ACEVEDO et al v 3M COMPANY et al

Plaintiff: JOSHUA DINGUS, DESMOND DAVIS, DENNIS ROTHERY, OLIVER MCGHEE, DUSTIN USHMAN, BRANDON EANES, DENISE MOY, BRANDON STUBBLEFIELD, COURTNEY SMITH, MICHAEL HALL, CHRIS WARD, JEFFREY BAILEY, HERIBERTO FIGUEROA, MARCUS FORD, ADAM LAWSON, DANIEL WITHERSPOON, DERRELL MEYERS, JR., DARWIN HEERDT, WILLIAM ROARK, KERRY STANIFORD, STEPHEN DAVIDSON, WILLIAM ACEVEDO, BILLY SWANIGAN, JR., JEFF KALO, KEVIN THOMAS, ROBERT WILSON, JR., NETCHEY RODRIGUEZ, NOEL SANTIAGO CRUZ, JEREMY WOLBARSHT, DAVID HILL, HIRAM GARCIA-LOPEZ and JONOTHAN SHEPPERD
Defendant: 3M COMPANY and AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv03212
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSIONS AND ELECTRONIC FILING. (djb)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-02140. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-28) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. Aearo LLC, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of Aearo Intermediate LLC, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of Aearo Holding LLC, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of 3M Occupational Safety LLC, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of 3M Company. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. (Rashid, Faris) Modified text on 8/20/2019 (MMP). [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Aearo Technologies LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-2140 MJD/HB. (MMG) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal,, (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial District, Hennepin County, case number 27-cv-19-12821 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7055110) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) State Notice of Service of Process on 3M, #3 Exhibit(s) State Notice of Service of Process on Aearo Technologies, #4 Exhibit(s) State Court Notice of Judicial Assignment, #5 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ACEVEDO et al v 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA DINGUS
Represented By: Yvonne M Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DESMOND DAVIS
Represented By: Yvonne M Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS ROTHERY
Represented By: Yvonne M Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OLIVER MCGHEE
Represented By: Yvonne M Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUSTIN USHMAN
Represented By: Yvonne M Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON EANES
Represented By: Yvonne M Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENISE MOY
Represented By: Yvonne M Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON STUBBLEFIELD
Represented By: Yvonne M Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COURTNEY SMITH
Represented By: Yvonne M Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL HALL
Represented By: Yvonne M Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRIS WARD
Represented By: Yvonne M Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY BAILEY
Represented By: Yvonne M Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HERIBERTO FIGUEROA
Represented By: Yvonne M Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCUS FORD
Represented By: Yvonne M Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM LAWSON
Represented By: Yvonne M Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL WITHERSPOON
Represented By: Yvonne M Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DERRELL MEYERS, JR.
Represented By: Yvonne M Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARWIN HEERDT
Represented By: Yvonne M Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM ROARK
Represented By: Yvonne M Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KERRY STANIFORD
Represented By: Yvonne M Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN DAVIDSON
Represented By: Yvonne M Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM ACEVEDO
Represented By: Yvonne M Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILLY SWANIGAN, JR.
Represented By: Yvonne M Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFF KALO
Represented By: Yvonne M Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN THOMAS
Represented By: Yvonne M Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT WILSON, JR.
Represented By: Yvonne M Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NETCHEY RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Yvonne M Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOEL SANTIAGO CRUZ
Represented By: Yvonne M Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMY WOLBARSHT
Represented By: Yvonne M Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID HILL
Represented By: Yvonne M Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HIRAM GARCIA-LOPEZ
Represented By: Yvonne M Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONOTHAN SHEPPERD
Represented By: Yvonne M Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: BENJAMIN W HULSE
Represented By: S Jamal Faleel
Represented By: JERRY W BLACKWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?