INFANTE et al v. 3M COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: GRETCHEN BRAY, JOSHUA CASH, HERIBERTO ESPINOZA, MARCOS PLACERES, MARIO GONZALES, MARIO RODRIGUEZ, BRIAN SANDOLPH, JEFFREY ROBERTSON, DAVID SOWARDS, ROBERT STICKLAND, JOSEPH FIORE, HERNAN SALINAS, PHILLIP CROW, CHRISTOPHER BRAND, BRIAN CASTANEDA, JOSEPH MILLER, KEITH YORK, MARCUS RAMIREZ, DAVID PAYNE, MICHAEL WEBER, TREVOR COBB, KIRK CREGER, JORDAN RIVAS, CHARLES VALENTINE, SEDAIA TUCKER, JEREMY ESTEP, JONATHAN NINNEMAN, TIMOTHY HATCH, KATIE SASSER, PETER SUNDBERG, RICHARD AUBREY, BARRY ANDERSON, MARCUS OHLENFORST, JARROD SUMTER, ROBERT VILLALPANDO, JIMMY GOMEZ, JORGE AVALOS, PAUL MORENO, ANSEL TYNDALL, KENNETH MOORE, ERIK BYRD, RONALD PAYNE, ADAM JUNEMANN, JOSEPH SILVA, RUBEN LOPEZ, MONTE PALMER, JAMES COX, JOSEPH BYRNE, MARQUEENA MOORE, MICHAEL HEISLER, AARON HERD, STEPHEN SCHUELLER, KARL CLARK, FORREST SMILEY, TIMOTHY TAYLOR, WILLIAM STUCKEY, ALFREDO MANCILLAS, JOHN WOODWARD, TYLER FOSTER, ADAM GAYTAN, MARTIN BERNARDO, MATTHEW BUSHNELL, LUIS MORENO, ROBERT GONZALEZ, MONA INFANTE, WILLIAM HOSKINS, RODEY ORTIZ, RUSSELL VIDLER, JOSE ELIZONDO, RYAN SONNACK, ATINESH LAL, JORGE MARIN, BENNIE MONTEZ, MARIO FARROW and SAMANTHA RIVAS
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC and 3M COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2019cv03132
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #12 MOTION to Remand , #14 Response in Opposition to Motion, #16 Sealed Document - X, #19 Reply to Response to Motion (djb)
September 29, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Remand , #13 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by BARRY ANDERSON, RICHARD AUBREY, JORGE AVALOS, MARTIN BERNARDO, CHRISTOPHER BRAND, GRETCHEN BRAY, MATTHEW BUSHNELL, ERIK BYRD, JOSEPH BYRNE, JOSHUA CASH, BRIAN CASTANEDA, KARL CLARK, TREVOR COBB, JAMES COX, KIRK CREGER, PHILLIP CROW, JOSE ELIZONDO, HERIBERTO ESPINOZA, JEREMY ESTEP, MARIO FARROW, JOSEPH FIORE, TYLER FOSTER, ADAM GAYTAN, JIMMY GOMEZ, MARIO GONZALES, ROBERT GONZALEZ, TIMOTHY HATCH, MICHAEL HEISLER, AARON HERD, WILLIAM HOSKINS, MONA INFANTE, ADAM JUNEMANN, ATINESH LAL, RUBEN LOPEZ, ALFREDO MANCILLAS, JORGE MARIN, JOSEPH MILLER, BENNIE MONTEZ, KENNETH MOORE, MARQUEENA MOORE, LUIS MORENO, PAUL MORENO, JONATHAN NINNEMAN, MARCUS OHLENFORST, RODEY ORTIZ, MONTE PALMER, DAVID PAYNE, RONALD PAYNE, MARCOS PLACERES, MARCUS RAMIREZ, JORDAN RIVAS, SAMANTHA RIVAS, JEFFREY ROBERTSON, MARIO RODRIGUEZ, HERNAN SALINAS, BRIAN SANDOLPH, KATIE SASSER, STEPHEN SCHUELLER, JOSEPH SILVA, FORREST SMILEY, RYAN SONNACK, DAVID SOWARDS, ROBERT STICKLAND, WILLIAM STUCKEY, JARROD SUMTER, PETER SUNDBERG, TIMOTHY TAYLOR, SEDAIA TUCKER, ANSEL TYNDALL, CHARLES VALENTINE, RUSSELL VIDLER, ROBERT VILLALPANDO, MICHAEL WEBER, JOHN WOODWARD, KEITH YORK. (WATTS, MIKAL)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to File a Reply. Reply memoranda are due by September 30, 2019 and must not exceed 5,000 words. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/23/2019. (djb)
September 23, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #17 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support, re #16 Sealed Document - X, #14 Response in Opposition to Motion, #12 MOTION to Remand (djb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File re #16 Sealed Document - X, #14 Response in Opposition to Motion, #12 MOTION to Remand Reply Memorandum in Support by BARRY ANDERSON, RICHARD AUBREY, JORGE AVALOS, MARTIN BERNARDO, CHRISTOPHER BRAND, GRETCHEN BRAY, MATTHEW BUSHNELL, ERIK BYRD, JOSEPH BYRNE, JOSHUA CASH, BRIAN CASTANEDA, KARL CLARK, TREVOR COBB, JAMES COX, KIRK CREGER, PHILLIP CROW, JOSE ELIZONDO, HERIBERTO ESPINOZA, JEREMY ESTEP, MARIO FARROW, JOSEPH FIORE, TYLER FOSTER, ADAM GAYTAN, JIMMY GOMEZ, MARIO GONZALES, ROBERT GONZALEZ, TIMOTHY HATCH, MICHAEL HEISLER, AARON HERD, WILLIAM HOSKINS, MONA INFANTE, ADAM JUNEMANN, ATINESH LAL, RUBEN LOPEZ, ALFREDO MANCILLAS, JORGE MARIN, JOSEPH MILLER, BENNIE MONTEZ, KENNETH MOORE, MARQUEENA MOORE, LUIS MORENO, PAUL MORENO, JONATHAN NINNEMAN, MARCUS OHLENFORST, RODEY ORTIZ, MONTE PALMER, DAVID PAYNE, RONALD PAYNE, MARCOS PLACERES, MARCUS RAMIREZ, JORDAN RIVAS, SAMANTHA RIVAS, JEFFREY ROBERTSON, MARIO RODRIGUEZ, HERNAN SALINAS, BRIAN SANDOLPH, KATIE SASSER, STEPHEN SCHUELLER, JOSEPH SILVA, FORREST SMILEY, RYAN SONNACK, DAVID SOWARDS, ROBERT STICKLAND, WILLIAM STUCKEY, JARROD SUMTER, PETER SUNDBERG, TIMOTHY TAYLOR, SEDAIA TUCKER, ANSEL TYNDALL, CHARLES VALENTINE, RUSSELL VIDLER, ROBERT VILLALPANDO, MICHAEL WEBER, JOHN WOODWARD, KEITH YORK. (WATTS, MIKAL)
September 13, 2019 Filing 16 Sealed Response. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (sdw)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. These matters are before the Court on Defendants' motions for leave to file under seal their responses to the motions to remand pending in the referenced cases. For good cause shown, Defendants' motions are GRANTED, as requested. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/13/2019. (sdw)
September 12, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand [Public Version] filed by 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Simon Gottlieb, #2 Exhibits 1-10 (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 11) (BRANSCOME, KIMBERLY)
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (BRANSCOME, KIMBERLY)
August 29, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Remand . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 9/12/2019). (djb)
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand by BARRY ANDERSON, RICHARD AUBREY, JORGE AVALOS, MARTIN BERNARDO, CHRISTOPHER BRAND, GRETCHEN BRAY, MATTHEW BUSHNELL, ERIK BYRD, JOSEPH BYRNE, JOSHUA CASH, BRIAN CASTANEDA, KARL CLARK, TREVOR COBB, JAMES COX, KIRK CREGER, PHILLIP CROW, JOSE ELIZONDO, HERIBERTO ESPINOZA, JEREMY ESTEP, MARIO FARROW, JOSEPH FIORE, TYLER FOSTER, ADAM GAYTAN, JIMMY GOMEZ, MARIO GONZALES, ROBERT GONZALEZ, TIMOTHY HATCH, MICHAEL HEISLER, AARON HERD, WILLIAM HOSKINS, MONA INFANTE, ADAM JUNEMANN, ATINESH LAL, RUBEN LOPEZ, ALFREDO MANCILLAS, JORGE MARIN, JOSEPH MILLER, BENNIE MONTEZ, KENNETH MOORE, MARQUEENA MOORE, LUIS MORENO, PAUL MORENO, JONATHAN NINNEMAN, MARCUS OHLENFORST, RODEY ORTIZ, MONTE PALMER, DAVID PAYNE, RONALD PAYNE, MARCOS PLACERES, MARCUS RAMIREZ, JORDAN RIVAS, SAMANTHA RIVAS, JEFFREY ROBERTSON, MARIO RODRIGUEZ, HERNAN SALINAS, BRIAN SANDOLPH, KATIE SASSER, STEPHEN SCHUELLER, JOSEPH SILVA, FORREST SMILEY, RYAN SONNACK, DAVID SOWARDS, ROBERT STICKLAND, WILLIAM STUCKEY, JARROD SUMTER, PETER SUNDBERG, TIMOTHY TAYLOR, SEDAIA TUCKER, ANSEL TYNDALL, CHARLES VALENTINE, RUSSELL VIDLER, ROBERT VILLALPANDO, MICHAEL WEBER, JOHN WOODWARD, KEITH YORK. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (WATTS, MIKAL)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by MIKAL WATTS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (WATTS, MIKAL)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION (djb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-02067. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-25) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/16/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/16/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Aearo Technologies, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/16/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 19-cv-2067 SRN/KMM. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/16/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Mikal C. Watts, Francisco Guerra IV, Erin Rogiers as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/16/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/16/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/16/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County, case number N/A (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7035628) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INFANTE et al v. 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRETCHEN BRAY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA CASH
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HERIBERTO ESPINOZA
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCOS PLACERES
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIO GONZALES
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIO RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN SANDOLPH
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY ROBERTSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID SOWARDS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT STICKLAND
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH FIORE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HERNAN SALINAS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILLIP CROW
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER BRAND
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN CASTANEDA
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH MILLER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEITH YORK
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCUS RAMIREZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID PAYNE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL WEBER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TREVOR COBB
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIRK CREGER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORDAN RIVAS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES VALENTINE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEDAIA TUCKER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMY ESTEP
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN NINNEMAN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY HATCH
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATIE SASSER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PETER SUNDBERG
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD AUBREY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARRY ANDERSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCUS OHLENFORST
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JARROD SUMTER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT VILLALPANDO
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIMMY GOMEZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORGE AVALOS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL MORENO
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANSEL TYNDALL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH MOORE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIK BYRD
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD PAYNE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM JUNEMANN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH SILVA
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUBEN LOPEZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONTE PALMER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES COX
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH BYRNE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARQUEENA MOORE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL HEISLER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AARON HERD
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN SCHUELLER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARL CLARK
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FORREST SMILEY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY TAYLOR
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM STUCKEY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALFREDO MANCILLAS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN WOODWARD
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYLER FOSTER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM GAYTAN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTIN BERNARDO
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW BUSHNELL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUIS MORENO
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT GONZALEZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONA INFANTE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM HOSKINS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODEY ORTIZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUSSELL VIDLER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE ELIZONDO
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN SONNACK
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATINESH LAL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORGE MARIN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENNIE MONTEZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIO FARROW
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMANTHA RIVAS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Represented By: KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: BENJAMIN W HULSE
Represented By: KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?