SCOTT v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: TIFFANY SCOTT
Defendant: OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD and BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2019cv02915
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
2 Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney without Substitution and MOTION to Withdraw Counsel's Certification (djb)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney without Substitution, First MOTION to Withdraw Counsel's Certification by TIFFANY SCOTT. (FENNER, DIANE)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE Waiver of Service of Summons - Bristol-Myers Squibb by TIFFANY SCOTT (FENNER, DIANE)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, #1 OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, #2 OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (djb)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: NOTICE TO FILER As a Reminder - Notice to Filer - MDL cases originating in the same district as the master MDL Docket are referred to as direct file MDL cases. When filing a direct complaint please choose origin code, 8 Multidistrict Litigation - Direct File. The code has been added to the civil cover sheet, (JS 44 (Rev. 06/17). Clerk will correct origin code. (djb)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE Plaintiff's Counsel Certification by TIFFANY SCOTT (FENNER, DIANE)
August 1, 2019 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY no longer assigned to case. (djb)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Attachments: #1 SUMMONS FOR BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, #2 SUMMONS FOR OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., #3 SUMMONS FOR OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.) (FENNER, DIANE)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4575232.), filed by TIFFANY SCOTT. (FENNER, DIANE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCOTT v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIFFANY SCOTT
Represented By: DIANE FENNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?