HUNT et al v 3M COMPANY et al

Plaintiff: RYAN COOPER, ERIC VIHINEN, JOSEPH TOPPING, MARVIN JOHNSON, DWIGHT PORTER, JR., DEREK SCOTT, DEONTE PARKER, JOSE ORTIZ, ROGER RIGGLE, ADAM GIROUX, KARL HENDRICKS, AARON SCARBROUGH, ANTHONY HINTON, DAVID KLINE, WILLIAM SALEMME, JOEL FRICK, ADAM ELDRED, BRANDON ROSS, VERNON TYLER, JESUS RAMIREZ, TERRY MCKINNEY, JAMES ARMBRUSTER, RICARDO VILLALOBOS, ROBBIE LAYTON, JOSEPH BACKUS, JEAN-ERIC PIERRE-LOUIS, THOMAS OH, WILLIAM FISHER, CHRIS PETERS, RAY LEWIS, MATT MILLER, JAMES BRICE, JOSHUA STRAHL, DAVID BURTON, NATHANIEL LORD, KENNETH COSTA, DAVID EVES, DAVID HENDRICKSON, LAWRENCE CUPSTID, CASEY SCHREIBER, BARRY MCMURTRY, DEREK SPENCER, JOHN STOKES, YARITZA E. ILARRAZA, ANTHONY BARBOUR, SHON MOORE, MICHAEL MERCURIO, RYAN RAY, JASON DOTTER, JESSE MILLER, CHRISTOPHER SHEFFER, CLAY SURRATT, MIGUEL CATRON, BLAINE VAN SWOL, GREGORY GRAHAM, IAN FORD, BROCK MILFORF, PHILLIPS READ, JUAN TRUJILLO, SEAN COX, ANDREW BRAXTON, TIMOTHY FRENCH, JUSTIN MITCHELL, LOWELL STORMS, BRANDON JOHNSON, CHRISTOPHER DONAVANT, DENNIS TURNS, SCOTT STREF, SAMUEL TOLBERT, MICHAEL KINGHAM, MARIO FEREBEE, WAYNE HERMANN, DANIEL-LYNN WHITTACRE, DANE HENZE, HOWARD JOSEPH, CORTNEY NOLEN, ROBERT ANDERSON, JOSHUA RAKES, JUSTIN VANHORN, MATTHEW BRUGEMAN, CHARLIE BURKS, TRACY WHALON, STEVEN HORNER, DERRICK OGDEN, SEAN ALLBROOK, PAUL SNIDE, REUBEN MORGAN, PETER HEAP, THEODORE CROCKER, DANIEL SQUIERS, WADDELL BUTLER, TERRY REDD, STEVE BREWER, MARTIN HUNT and MICHAEL LIGHTELL
Defendant: 3M COMPANY and AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv03215
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Remand . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 9/17/2019). (djb)
September 3, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand by SEAN ALLBROOK, ROBERT ANDERSON, JAMES ARMBRUSTER, JOSEPH BACKUS, ANTHONY BARBOUR, ANDREW BRAXTON, STEVE BREWER, JAMES BRICE, MATTHEW BRUGEMAN, CHARLIE BURKS, DAVID BURTON, WADDELL BUTLER, MIGUEL CATRON, RYAN COOPER, KENNETH COSTA, SEAN COX, THEODORE CROCKER, LAWRENCE CUPSTID, CHRISTOPHER DONAVANT, JASON DOTTER, ADAM ELDRED, DAVID EVES, MARIO FEREBEE, WILLIAM FISHER, IAN FORD, TIMOTHY FRENCH, JOEL FRICK, ADAM GIROUX, GREGORY GRAHAM, PETER HEAP, KARL HENDRICKS, DAVID HENDRICKSON, DANE HENZE, WAYNE HERMANN, ANTHONY HINTON, STEVEN HORNER, MARTIN HUNT, YARITZA E. ILARRAZA, BRANDON JOHNSON, MARVIN JOHNSON, HOWARD JOSEPH, MICHAEL KINGHAM, DAVID KLINE, ROBBIE LAYTON, RAY LEWIS, MICHAEL LIGHTELL, NATHANIEL LORD, TERRY MCKINNEY, BARRY MCMURTRY, MICHAEL MERCURIO, BROCK MILFORF, JESSE MILLER, MATT MILLER, JUSTIN MITCHELL, SHON MOORE, REUBEN MORGAN, CORTNEY NOLEN, DERRICK OGDEN, THOMAS OH, JOSE ORTIZ, DEONTE PARKER, CHRIS PETERS, JEAN-ERIC PIERRE-LOUIS, DWIGHT PORTER, JR., JOSHUA RAKES, JESUS RAMIREZ, RYAN RAY, PHILLIPS READ, TERRY REDD, ROGER RIGGLE, BRANDON ROSS, WILLIAM SALEMME, AARON SCARBROUGH, CASEY SCHREIBER, DEREK SCOTT, CHRISTOPHER SHEFFER, PAUL SNIDE, DEREK SPENCER, DANIEL SQUIERS, JOHN STOKES, LOWELL STORMS, JOSHUA STRAHL, SCOTT STREF, CLAY SURRATT, SAMUEL TOLBERT, JOSEPH TOPPING, JUAN TRUJILLO, DENNIS TURNS, VERNON TYLER, BLAINE VAN SWOL, JUSTIN VANHORN, ERIC VIHINEN, RICARDO VILLALOBOS, JOSHUA WERTS, TRACY WHALON, DANIEL-LYNN WHITTACRE. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (WATTS, MIKAL)
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by MIKAL WATTS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (WATTS, MIKAL)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSIONS AND ELECTRONIC FILING. (djb)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-02150. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-28) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. Aearo LLC, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of Aearo Intermediate LLC, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of Aearo Holding LLC, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of 3M Occupational Safety LLC, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of 3M Company. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. (Rashid, Faris) Modified text on 8/20/2019 (MMP). [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Aearo Technologies LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Mikal C. Watts, Francisco Guerra IV, Erin Rogiers, Paul Danziger, Rodrigo R. de Llano as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MMG) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 19-cv-2150 DSD/SER. (MMG) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 EXHIBIT Notice of Removal (complete) re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from MN, 4th Judicial District (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7057494) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HUNT et al v 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN COOPER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC VIHINEN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH TOPPING
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARVIN JOHNSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DWIGHT PORTER, JR.
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEREK SCOTT
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEONTE PARKER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE ORTIZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROGER RIGGLE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM GIROUX
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARL HENDRICKS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AARON SCARBROUGH
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY HINTON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID KLINE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM SALEMME
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOEL FRICK
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM ELDRED
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON ROSS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VERNON TYLER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESUS RAMIREZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRY MCKINNEY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES ARMBRUSTER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICARDO VILLALOBOS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBBIE LAYTON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH BACKUS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEAN-ERIC PIERRE-LOUIS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS OH
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM FISHER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRIS PETERS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAY LEWIS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATT MILLER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES BRICE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA STRAHL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID BURTON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATHANIEL LORD
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH COSTA
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID EVES
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID HENDRICKSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE CUPSTID
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CASEY SCHREIBER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARRY MCMURTRY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEREK SPENCER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN STOKES
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YARITZA E. ILARRAZA
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY BARBOUR
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHON MOORE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL MERCURIO
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN RAY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON DOTTER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSE MILLER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER SHEFFER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLAY SURRATT
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIGUEL CATRON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLAINE VAN SWOL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY GRAHAM
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IAN FORD
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROCK MILFORF
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILLIPS READ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUAN TRUJILLO
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEAN COX
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW BRAXTON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY FRENCH
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN MITCHELL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOWELL STORMS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON JOHNSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER DONAVANT
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS TURNS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT STREF
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMUEL TOLBERT
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL KINGHAM
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIO FEREBEE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAYNE HERMANN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL-LYNN WHITTACRE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANE HENZE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOWARD JOSEPH
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORTNEY NOLEN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT ANDERSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA RAKES
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN VANHORN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW BRUGEMAN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLIE BURKS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACY WHALON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN HORNER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DERRICK OGDEN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEAN ALLBROOK
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL SNIDE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REUBEN MORGAN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PETER HEAP
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THEODORE CROCKER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL SQUIERS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WADDELL BUTLER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRY REDD
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVE BREWER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTIN HUNT
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL LIGHTELL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: BENJAMIN W HULSE
Represented By: S Jamal Faleel
Represented By: JERRY W BLACKWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?