ADKINS et al v. 3M COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: LONNIE FOSS, CHRISTOPHER HENSON, WILBERT IVORY, ERIC COSBY, DANIEL CHASE, GARY CRETORS, KEVIN BUNTLEY, BRANDON HAMBLIN, EDGAR GARCIA, JOSHUA HAMILTON, MITCHELL HATCHETT, ADAM BUCK, BRANDON KERR, WILLIAM HENSON, CRAIG BESHIRES, ADAM BOREN, WILIAM BARCLAY, BRIAN JAMAR, ELISEO CAMILO FLORENDO, BRIAN COFFIN, RILEY COOK, JASON DANIELECKI, JERAD HARRISON, JEREMY CRIBB, ROBERT BALLEW, DARRELL ALSTON, ANTHONY EAGLOWSKI, JERAMIAH KUEHL, SCOTT BROWN, STEVEN HILL, BRANDON KLING, AARON BYRD, JOHN IASIELLO, WILLIAM AUSTIN, NELSON BAKER, JAMES GLASGOW, GARRY HOLDER, DANNY FALCON, TERRY AUTRY, JAMES DAVIS, DARIN KOELLIKER, BRETT HARRIS, JAMES ELLIS, KENNETH JOHNSON, DOMINQUE CRUMP, NEAL GALFORD, CHRISTOPHER KELSO, KORY ILLENYE, CHRISTOPHER ADKINS and MICHAEL BALLARD
Defendant: 3M COMPANY and AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv03151
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #12 MOTION to Remand , #15 Response in Opposition to Motion, #19 Reply to Response to Motion (djb)
October 2, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #12 MOTION to Remand , #17 MOTION for Leave to File re #14 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #12 MOTION to Remand , #15 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by CHRISTOPHER ADKINS, DARRELL ALSTON, WILLIAM AUSTIN, TERRY AUTRY, NELSON BAKER, MICHAEL BALLARD, ROBERT BALLEW, WILIAM BARCLAY, CRAIG BESHIRES, ADAM BOREN, SCOTT BROWN, ADAM BUCK, KEVIN BUNTLEY, AARON BYRD, DANIEL CHASE, BRIAN COFFIN, RILEY COOK, ERIC COSBY, GARY CRETORS, JEREMY CRIBB, DOMINQUE CRUMP, JASON DANIELECKI, JAMES DAVIS, ANTHONY EAGLOWSKI, JAMES ELLIS, DANNY FALCON, ELISEO CAMILO FLORENDO, LONNIE FOSS, NEAL GALFORD, EDGAR GARCIA, JAMES GLASGOW, BRANDON HAMBLIN, JOSHUA HAMILTON, BRETT HARRIS, JERAD HARRISON, MITCHELL HATCHETT, CHRISTOPHER HENSON, WILLIAM HENSON, STEVEN HILL, GARRY HOLDER, JOHN IASIELLO, KORY ILLENYE, WILBERT IVORY, BRIAN JAMAR, KENNETH JOHNSON, CHRISTOPHER KELSO, BRANDON KERR, BRANDON KLING, DARIN KOELLIKER, JERAMIAH KUEHL. (SILVERMAN, RAYMOND)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Reply memoranda are due by October 2, 2019 and must not exceed 5,000 words. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/25/2019. (djb) Modified on 9/25/2019 (djb).
September 24, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #17 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand and, In the Alternative, Objections to Exhibits Appended to Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand (djb)
September 24, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File re #14 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #12 MOTION to Remand , #15 Response in Opposition to Motion, by CHRISTOPHER ADKINS, DARRELL ALSTON, WILLIAM AUSTIN, TERRY AUTRY, NELSON BAKER, MICHAEL BALLARD, ROBERT BALLEW, WILIAM BARCLAY, CRAIG BESHIRES, ADAM BOREN, SCOTT BROWN, ADAM BUCK, KEVIN BUNTLEY, AARON BYRD, DANIEL CHASE, BRIAN COFFIN, RILEY COOK, ERIC COSBY, GARY CRETORS, JEREMY CRIBB, DOMINQUE CRUMP, JASON DANIELECKI, JAMES DAVIS, ANTHONY EAGLOWSKI, JAMES ELLIS, DANNY FALCON, ELISEO CAMILO FLORENDO, LONNIE FOSS, NEAL GALFORD, EDGAR GARCIA, JAMES GLASGOW, BRANDON HAMBLIN, JOSHUA HAMILTON, BRETT HARRIS, JERAD HARRISON, MITCHELL HATCHETT, CHRISTOPHER HENSON, WILLIAM HENSON, STEVEN HILL, GARRY HOLDER, JOHN IASIELLO, KORY ILLENYE, WILBERT IVORY, BRIAN JAMAR, KENNETH JOHNSON, CHRISTOPHER KELSO, BRANDON KERR, BRANDON KLING, DARIN KOELLIKER, JERAMIAH KUEHL. (SILVERMAN, RAYMOND)
September 19, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #12 MOTION to Remand , #15 Response in Opposition to Motion, (djb)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/19/2019. (djb)
September 19, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #14 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (djb)
September 18, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand [Public Version] filed by 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Simon Gottlieb, #2 Exhibits 1-10 [Filed Under Seal], #3 Exhibit 11) (BRANSCOME, KIMBERLY) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/19/2019) (djb). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2019: #4 Response (Sealed)) (djb).
September 18, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (BRANSCOME, KIMBERLY)
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION. (djb)
September 4, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Remand . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 9/18/2019). (djb)
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand by CHRISTOPHER ADKINS, DARRELL ALSTON, WILLIAM AUSTIN, TERRY AUTRY, NELSON BAKER, MICHAEL BALLARD, ROBERT BALLEW, WILIAM BARCLAY, CRAIG BESHIRES, ADAM BOREN, SCOTT BROWN, ADAM BUCK, KEVIN BUNTLEY, AARON BYRD, DANIEL CHASE, BRIAN COFFIN, RILEY COOK, ERIC COSBY, GARY CRETORS, JEREMY CRIBB, DOMINQUE CRUMP, JASON DANIELECKI, JAMES DAVIS, ANTHONY EAGLOWSKI, JAMES ELLIS, DANNY FALCON, ELISEO CAMILO FLORENDO, LONNIE FOSS, NEAL GALFORD, EDGAR GARCIA, JAMES GLASGOW, BRANDON HAMBLIN, JOSHUA HAMILTON, BRETT HARRIS, JERAD HARRISON, MITCHELL HATCHETT, CHRISTOPHER HENSON, WILLIAM HENSON, STEVEN HILL, GARRY HOLDER, JOHN IASIELLO, KORY ILLENYE, WILBERT IVORY, BRIAN JAMAR, KENNETH JOHNSON, CHRISTOPHER KELSO, BRANDON KERR, BRANDON KLING, DARIN KOELLIKER, JERAMIAH KUEHL. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (SILVERMAN, RAYMOND)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by RAYMOND C SILVERMAN on behalf of All Plaintiffs (SILVERMAN, RAYMOND)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by STACY KATHRYN HAUER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (HAUER, STACY)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-02122. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-26) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/16/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/16/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Aearo Technologies, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/16/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Raymond C. Silverman, Melanie H. Muhlstock as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (KDS) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/16/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 19-cv-2122 SRN/BRT. (KDS) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/16/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/16/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/16/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey County, case number N/A (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7045991) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADKINS et al v. 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LONNIE FOSS
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER HENSON
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILBERT IVORY
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC COSBY
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL CHASE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY CRETORS
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN BUNTLEY
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON HAMBLIN
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDGAR GARCIA
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA HAMILTON
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MITCHELL HATCHETT
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM BUCK
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON KERR
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM HENSON
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRAIG BESHIRES
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM BOREN
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILIAM BARCLAY
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN JAMAR
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELISEO CAMILO FLORENDO
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN COFFIN
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RILEY COOK
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON DANIELECKI
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERAD HARRISON
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMY CRIBB
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT BALLEW
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARRELL ALSTON
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY EAGLOWSKI
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERAMIAH KUEHL
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT BROWN
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN HILL
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON KLING
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AARON BYRD
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN IASIELLO
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM AUSTIN
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NELSON BAKER
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES GLASGOW
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARRY HOLDER
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANNY FALCON
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRY AUTRY
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES DAVIS
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARIN KOELLIKER
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRETT HARRIS
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES ELLIS
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH JOHNSON
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOMINQUE CRUMP
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEAL GALFORD
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER KELSO
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KORY ILLENYE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER ADKINS
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL BALLARD
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: BENJAMIN W HULSE
Represented By: S Jamal Faleel
Represented By: JERRY W BLACKWELL
Represented By: KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Represented By: KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?