BOYER et al v. 3M COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: RYAN SIMPSON, NICKLAUS NAPIER, JOHN CIFUNI, MICHAEL RUSSELL, DUANE MILLER, CLAVIS GILBERT, JAMES MEEKER, NEAL DARINGER, JUSTIN BOUNDS, BRIAN BOARDMAN, KARL HEDRICK, CHARLES FINSON, CLINT BOYER, CARL MORGAN, TODD HOLCOMB, BRYAN FISH, JAMES BEVERLY, KEVIN NGALA, JARRETT SHULTZ, ANTHONY MCNEESE, BRENDAN CONLIN, CHAD MARSHALL, THOMAS SANDERS, JOSEPH CONWAY, WINSTON KINGKADE, GABRIEL WHETSEL, JUSTIN JOHNSON, JOSE CINTRON, NATHAN KRAKOWSKI, MARTIN DUROSS, ROBERT DIAZ, TIM IVERSON, NATHAN COOK, DERRICK LYONS, ROBERT DAVIDSON, EMANUEL REBELO, DELBERT KNISLEY, ALEXANDER HERNANDEZ, GABRIEL O'BRIEN, BRANDON DEENER, DANNY CASTILLO, DANIELLE ADARANIJO, MICHAEL ASHBY, RUSSELL REPASS, JASON MCGRATH, LON LEWIS, LEE THORNBURG, VINCENT RODRIGUEZ, CHAD KUKER, ANDRE MCBURNIE, CHAD SEEL, KEN BIRCHARD, JAMES LEVIERGE, RASHAUN LAING, MATTHEW BUTTREY, JAIME ZAMARRIPA, JR., GEORGE LANGEVIN, CHARLES PATRICK, DANIEL DESORMEAUX, MCQUAIL PRICE, JOSHUA GOODE, JAIME CHACON, JARED VIERNES, LAWRENCE POHL, NICOLAS BERGGREN, BRETT ANDERSON, MARC KLINE, KEVIN NOKES, CURTIS JACKSON, VINCENT HORTON, JOSH ST. JOHN, TRAVIS BEER, TRAVIS KOOCHEL, BRIAN LAWSON, RYAN KEELTY, MICHAEL BEACHLEY, STEPHEN MCDAID, MICHAEL ELDER, JOEY ROSARIO, JAMES SIMMONS, JORDAN EVANS, CHRISTOPHER WOODS, STEVEN SPALDING, JESSE CODY, COREY SCHILLER, CHRYSTOPHER WHITE, JOSHUA GILES, ZACH REED, JASON ROBERTSON, DANA SPENCER, DONALD SPAULDING, DONALD HAMOR, JASON BERTHIAUME, JEFFREY DOUTY, MICHAEL LAWSON and JIM GOLD
Defendant: 3M COMPANY and AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv03158
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #12 MOTION to Remand , #14 Response in Opposition to Motion, #18 Reply to Response to Motion (djb)
September 29, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #12 MOTION to Remand filed by DANIELLE ADARANIJO, BRETT ANDERSON, MICHAEL ASHBY, MICHAEL BEACHLEY, TRAVIS BEER, NICOLAS BERGGREN, JASON BERTHIAUME, JAMES BEVERLY, KEN BIRCHARD, BRIAN BOARDMAN, JUSTIN BOUNDS, CLINT BOYER, MATTHEW BUTTREY, DANNY CASTILLO, JAIME CHACON, JOHN CIFUNI, JOSE CINTRON, JESSE CODY, BRENDAN CONLIN, JOSEPH CONWAY, NATHAN COOK, NEAL DARINGER, ROBERT DAVIDSON, BRANDON DEENER, DANIEL DESORMEAUX, ROBERT DIAZ, JEFFREY DOUTY, MARTIN DUROSS, MICHAEL ELDER, JORDAN EVANS, CHARLES FINSON, BRYAN FISH, CLAVIS GILBERT, JOSHUA GILES, JIM GOLD, JOSHUA GOODE, DONALD HAMOR, KARL HEDRICK, ALEXANDER HERNANDEZ, TODD HOLCOMB, VINCENT HORTON, TIM IVERSON, CURTIS JACKSON, JUSTIN JOHNSON, RYAN KEELTY, WINSTON KINGKADE, MARC KLINE, DELBERT KNISLEY, TRAVIS KOOCHEL, NATHAN KRAKOWSKI, CHAD KUKER, RASHAUN LAING, GEORGE LANGEVIN, BRIAN LAWSON, MICHAEL LAWSON, JAMES LEVIERGE, LON LEWIS, DERRICK LYONS, CHAD MARSHALL, ANDRE MCBURNIE, STEPHEN MCDAID, JASON MCGRATH, ANTHONY MCNEESE, JAMES MEEKER, DUANE MILLER, CARL MORGAN, NICKLAUS NAPIER, KEVIN NGALA, KEVIN NOKES, GABRIEL O'BRIEN, CHARLES PATRICK, LAWRENCE POHL, MCQUAIL PRICE, EMANUEL REBELO, ZACH REED, RUSSELL REPASS, JASON ROBERTSON, VINCENT RODRIGUEZ, JOEY ROSARIO, MICHAEL RUSSELL, THOMAS SANDERS, COREY SCHILLER, CHAD SEEL, JARRETT SHULTZ, JAMES SIMMONS, RYAN SIMPSON, STEVEN SPALDING, DONALD SPAULDING, DANA SPENCER, JOSH ST. JOHN, LEE THORNBURG, JARED VIERNES, GABRIEL WHETSEL, CHRYSTOPHER WHITE, CHRISTOPHER WOODS, JAIME ZAMARRIPA, JR. (WATTS, MIKAL)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to File a Reply. Reply memoranda are due by September 30, 2019 and must not exceed 5,000 words. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/23/2019. (djb)
September 23, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #16 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support, re #14 Response in Opposition to Motion, #12 MOTION to Remand (djb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File re #14 Response in Opposition to Motion, #12 MOTION to Remand Reply Memorandum in Support by DANIELLE ADARANIJO, BRETT ANDERSON, MICHAEL ASHBY, MICHAEL BEACHLEY, TRAVIS BEER, NICOLAS BERGGREN, JASON BERTHIAUME, JAMES BEVERLY, KEN BIRCHARD, BRIAN BOARDMAN, JUSTIN BOUNDS, CLINT BOYER, MATTHEW BUTTREY, DANNY CASTILLO, JAIME CHACON, JOHN CIFUNI, JOSE CINTRON, JESSE CODY, BRENDAN CONLIN, JOSEPH CONWAY, NATHAN COOK, NEAL DARINGER, ROBERT DAVIDSON, BRANDON DEENER, DANIEL DESORMEAUX, ROBERT DIAZ, JEFFREY DOUTY, MARTIN DUROSS, MICHAEL ELDER, JORDAN EVANS, CHARLES FINSON, BRYAN FISH, CLAVIS GILBERT, JOSHUA GILES, JIM GOLD, JOSHUA GOODE, DONALD HAMOR, KARL HEDRICK, ALEXANDER HERNANDEZ, TODD HOLCOMB, VINCENT HORTON, TIM IVERSON, CURTIS JACKSON, JUSTIN JOHNSON, RYAN KEELTY, WINSTON KINGKADE, MARC KLINE, DELBERT KNISLEY, TRAVIS KOOCHEL, NATHAN KRAKOWSKI, CHAD KUKER, RASHAUN LAING, GEORGE LANGEVIN, BRIAN LAWSON, MICHAEL LAWSON, JAMES LEVIERGE, LON LEWIS, DERRICK LYONS, CHAD MARSHALL, ANDRE MCBURNIE, STEPHEN MCDAID, JASON MCGRATH, ANTHONY MCNEESE, JAMES MEEKER, DUANE MILLER, CARL MORGAN, NICKLAUS NAPIER, KEVIN NGALA, KEVIN NOKES, GABRIEL O'BRIEN, CHARLES PATRICK, LAWRENCE POHL, MCQUAIL PRICE, EMANUEL REBELO, ZACH REED, RUSSELL REPASS, JASON ROBERTSON, VINCENT RODRIGUEZ, JOEY ROSARIO, MICHAEL RUSSELL, THOMAS SANDERS, COREY SCHILLER, CHAD SEEL, JARRETT SHULTZ, JAMES SIMMONS, RYAN SIMPSON, STEVEN SPALDING, DONALD SPAULDING, DANA SPENCER, JOSH ST. JOHN, LEE THORNBURG, JARED VIERNES, GABRIEL WHETSEL, CHRYSTOPHER WHITE, CHRISTOPHER WOODS, JAIME ZAMARRIPA, JR. (WATTS, MIKAL)
September 18, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #12 MOTION to Remand , #14 Response in Opposition to Motion (djb)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Seal. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/17/2019. (djb)
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand [Public Version] filed by 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Simon Gottlieb, #2 Exhibits 1-10 [Filed Under Seal], #3 Exhibit 11, #4 Response (Sealed)) (BRANSCOME, KIMBERLY) Modified on 9/17/2019 (djb).
September 16, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (BRANSCOME, KIMBERLY)
September 3, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Remand . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 9/17/2019). (djb)
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand by DANIELLE ADARANIJO, BRETT ANDERSON, MICHAEL ASHBY, MICHAEL BEACHLEY, TRAVIS BEER, NICOLAS BERGGREN, JASON BERTHIAUME, JAMES BEVERLY, KEN BIRCHARD, BRIAN BOARDMAN, JUSTIN BOUNDS, CLINT BOYER, MATTHEW BUTTREY, DANNY CASTILLO, JAIME CHACON, JOHN CIFUNI, JOSE CINTRON, JESSE CODY, BRENDAN CONLIN, JOSEPH CONWAY, NATHAN COOK, NEAL DARINGER, ROBERT DAVIDSON, BRANDON DEENER, DANIEL DESORMEAUX, ROBERT DIAZ, JEFFREY DOUTY, MARTIN DUROSS, MICHAEL ELDER, JORDAN EVANS, CHARLES FINSON, BRYAN FISH, CLAVIS GILBERT, JOSHUA GILES, JIM GOLD, JOSHUA GOODE, DONALD HAMOR, KARL HEDRICK, ALEXANDER HERNANDEZ, TODD HOLCOMB, VINCENT HORTON, TIM IVERSON, CURTIS JACKSON, JUSTIN JOHNSON, RYAN KEELTY, WINSTON KINGKADE, MARC KLINE, DELBERT KNISLEY, TRAVIS KOOCHEL, NATHAN KRAKOWSKI, CHAD KUKER, RASHAUN LAING, GEORGE LANGEVIN, BRIAN LAWSON, MICHAEL LAWSON, JAMES LEVIERGE, LON LEWIS, DERRICK LYONS, CHAD MARSHALL, ANDRE MCBURNIE, STEPHEN MCDAID, JASON MCGRATH, ANTHONY MCNEESE, JAMES MEEKER, DUANE MILLER, CARL MORGAN, NICKLAUS NAPIER, KEVIN NGALA, KEVIN NOKES, GABRIEL O'BRIEN, CHARLES PATRICK, LAWRENCE POHL, MCQUAIL PRICE, EMANUEL REBELO, ZACH REED, RUSSELL REPASS, JASON ROBERTSON, VINCENT RODRIGUEZ, JOEY ROSARIO, MICHAEL RUSSELL, THOMAS SANDERS, COREY SCHILLER, CHAD SEEL, JARRETT SHULTZ, JAMES SIMMONS, RYAN SIMPSON, STEVEN SPALDING, DONALD SPAULDING, DANA SPENCER, JOSH ST. JOHN, LEE THORNBURG, JARED VIERNES, GABRIEL WHETSEL, CHRYSTOPHER WHITE, CHRISTOPHER WOODS, JAIME ZAMARRIPA, JR. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (WATTS, MIKAL)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by MIKAL WATTS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (WATTS, MIKAL)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION. (djb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-02134. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-26) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/16/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/16/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Aearo Technologies, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/16/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Mikal C. Watts, Francisco Guerra IV, Erin Rogiers, Paul Danziger, Rodrigo R. de Llano as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/16/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 19-cv-2134 (ECT/BRT). (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/16/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/16/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/16/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin, case number N/A (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7050677) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOYER et al v. 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN SIMPSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICKLAUS NAPIER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN CIFUNI
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL RUSSELL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUANE MILLER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLAVIS GILBERT
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES MEEKER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEAL DARINGER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN BOUNDS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN BOARDMAN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARL HEDRICK
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES FINSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLINT BOYER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARL MORGAN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TODD HOLCOMB
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYAN FISH
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES BEVERLY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN NGALA
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JARRETT SHULTZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY MCNEESE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDAN CONLIN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHAD MARSHALL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS SANDERS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH CONWAY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WINSTON KINGKADE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GABRIEL WHETSEL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN JOHNSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE CINTRON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATHAN KRAKOWSKI
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTIN DUROSS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT DIAZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIM IVERSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATHAN COOK
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DERRICK LYONS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT DAVIDSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMANUEL REBELO
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DELBERT KNISLEY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXANDER HERNANDEZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GABRIEL O'BRIEN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON DEENER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANNY CASTILLO
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIELLE ADARANIJO
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL ASHBY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUSSELL REPASS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON MCGRATH
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LON LEWIS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEE THORNBURG
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VINCENT RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHAD KUKER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDRE MCBURNIE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHAD SEEL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEN BIRCHARD
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES LEVIERGE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RASHAUN LAING
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW BUTTREY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAIME ZAMARRIPA, JR.
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE LANGEVIN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES PATRICK
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL DESORMEAUX
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCQUAIL PRICE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA GOODE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAIME CHACON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JARED VIERNES
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE POHL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICOLAS BERGGREN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRETT ANDERSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARC KLINE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN NOKES
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CURTIS JACKSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VINCENT HORTON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSH ST. JOHN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRAVIS BEER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRAVIS KOOCHEL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN LAWSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN KEELTY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL BEACHLEY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN MCDAID
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL ELDER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOEY ROSARIO
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES SIMMONS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORDAN EVANS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER WOODS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN SPALDING
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSE CODY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COREY SCHILLER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRYSTOPHER WHITE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA GILES
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZACH REED
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON ROBERTSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANA SPENCER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD SPAULDING
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD HAMOR
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON BERTHIAUME
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY DOUTY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL LAWSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIM GOLD
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: BENJAMIN W HULSE
Represented By: JERRY W BLACKWELL
Represented By: S Jamal Faleel
Represented By: KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Represented By: KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?