GARLAND v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: SHERRINE GARLAND
Defendant: OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY and OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Case Number: 3:2019cv02902
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
2 Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE Waiver of Service of Summons - Bristol-Myers Squibb by SHERRINE GARLAND (FENNER, DIANE)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, #1 OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, #2 OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (djb)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Filer for future reference please use civil event "Notice - Other...," to attach summons to be issued or attach the summons to the complaint. Re #2 Civil Cover Sheet (djb)
August 2, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #4 Notice Plaintiff's Counsel Certification (djb)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE Plaintiff's Counsel Certification by SHERRINE GARLAND (FENNER, DIANE)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Filer - MDL cases originating in the same district as the master MDL Docket are referred to as direct file MDL cases. When filing a direct complaint please choose origin code, 8 Multidistrict Litigation - Direct File. The code has been added to the civil cover sheet, (JS 44 (Rev. 06/17). Please also note that the first party defendant name, BRISOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, should be entered in the case data. Clerk will correct origin code and party name. (djb)
August 1, 2019 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY no longer assigned to case. (djb)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Attachments: #1 SUMMONS FOR OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., #2 SUMMONS FOR OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., #3 SUMMONS FOR BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY) (FENNER, DIANE)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4574920.), filed by SHERRINE GARLAND. (FENNER, DIANE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GARLAND v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERRINE GARLAND
Represented By: DIANE FENNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?