MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES INC v. GRIFFIN TRAFFIC SIGNALS INC et al
Plaintiff: MCI Communications Services, Inc. and MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES INC
Defendant: Murdock Investments, LLC, Griffin Traffic Signals, Inc., MURDOCK INVESTMENTS LLC and GRIFFIN TRAFFIC SIGNALS INC
Case Number: 3:2019cv02256
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: ROGER VINSON
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by MURDOCK INVESTMENTS LLC. (NIXON, FAITH ANN)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Each non-governmental corporate party must file a statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock or states that there is no such corporation. The deadline for filing the statement is set forth in Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, and, if not filed sooner, the statement must in any event be filed within 14 days of the date of the scheduling order. The deadline expired on 9/10/2019. A corporate disclosure statement must be filed no later than 9/17/2019. Clerk to notify chambers on 9/17/2019. (MB)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 9/10/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/10/2019. Discovery due by 1/23/2020. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 8/27/2019. (MB)
August 27, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re: #6 Answer to Complaint (please see proposed ISO). (MB)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by KELSEY KATHERINE STONE on behalf of GRIFFIN TRAFFIC SIGNALS INC (STONE, KELSEY)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by GRIFFIN TRAFFIC SIGNALS INC. (COUCH, MATTHEW)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by GRIFFIN TRAFFIC SIGNALS INC. (COUCH, MATTHEW)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to GRIFFIN TRAFFIC SIGNALS INC, (Attachments: #1 MURDOCK INVESTMENTS, LLC). (MB)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (MB)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by MCI Communications Services, Inc.. (PROSZEK, JAMES)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (PROSZEK, JAMES)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Griffin Traffic Signals, Inc., Murdock Investments, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4560454.), filed by MCI Communications Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons (Griffin Traffic Signals, Inc.), #2 Summons (Murdock Investments, LLC)) (PROSZEK, JAMES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES INC v. GRIFFIN TRAFFIC SIGNALS INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murdock Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Griffin Traffic Signals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MURDOCK INVESTMENTS LLC
Represented By: FAITH ANN PATE NIXON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRIFFIN TRAFFIC SIGNALS INC
Represented By: KELSEY KATHERINE STONE
Represented By: MATTHEW MCDONNELL COUCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCI Communications Services, Inc.
Represented By: JAMES JOHN PROSZEK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES INC
Represented By: JAMES JOHN PROSZEK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?