. This advisory serves as notice that no further discovery materials should be filed and all discovery posting options have been removed from CMECF. (mb)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena for Deposition served on Hanover Street on 03/23/21, filed by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
April 4, 2021 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #120 Response to Motion, #119 Response to Motion. (alb)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 RESPONSE to Motion re #117 MOTION to Compel Additional Depositions of Plaintiffs and to Extend Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Completing Those Depositions filed by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 RESPONSE to Motion re #116 MOTION to Compel Lee Ann Savoia-McHugh to Appear for Continued Deposition filed by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER Setting Hearing - Pending before the Court are two Motions to Compel, one filed by Defendant Philip Krispin (ECF Doc. #116 ) and one filed by Defendant Eastern Union, LLC (ECF Doc. #117 ). ORDERED: The Court will conduct a hearing on Defendants' motions (ECF Docs. #116 , #117 ) on Thursday, 4/8/2021 @ 02:30 PM (CDT) in Courtroom 3 North of the United States District Courthouse, 1 North Palafox Street, Pensacola, Florida, 32502. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 3/24/2021. (mb)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #117 MOTION to Compel Additional Depositions of Plaintiffs and to Extend Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Completing Those Depositions. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (mb)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MOTION to Compel Additional Depositions of Plaintiffs and to Extend Discovery for the Limited Purpose of Completing Those Depositions by EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (ELEBASH, WILLIAM)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MOTION to Compel Lee Ann Savoia-McHugh to Appear for Continued Deposition by PHILIP KRISPIN. (DONOVAN, J)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #116 MOTION to Compel Lee Ann Savoia-McHugh to Appear for Continued Deposition. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (mb)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting #114 Plaintiff's Unopposed MOTION For Final Extension Of Discovery Cut-Off (to March 31,2021). The deadline to complete discovery is extended to 3/31/2021, as requested. The related deadlines to file dispositive motions and to complete mediation are extended accordingly. (The deadline to file potentially Dispositive Motions as well as daubert motions is due by 4/30/2021. Mediation to take place by 4/28/2021. Mediation Report due by 5/12/2021.) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/10/2021. (mb)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #114 Plaintiff's Unopposed MOTION For Final Extension Of Discovery Cutoff. (mb)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Plaintiff's Unopposed MOTION For Final Extension Of Discovery Cutoff. (BUTLER, JONATHAN) Modified on 2/10/2021 to correct docket text to match pdf filed (mb).
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER. Defendant Michael S. Glass's Motion to Set Aside Default, ECF No. #98 , is DENIED. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/10/2020. (mb)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER finding as moot #106 Motion to Compel and #107 Motion to Compel based on Plaintiffs' response filed at ECF Doc. #111 . Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 12/9/2020. (HTC)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #108 Order to Show Cause. (Responses not filed). (mb)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER. Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Eastern Unions Affirmative Defenses, ECF No. #75 , is DENIED. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/8/2020. (mb)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER. Plaintiffs' Motion to Quash and for Protective Order (ECF Doc. #102 ) is GRANTED. Defendant Eastern Union is directed to provide a copy of this Order to Verizon. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 11/30/2020. (mb)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Riverway Title Group and Breton Equity shall SHOW CAUSE, by December 7, 2020, why Plaintiffs' respective motions (ECF Doc. #106 for Riverway Title Group and ECF Doc. #107 for Breton Equity) should not be GRANTED. The clerk shall mail a copy of this Order to Riverway Title Group and Breton Equity at the following addresses: Riverway Title Group, LLC, 5 RiverwaySuite 300, Houston, TX 77056; Breton Equity Company Corp, Registered Agents, Inc., Registered Agent, 401 Ryland St., Suite 200-A, Reno, NV 89502. Plaintiffs shall email a copy of this Order to Riverway Title Group and Breton Equity. (Mailed ORDER to both parties as instructed). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 11/30/2020. (Show Cause Response due by 12/7/2020). (mb)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #107 MOTION to Compel /Enforce Subpoena and for Contempt (Breton), #106 Endorsed MOTION to Compel Enforce Subpoena and for Contempt. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (mb)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MOTION to Compel /Enforce Subpoena and for Contempt (Breton) by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Endorsed MOTION to Compel Enforce Subpoena and for Contempt by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #105 RESPONSE in Opposition re #102 MOTION for Protective Order and Motion to Quash Subpoena. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (mb)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 RESPONSE in Opposition re #102 MOTION for Protective Order and Motion to Quash Subpoena filed by EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC. (BERNSTEIN, MICHAEL)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #102 MOTION for Protective Order and Motion to Quash Subpoena. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (mb)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 REFERRAL AND ORDER granting #103 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The deadline to complete discovery is extended to 2/15/2021, as requested. The related deadlines to file dispositive motions and to complete mediation are extended accordingly. ( Dispositive Motions to be filed by 3/17/2021., Mediation Report due by 3/29/2021.). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/10/2020. (jcw)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #103 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (jcw)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC. (ELEBASH, WILLIAM)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Please disregard - entered in error. ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #102 MOTION for Protective Order and Motion to Quash Subpoena (mb) Modified on 11/17/2020 (mb).
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MOTION for Protective Order and Motion to Quash Subpoena by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #101 RESPONSE in Opposition re #98 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E). (mb)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 RESPONSE in Opposition re #98 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER. Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (ECF Doc. #84 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, as set forth herein. Defendant shall supplement its responses to the interrogatories and requests for production, as set forth herein, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order, unless otherwise agreed to by the parties. Plaintiff's request for sanctions is DENIED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 10/19/2020. (mb)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines re #100 ORDER. (Deadline for defendant to supplement its responses to interrogatories and requests for production due by 11/2/2020)). (mb)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON:Motion Hearing held on 10/14/2020 re #84 MOTION to Compel EASTERN UNION filed by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (Court Reporter Connie Morse, Wierzbicki.) (kli)
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MOTION to Set Aside Default by MICHAEL S GLASS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (HARRELL, DANIEL)
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #97 Response in Opposition re #64 MOTION, #98 MOTION to Set Aside Default. (mb)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 RESPONSE in Opposition re #64 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Michael Glass filed by MICHAEL S GLASS. (COUCH, MATTHEW)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #97 Response in Opposition to Motion. (sdw)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #96 NOTICE Pending Motion for Default Final Judgment. (sdw)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE Pending Motion for Default Final Judgment by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL EUGENE HARRELL on behalf of MICHAEL S GLASS (HARRELL, DANIEL)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER SETTING HEARING re Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery From and For Sanctions Against Defendant Eastern Union Funding, LLC. ECF Doc. #84 . The Court will conduct a hearing on Plaintiffs' motion on Wednesday, October 14, 2020, at 2:30 p.m. (CDT) in Courtroom 3 North of the United States District Courthouse, 1 North Palafox Street, Pensacola, Florida, 32502. Any party desiring the services of a court reporter will be responsible for procuring such services. Should the parties resolve this matter before the hearing, or otherwise narrow the issues to be heard, they shall promptly inform the Court in advance of the hearing date. Any party wishing to attend the hearing telephonically should contact the undersigned's chambers to make appropriate arrangements. (Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2020 @ 02:30 PM in U.S. Courthouse Pensacola before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON. (mb)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER denying #89 Plaintiffs' motion in the alternative to alter sequence of discovery. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 10/5/2020. (HTC)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER denying #87 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 10/05/2020. (Ross, Ashley)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #91 RESPONSE in Opposition re #84 MOTION to Compel EASTERN UNION. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (mb)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 RESPONSE in Opposition re #84 MOTION to Compel EASTERN UNION filed by EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC. (ELEBASH, WILLIAM)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 RESPONSE in Opposition re #89 MOTION for Discovery MOTION IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO ALTER SEQUENCE OF DISCOVERY filed by EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC. (BERNSTEIN, MICHAEL)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #89 MOTION IN THE ALTERNATIVETO ALTER SEQUENCE OF DISCOVERY. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (mb)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #90 RESPONSE in Opposition re #89 MOTION for Discovery MOTION IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO ALTER SEQUENCE OF DISCOVERY. (mb)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO ALTER SEQUENCE OF DISCOVERY, by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #88 Response in Opposition to #87 MOTION for Protective Order . Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (mb)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 RESPONSE in Opposition re #87 MOTION for Protective Order filed by EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC. (BERNSTEIN, MICHAEL)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MOTION for Protective Order by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER. Plaintiff's motion to compel as to Defendant Michael Glass (ECF Doc. #71 ) is GRANTED. Defendant Glass must provide full and complete discovery responses to Plaintiffs within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order. The clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Defendant Glass at the address set forth in the affidavit of service for Defendant Glass (ECF Doc. #15 ). Defendant Glass's failure to comply with this order may result in a finding of contempt or other sanctions as the Court may deem appropriate. (Copy of Order mailed as instructed to Defendant GLASS). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 9/22/2020. (mb)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 RESPONSE in Opposition re #75 MOTION to Strike Eastern Union's Affirmative Defenses filed by EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC. (BERNSTEIN, MICHAEL)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #71 MOTION to Compel Michael Glass. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (sdw)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #85 RESPONSE in Opposition re #75 MOTION to Strike Eastern Union's Affirmative Defenses filed by EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC. (mb)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #84 MOTION to Compel EASTERN UNION. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (mb)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MOTION to Compel EASTERN UNION by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L) (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER finding as moot #73 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 09/18/2020. (HTC)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #82 Response in Opposition to Motion. (jcw)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 RESPONSE in Opposition re #73 MOTION to Compel Philip Krispin filed by PHILIP KRISPIN. (DONOVAN, J)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena for Deposition served on Nexus Capital on 08/25/20, filed by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER. The Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing, ECF No. #78 , is GRANTED. Kevin J. Nash, of the law firm of Goldberg Weprin Finkel Goldstein LLP, is admitted pro hac vice to represent the Defendant, Philip Krispin, pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(C). (Appointed KEVIN J NASH for PHILIP KRISPIN). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 19-2018. (mb)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER. The Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, andRequest to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing, ECF No. #77 , isGRANTED. J. Ted Donovan, of the law firm of Goldberg Weprin Finkel GoldsteinLLP, is admitted pro hac vice to represent the Defendant, Philip Krispin, pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(C). (Appointed J TED DONOVAN for PHILIP KRISPIN). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/11/2020. (mb)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #78 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin J. Nash. (Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5643372.), #77 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Ted Donovan. (Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5643355.) (mb)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin J. Nash.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5643372.) by PHILIP KRISPIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (BARNETT, ELEANOR)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Ted Donovan.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-5643355.) by PHILIP KRISPIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (BARNETT, ELEANOR)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #74 Joint MOTION for Additional Extension Of Time, as requested. The discovery deadline is extended to 12/4/2020, and all deadlines calculated from the discovery deadline are likewise extended. (Dispositive Motions to be filed by 1/4/2021. Mediation to take place by 1/2/2021. Mediation Report due by 1/16/2021. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/9/2020. (mb)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MOTION to Strike Eastern Union's Affirmative Defenses by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 9/22/2020). (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #74 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (mb)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MOTION to Compel Philip Krispin by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #73 MOTION to Compel Philip Krispin. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (mb)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER denying without prejudice #67 Motion to Compel. The hearing set before the undersigned for September 9, 2020, is CANCELED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 09/02/2020. (alb)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MOTION to Compel Michael Glass by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 RESPONSE in Opposition re #67 MOTION to Compel filed by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #70 Response in Opposition re #67 Motion to Compel. (Hearing set for 9/9/2020 @ 2:00pm). (mb)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER SETTING HEARING. The Court will conduct a hearing on Defendant Eastern Union's #67 motion on 9/9/2020 at 02:00 PM . Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 08/24/2020. (sdw)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 11/18/2020. Mediation to take place by 11/16/2020. Mediation Report due by 11/30/2020. (deadlines reset due to new discovery deadline) (sdw)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ANSWER to #44 Amended Complaint by EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC. (ELEBASH, WILLIAM)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines re #66 Order. Discovery due by 10/19/2020. (sdw)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #67 MOTION to Compel . Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (sdw)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION to Compel by EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (ELEBASH, WILLIAM)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER. Eastern Union Funding LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, ECF No. #47 , is GRANTED in part as to Count 14 and Count 28, which are DISMISSED as against Eastern Union, and in all other respects, the motion is DENIED. Eastern Union has fourteen (14) days to file an Answer. McCrary and Santa Fe's First Amended and Restated Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, ECF No. #46 , is GRANTED. Count 28 against McCrary and Santa Fe is DISMISSED for lack of personal jurisdiction. Pursuant to a prior Order extending deadlines, ECF No. #62 , the discovery deadline is 60 days after the close of pleadings, which will be the date of Eastern Union's Answer. (Eastern Union's Answer due by 8/19/2020.) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 08/05/2020. (sdw)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to MICHAEL S GLASS. (sdw)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Michael Glass by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 7/23/2020). (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM LEE ELEBASH on behalf of EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC (ELEBASH, WILLIAM)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #61 Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery Deadline. Written Discovery is due by August 6, 2020, and the discovery deadline is extended to sixty (60) days after the close of pleadings. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 06/03/2020. (sdw)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Dealine by EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC, PHILIP KRISPIN, JOHN W MCCRARY, SANTA FE CAPITAL LLC. (BERNSTEIN, MICHAEL)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #61 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Dealine. (sdw)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 4 IN RE: MODIFICATION TO FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE M. CASEY RODGERS. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 05/13/2020. (wlm)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER IN RE: MODIFICATION TO FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE M. CASEY RODGERS. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 04/02/2020. (wlm)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER OF CLARIFICATION. IN RE: MODIFICATION TO FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE M. CASEY RODGERS. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/13/2020. (djb)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER. IN RE: MODIFICATION TO FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE M. CASEY RODGERS. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/12/2020. (djb)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #55 STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURES. Plaintiffs' expert disclosures are due within 30 days after the Answers are filed, Defendants' expert disclosures are due within 60 days after the Answers are filed. The earlier-filed motions, ECF Nos. #53 and #54 , are MOOT. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/12/2020. (sdw)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #55 Joint MOTION to Extend Time to file Expert Witness Reports. (sdw)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Joint MOTION to Extend Timeto file Expert Witness Reports by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines re #54 MOTION for Joinder. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 3/16/2020.) (sdw)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION for Joinder by PHILIP KRISPIN. (BARNETT, ELEANOR)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines re #53 MOTION to Extend Time to Disclose Expert Witnesses and Reports. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 3/13/2020.) (sdw)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION to Extend Time to Disclose Expert Witnesses and Reports by EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC. (BERNSTEIN, MICHAEL)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #47 MOTION to Dismiss AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 RESPONSE to Motion re #46 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #47 MOTION to Dismiss AMENDED COMPLAINT, #51 Response to Motion, #52 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #46 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (sdw)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL re #49 Joint Report. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 7/6/2020. Discovery due by 6/5/2020. Mediation to take place by 7/3/2020. Mediation Report due by 7/17/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/21/2019. (sdw)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #49 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (sdw)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ANSWER to #44 Amended Complaint by PHILIP KRISPIN. (BARNETT, ELEANOR)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss AMENDED COMPLAINT by EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 12/2/2019). (BERNSTEIN, MICHAEL)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by JOHN W MCCRARY, SANTA FE CAPITAL LLC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 12/2/2019). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting First Amended and Restated Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) (GREEN, WILLIAM)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #43 Motion to Amend. The First Amended Complaint, ECF No. #44 , is now the operative pleading. The Clerk is directed to update the case caption consistent with the First Amended Complaint. The pending motions to dismiss the Complaint, ECF Nos. #19 and #25 , are DENIED as MOOT, without prejudice to refiling in response to the First Amended Complaint. All Defendants are required to respond to the First Amended Complaint within 14 after service of the First Amended Complaint. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/5/2019. (sdw)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #43 MOTION to Amend. (sdw)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH, JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION to Amend/Correct #41 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by PHILIP KRISPIN. (BARNETT, ELEANOR)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER. The Plaintiffs have fourteen (14) days to supplement or amend the Complaint with clear allegations of the citizenship of each member of each Defendant LLC. The Court will defer ruling on the pending motions until satisfied that diversity jurisdiction is met. (Amended Complaint/Supplement due by 11/4/2019.) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/21/2019. (sdw)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting #39 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint. PHILIP KRISPIN answer due 10/28/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/18/2019. (alb)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #39 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint (Unopposed) (alb)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint (Unopposed) by PHILIP KRISPIN. (BARNETT, ELEANOR)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint NOT served on Waterfall Group, LLC, filed by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #36 NOTICE OF FILING DECLARATION, #37 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. (sdw)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE OF FILING DECLARATION by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE Plaintiffs' Certificate of Interested Parties by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (BUTLER, JONATHAN) Modified on 10/7/2019 to edit title of document (sdw).
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 10/18/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/18/2019. Discovery due by 4/3/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/4/2019. (sdw)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint (Unopposed) filed by PHILIP KRISPIN. (Answer due by 10/21/2019.) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/4/2019. (sdw)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #28 First MOTION to Extend Time (Unopposed) filed by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (Response to motion due by 10/15/2019.) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/4/2019. (sdw)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by SANTA FE CAPITAL LLC. (GREEN, WILLIAM)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint (Unopposed) by PHILIP KRISPIN. (BARNETT, ELEANOR)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by ELEANOR T BARNETT on behalf of PHILIP KRISPIN (BARNETT, ELEANOR)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 First MOTION to Extend Time(Unopposed) by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint (Unopposed), #28 First MOTION to Extend Time to File Response to Motion (Unopposed). (sdw)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Eastern Union filed by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, #27 Response to Motion. (sdw)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #20 Summons Issued (Krispin) Acknowledgment filed by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by JOHN W MCCRARY, SANTA FE CAPITAL LLC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 10/7/2019). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of John McCrary, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Dismiss) (GREEN, WILLIAM)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/19/2019. (Response to motion due by 10/1/2019.) (djb)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William T. Green, III. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/19/2019. (sdw)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (Unopposed Motion) by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #22 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (Unopposed Motion). (sdw)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William T. Green, III.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4625131.) by JOHN W MCCRARY, SANTA FE CAPITAL LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order proposed order) (GREEN, WILLIAM)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William T. Green, III. (sdw)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Summons Issued as to PHILIP KRISPIN. (sdw)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 9/20/2019). (BERNSTEIN, MICHAEL)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC. (Answer due by 9/6/2019.) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/28/2019. (sdw)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #6 Summons Issued EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC Acknowledgment filed by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #7 Summons Issued TO SANTE FE CAPITAL LLC Acknowledgment filed by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #7 Summons Issued TO MICHAEL S GLASS Acknowledgment filed by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #7 Summons Issued TO JOHN MCCRARY Acknowledgment filed by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #7 Summons Issued TO WATERFALL LLC Acknowledgment filed by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH. (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH re #1 Complaint (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint . (sdw)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC. (BERNSTEIN, MICHAEL)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint filed by EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC. (Answer due by 9/2/2019.) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/12/2019. (sdw)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC. (BERNSTEIN, MICHAEL)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC. (BERNSTEIN, MICHAEL)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint . (sdw)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to MICHAEL S GLASS, JOHN W MCCRARY, SANTA FE CAPITAL LLC, WATERFALL GROUP LLC, and WATERFALL LLC. (sdw)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to EASTERN UNION FUNDING LLC. (sdw)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF SUMMONSES TO BE ISSUED by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED by JOHN SAVOIA-MCHUGH, LEE ANNE SAVOIA-MCHUGH (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (sdw)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BUTLER, JONATHAN)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4546935.), filed by Lee Anne Savoia-McHugh, John Savoia-McHugh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (BUTLER, JONATHAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAVOIA-MCHUGH et al. v. GLASS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W McCrary
Represented By: WILLIAM T GREEN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael S Glass
Represented By: MATTHEW MCDONNELL COUCH
Represented By: DANIEL EUGENE HARRELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Krispin
Represented By: J TED DONOVAN
Represented By: KEVIN J NASH
Represented By: ELEANOR T BARNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Fe Capital LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM T GREEN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waterfall LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waterfall Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastern Union Funding LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL IRA BERNSTEIN
Represented By: JORDAN CHARLES KAPLAN
Represented By: CHARLES THOMAS WIGGINS
Represented By: WILLIAM LEE ELEBASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Anne Savoia-McHugh
Represented By: JONATHAN BRENNAN BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Savoia-McHugh
Represented By: JONATHAN BRENNAN BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?