ADLER et al v. 3M COMPANY
Plaintiff: PATRICK TURNER, BREYTEN BROWN, THELMA COLEMAN, JORDAN ARGUELLES, OMAR SIERRA-LOPEZ, BRANDON MOORE, RYAN BALINTFY, CHRISTOPHER BAKER, RODNEY BOST, ISAAC CUNNINGHAM, MIGUEL CARABALLO, JUSTIN DUNLAP, BILLY MILLER, RANDY WATTS, MITCHELL ADLER, STEVEN BROOME, ROBERT NAPIER, CARL BURKE, CHASE BROWN, ALBERT ALLEN, ROBERT BROUDRICK, ROY BASHAM, MICHAEL DELISLE, KENNETH DELAUNE, ALVIN STEWART, MICHAEL CROSS, DOHN DEATHERAGE, ERIK BEAL, AARON CUMMINS, WILLIAM CHAMBERLIN, JOSHUA BAYLESS, DAVID WEGSCHEIDER, JASON BECNEL, MATTHEW CONDE, ANTHONY KING, JONAS ANTLEY, JEFFREY ANNIBAL, PATRICK BUSH, BRANDON CLINTON-DOOLEY, HENRY WOOD, DARRELL BRANTLEY, ROBERT SPICKARD, ALEX NEVILLE, ANTHONY WHEELER, STEPHANIE CHAVEZ, SHAWN DAVIS, BILLY BOWEN, ELBERT CUDE, JIMAR DAVIS and JAMES BLYTHE
Defendant: 3M COMPANY and AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv03152
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #12 MOTION to Remand , #15 Response in Opposition to Motion, #19 Reply to Response to Motion (djb)
October 2, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #17 MOTION for Leave to File re #14 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #12 MOTION to Remand , #15 Response in Opposition to Motion, , #12 MOTION to Remand filed by MITCHELL ADLER, ALBERT ALLEN, JEFFREY ANNIBAL, JONAS ANTLEY, JORDAN ARGUELLES, CHRISTOPHER BAKER, RYAN BALINTFY, ROY BASHAM, JOSHUA BAYLESS, ERIK BEAL, JASON BECNEL, JAMES BLYTHE, RODNEY BOST, BILLY BOWEN, DARRELL BRANTLEY, STEVEN BROOME, ROBERT BROUDRICK, BREYTEN BROWN, CHASE BROWN, CARL BURKE, PATRICK BUSH, MIGUEL CARABALLO, WILLIAM CHAMBERLIN, STEPHANIE CHAVEZ, BRANDON CLINTON-DOOLEY, THELMA COLEMAN, MATTHEW CONDE, MICHAEL CROSS, ELBERT CUDE, AARON CUMMINS, ISAAC CUNNINGHAM, JIMAR DAVIS, SHAWN DAVIS, DOHN DEATHERAGE, KENNETH DELAUNE, MICHAEL DELISLE, JUSTIN DUNLAP, ANTHONY KING, BILLY MILLER, BRANDON MOORE, ROBERT NAPIER, ALEX NEVILLE, OMAR SIERRA-LOPEZ, ROBERT SPICKARD, ALVIN STEWART, PATRICK TURNER, RANDY WATTS, DAVID WEGSCHEIDER, ANTHONY WHEELER, HENRY WOOD. (SILVERMAN, RAYMOND)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Reply memoranda are due by October 2, 2019 and must not exceed 5,000 words. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/25/2019. (djb) Modified on 9/25/2019 (djb).
September 24, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #17 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand and, In the Alternative, Objections to Exhibits Appended to Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand. (djb)
September 24, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File re #14 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #12 MOTION to Remand , #15 Response in Opposition to Motion, by MITCHELL ADLER, ALBERT ALLEN, JEFFREY ANNIBAL, JONAS ANTLEY, JORDAN ARGUELLES, CHRISTOPHER BAKER, RYAN BALINTFY, ROY BASHAM, JOSHUA BAYLESS, ERIK BEAL, JASON BECNEL, JAMES BLYTHE, RODNEY BOST, BILLY BOWEN, DARRELL BRANTLEY, STEVEN BROOME, ROBERT BROUDRICK, BREYTEN BROWN, CHASE BROWN, CARL BURKE, PATRICK BUSH, MIGUEL CARABALLO, WILLIAM CHAMBERLIN, STEPHANIE CHAVEZ, BRANDON CLINTON-DOOLEY, THELMA COLEMAN, MATTHEW CONDE, MICHAEL CROSS, ELBERT CUDE, AARON CUMMINS, ISAAC CUNNINGHAM, JIMAR DAVIS, SHAWN DAVIS, DOHN DEATHERAGE, KENNETH DELAUNE, MICHAEL DELISLE, JUSTIN DUNLAP, ANTHONY KING, BILLY MILLER, BRANDON MOORE, ROBERT NAPIER, ALEX NEVILLE, OMAR SIERRA-LOPEZ, ROBERT SPICKARD, ALVIN STEWART, PATRICK TURNER, RANDY WATTS, DAVID WEGSCHEIDER, ANTHONY WHEELER, HENRY WOOD. (SILVERMAN, RAYMOND)
September 19, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #12 MOTION to Remand , #15 Response in Opposition to Motion, (djb)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/19/2019. (djb)
September 19, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #14 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (djb)
September 18, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand [Public Version] filed by 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Simon Gottlieb, #2 Exhibits 1-10 [Filed Under Seal], #3 Exhibit 11) (BRANSCOME, KIMBERLY) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/19/2019) (djb). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2019: #4 Response (Sealed)) (djb).
September 18, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (BRANSCOME, KIMBERLY)
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION. (djb)
September 4, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Remand . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 9/18/2019). (djb)
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand by MITCHELL ADLER, ALBERT ALLEN, JEFFREY ANNIBAL, JONAS ANTLEY, JORDAN ARGUELLES, CHRISTOPHER BAKER, RYAN BALINTFY, ROY BASHAM, JOSHUA BAYLESS, ERIK BEAL, JASON BECNEL, JAMES BLYTHE, RODNEY BOST, BILLY BOWEN, DARRELL BRANTLEY, STEVEN BROOME, ROBERT BROUDRICK, BREYTEN BROWN, CHASE BROWN, CARL BURKE, PATRICK BUSH, MIGUEL CARABALLO, WILLIAM CHAMBERLIN, STEPHANIE CHAVEZ, BRANDON CLINTON-DOOLEY, THELMA COLEMAN, MATTHEW CONDE, MICHAEL CROSS, ELBERT CUDE, AARON CUMMINS, ISAAC CUNNINGHAM, JIMAR DAVIS, SHAWN DAVIS, DOHN DEATHERAGE, KENNETH DELAUNE, MICHAEL DELISLE, JUSTIN DUNLAP, ANTHONY KING, BILLY MILLER, BRANDON MOORE, ROBERT NAPIER, ALEX NEVILLE, OMAR SIERRA-LOPEZ, ROBERT SPICKARD, ALVIN STEWART, PATRICK TURNER, RANDY WATTS, DAVID WEGSCHEIDER, ANTHONY WHEELER, HENRY WOOD. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (SILVERMAN, RAYMOND)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by RAYMOND C SILVERMAN on behalf of All Plaintiffs (SILVERMAN, RAYMOND)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by STACY KATHRYN HAUER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (HAUER, STACY)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-02124. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-26) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/16/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/16/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Aearo Technologies, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/16/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Raymond C. Silverman, Melanie H. Muhlstock as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MKB) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/16/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-2124 (WMW-ECW). (MKB)[Transferred from Minnesota on 8/16/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/16/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/16/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey County, case number N/A (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7046223) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADLER et al v. 3M COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK TURNER
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BREYTEN BROWN
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THELMA COLEMAN
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORDAN ARGUELLES
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OMAR SIERRA-LOPEZ
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON MOORE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN BALINTFY
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER BAKER
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODNEY BOST
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISAAC CUNNINGHAM
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIGUEL CARABALLO
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN DUNLAP
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILLY MILLER
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDY WATTS
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MITCHELL ADLER
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN BROOME
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT NAPIER
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARL BURKE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHASE BROWN
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBERT ALLEN
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT BROUDRICK
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROY BASHAM
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL DELISLE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH DELAUNE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALVIN STEWART
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL CROSS
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOHN DEATHERAGE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIK BEAL
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AARON CUMMINS
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM CHAMBERLIN
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA BAYLESS
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID WEGSCHEIDER
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON BECNEL
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW CONDE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY KING
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONAS ANTLEY
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY ANNIBAL
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK BUSH
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON CLINTON-DOOLEY
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRY WOOD
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARRELL BRANTLEY
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT SPICKARD
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEX NEVILLE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY WHEELER
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE CHAVEZ
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAWN DAVIS
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILLY BOWEN
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELBERT CUDE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIMAR DAVIS
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES BLYTHE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: RAYMOND C SILVERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: BENJAMIN W HULSE
Represented By: S Jamal Faleel
Represented By: JERRY W BLACKWELL
Represented By: KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Represented By: KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?