GALFORD et al v. 3M COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: ERNEST COLE, CHRISTOPHER FOWLER, KEVIN WALSH, MICHAEL HODGES, RONALD BOSHANE, BRIAN WILLIAMSON, DAVID BAYSDEN, MARK CRONIN, KEVIN BRAMLETT, BRIAN EHLSCHLAGER, HUNTER DUNLAP, ADAM JUSTESEN, SHONTE WOOTEN, COLE DELLINGER, KRISTOPHER KESTER, SHAWN REED, WILLIAM COLLINS, JOSEPH HUFFMAN, LEVI DULL, WILLIAM DOUGHERTY, JOSHUA BRIGGS, WESLEY DODD, GEORGE TANNER, RYAN DENTON, DANIEL BARFIELD, SCOTT JOHNSON, CURTIS EDENFIELD, JAMES BECK, RICHARD WILKEY, MICHAEL KEDDY, JASON GORFINKLE, JEFFREY SALGUERO, JOHNATHAN STATON, CHRISTOPHER HOLMES, CHRISTOPHER ROBERTSON, BRAULIO RIVERA, ENOCH MASSINGALE, THOMAS HUNTER, MICHAEL SELLERS, DANIEL POLASKI, HAROLD TRAPIER, CHRISTOPHER HOPSON, JUAN RODRIGUEZ, ROBERT BROWN, ADAM HERBST, JASON FITZKE, ERNIE REITZ, WILLIAM LUCAS, TAYLOR WELLENDORF, CHAZ MCMAHON, ADAM DAVIS, JOHN SHELL, MELANIE MCGALLIARD, CHRISTOPHER YALE, ZACKARY LEBER, RUDOLPH PELT, JOHN FORD, MICHAEL CANNON, DANIEL RICE, JOSEPH CZERNEK, JOEL GALFORD, ANTHONY OLLISON, NATHAN KELLEY, EMMANUEL LOCKLEAR, ANTHONY FLORES, MICHAEL HEATH, JAMES MORRIS, JR, JEFFREY ROYSTER, BRIAN HILL, JASON PITTSLEY, KYREEN KELLY, MICHAEL KIMBLE, MICHAEL SWARTZ, BRANDON KING, JOHNATHON REEDER, JASON THORPE, TALON SHARPE, JOSEPH OLEKSAK, ANTONIO JAMES, JACOB KERR, JOHNNELL MURRILL, KEAONA MACK, ANTUAN MCMILLION, ALSTON WOODS, MICHAEL AVELLINO, JOSHUA NEGRON, KEVIN GRANT, RASHID HENDRICKS, JOAHUA SATTERFIELD, JOSHUA CHAMPLIN, PHILIP BODINE, JASON HORTON, RAYMOND LANE, NATHAN ROBBINS and MATTHEW MCLOCKLIN
Defendant: 3M COMPANY and AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv03058
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION to all counsel of record who are not admitted to the FLND. re #9 Case Transferred In - District Transfer (djb)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-02023. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-24) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/15/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. Aearo LLC, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of Aearo Intermediate LLC, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of Aearo Holding LLC, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of 3M Occupational Safety LLC, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of 3M Company. (Rashid, Faris) Modified text on 8/2/2019 (MMP). [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/15/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Aearo Technologies, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal. (Rashid, Faris) Modified text on 8/2/2019 (MMP). [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/15/2019.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Mikal C. Watts, Francisco Guerra IV, Erin Rogiers, Paul Danziger, Rodrigo R. de Llano as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/15/2019.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-2023 ECT/TNL. (CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/15/2019.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/15/2019.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/15/2019.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County, case number 27-cv-19-12601 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7028765) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GALFORD et al v. 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERNEST COLE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER FOWLER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN WALSH
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL HODGES
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD BOSHANE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN WILLIAMSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID BAYSDEN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK CRONIN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN BRAMLETT
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN EHLSCHLAGER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUNTER DUNLAP
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM JUSTESEN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHONTE WOOTEN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLE DELLINGER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISTOPHER KESTER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAWN REED
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM COLLINS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH HUFFMAN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEVI DULL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM DOUGHERTY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA BRIGGS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESLEY DODD
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE TANNER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN DENTON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL BARFIELD
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT JOHNSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CURTIS EDENFIELD
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES BECK
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD WILKEY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL KEDDY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON GORFINKLE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY SALGUERO
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHNATHAN STATON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER HOLMES
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER ROBERTSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRAULIO RIVERA
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENOCH MASSINGALE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS HUNTER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL SELLERS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL POLASKI
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAROLD TRAPIER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER HOPSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUAN RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT BROWN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM HERBST
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON FITZKE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERNIE REITZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM LUCAS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAYLOR WELLENDORF
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHAZ MCMAHON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM DAVIS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN SHELL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELANIE MCGALLIARD
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER YALE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZACKARY LEBER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUDOLPH PELT
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN FORD
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL CANNON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL RICE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH CZERNEK
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOEL GALFORD
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY OLLISON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATHAN KELLEY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMMANUEL LOCKLEAR
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY FLORES
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL HEATH
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES MORRIS, JR
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY ROYSTER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN HILL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON PITTSLEY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KYREEN KELLY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL KIMBLE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL SWARTZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON KING
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHNATHON REEDER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON THORPE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TALON SHARPE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH OLEKSAK
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTONIO JAMES
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACOB KERR
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHNNELL MURRILL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEAONA MACK
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTUAN MCMILLION
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALSTON WOODS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL AVELLINO
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA NEGRON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN GRANT
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RASHID HENDRICKS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOAHUA SATTERFIELD
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA CHAMPLIN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILIP BODINE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON HORTON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAYMOND LANE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATHAN ROBBINS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW MCLOCKLIN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: BENJAMIN W HULSE
Represented By: JERRY W BLACKWELL
Represented By: S Jamal Faleel
Represented By: KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Represented By: KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?