LOVELACE v BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC et al
Plaintiff: JERRY CONRAD LOVELACE, JR.
Defendant: BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC and BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2019cv02115
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by HOWARD L NATIONS on behalf of JERRY CONRAD LOVELACE, JR (Attachments: #1 04/09/2019 Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission for Howard L. Nations) (NATIONS, HOWARD)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Counsel of Record. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/23/2019. Added attorney JESSICA MARIE KENNEDY, SARAH A LONG for BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY, BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC. (djb)
July 23, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Catherine Pyune McEldowney and Don Keller Haycraft and Substitute Counsel of Record (djb)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Catherine Pyune McEldowney and Don Keller Haycraft and Substitute Counsel of Record by BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY, BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC. (MCDONALD, FRANCIS)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-10919. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case transferred to Northern District of Florida. IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 7/16/2019.(pp)(NEF:HON. CARL J. BARBIER) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 Statement by All Defendants Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED THAT, no later than May 1, 2019, plaintiffs in the attached lists must provide full and complete initial disclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiffs and their counsel must appear in person before Judge Barbier to show cause why their cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.37(b)(2)(A)(v). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, as to all of the listed cases in which plaintiffs produce full and complete disclosures in compliance with this order, the deadline by which the parties must submit their venue filing is extended to no later than June 1, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 4/4/2019.(mmv) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7230868) filed by Jerry Conrad Lovelace, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Jerry Conrad Lovelace, Jr(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LOVELACE v BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC
Represented By: KEVIN MICHAEL HODGES
Represented By: JESSICA MARIE KENNEDY
Represented By: FRANCIS M MCDONALD, JR
Represented By: SARAH A LONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Represented By: KEVIN MICHAEL HODGES
Represented By: JESSICA MARIE KENNEDY
Represented By: FRANCIS M MCDONALD, JR
Represented By: SARAH A LONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERRY CONRAD LOVELACE, JR.
Represented By: HOWARD L NATIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?