ROSADO v. KENT PRECISION FOODS GROUP INC
Defendant: Kent Precisions Foods Group, Inc. and KENT PRECISIONS FOODS GROUP INC
Petitioner: Daniel Rosado
Case Number: 3:2019cv02834
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by KENT PRECISIONS FOODS GROUP INC. (WHITE, ADAM)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 9/5/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/7/2019. Discovery due by 2/18/2020. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/22/2019. (MB)
August 21, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #6 Answer to Complaint (please see proposed ISO). (MB)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 Answer and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to #1 Complaint by KENT PRECISIONS FOODS GROUP INC. (WHITE, ADAM)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Kent Precision Foods Group, Inc. (alb)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Pursuant to N.D. Fla. Loc. R. 5.2, a complete and executed Civil Cover Sheet is required in each civil case filed. Please file the civil cover sheet using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings," "Other Documents." (alb)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (alb)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE Summons for Kent Precision Foods Group, Inc. by Daniel Rosado re #1 Complaint (SMITH, GARY)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kent Precisions Foods Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4569137.), filed by Daniel Rosado. (SMITH, GARY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROSADO v. KENT PRECISION FOODS GROUP INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Rosado
Represented By: GARY EUGENE SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Precisions Foods Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENT PRECISIONS FOODS GROUP INC
Represented By: ADAM JOSEPH TW WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?