LAWRENCE v 3M COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: LEONARD LEE, JEREMY BLAKE LOPEZ, SHAWN MARTIN, SHAWN LEWIS, TERRY LUCAS, BENJAMIN WILEY LUSK, DAVID LOUGHMILLER, EDWARD LYONS, JARED LIZOTTE, STEVEN A MARQUEZ, SCOTT LUNDY, TYRONNE LINDER, JASON M. LIMA, EDWARD MAHURIEN, JOSHUA LEUCK, MARCUS MACAHILAS, PEDRO MACIAS, JOSEPH AARON LENTNER, JEFFREY LAWYER, ROBERT LOVVORN, MICHAEL MADIGAN, JASON LONG, WILLIAM G. LUFT, GREGORY LEROY, RAFAEL MACHADO, JAVIER MARTINEZ, SHANANN MARTINEZ, WILLIAM LOTT, III, CARLOS M. MARTINEZ JR., NEIL ALLEN LOCKMAN, STEPHEN L. LITTLE, PATRICK LONG, BRUCE LECROY, JOHN MARLEY, ROBERT MACTAMHAIS, JORGE LINARES, ABEL LEON, STEVEN MATTHEW LEONARD, DANNY LESTER, NICHOLAS LOIZIDES, MILDRED MARTIN, MICHAEL JAMES LITZ, JOHN MARTIN, CUONG CONG LE, RONALD LILJA, PATRICK MARTIN, DOUGLAS LIVELY, DONTRELL LEE, FRANCISCO YAQUI LOZOYA, KEVIN DEWAYNE LEE, GRAIGREY LUNA, CORY MAJOR, MICHAEL MABERRY, RICARDO LOPEZ, MICHAEL LOPEZ, RICHARD LEMKE, TONY LEGREE, JUAN D. MACK, CHRISTOPHER MARSHALL, JAVIER LOPEZ, DAVID CHARLES MARQUEZ, THOMAS MICHAEL LUCAS, CALEB MICHAEL LUNDAY, MATTHEW MAKSIM, COURTNEY MANLEY, JUSTIN LEE, DENNY MARCUM, NATHAN MARTIN, JOHN LEDOUX, WILLIS MARSH, JOHN EUGENE LENAGHAN, ROBERT LEMKE, JAMES COURT LEAVERTON, HONDRA LEE, MARK LEWIS, ROBERT LUPINSKI, KORY MARBLE, GABRIEL JOSEPH MARTINEZ, LE'KENDRICK MONDRELL LOVETT, TODD LAWRENCE, CHRISTOPHER MARTIN, TODD LIBERYY, ENOCH D. MASSINGALE, JON LOPEZ, TRAVIS ANDREW MAPES, JOSHUA CHARLES MANDIA, JEFFERSON LEVEILLE, ROBERT J. LOPEZ, CHRISTOPHER LUNTZ, RODNEY MALOTT, PEDRO LIZARDA, TODD LUKEN, JACQUES LEDOUX, WILLIAM RAY LOGSDON, RENE MARQUIS, ROBERTA LEAVERTON, CARLOS M MARTINEZ, JR and TODD MONROE LIBERTY
Defendant: AEARO HOLDING LLC, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC and DOES 1-50
Case Number: 3:2019cv03219
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Filing 25 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by TODD LAWRENCE. (SINGLETON, GERALD)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AMENDED ORDER - For the foregoing reasons, the Court finds that Defendants have satisfied the requirements for removal under 1442(a)(1) and that it has subject matter jurisdiction over Plaintiffs' claims. Accordingly: (1.) Plaintiffs motions to remand are DENIED. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this amended order on the master docket for the MDL, and also on the individual dockets for Minnesota cases in which motions to remand were pending on January 13, 2020. (2.) The Clerk is further directed to sever the Minnesota multi-plaintiff actions as follows: all plaintiffs, except for the first-named plaintiff, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with the right to refile an individual short complaint in the approved form for the MDL at ECF NO. 705. The filing fee will be waived for any Minnesota plaintiff who is severed pursuant to this order and who timely files a short form complaint within 30 days of the dismissal without prejudice. The provisions of Pretrial Order No. 16, ECF No. 761, govern the severance process. (3.) All other deadlines applicable to 3M MDL plaintiffs--including census obligations--are now reinstated as to the Minnesota plaintiffs. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/22/2020. (djb)
October 28, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #23 Plaintiffs' Objections to #21 Pretrial Order No. 16 - Multi-Plaintiff Actions (djb)
October 25, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE by TODD LAWRENCE, JEFFREY LAWYER, CUONG CONG LE, JAMES COURT LEAVERTON, ROBERTA LEAVERTON, BRUCE LECROY, JACQUES LEDOUX, JOHN LEDOUX, DONTRELL LEE, HONDRA LEE, JUSTIN LEE, KEVIN DEWAYNE LEE, LEONARD LEE, TONY LEGREE, RICHARD LEMKE, ROBERT LEMKE, JOHN EUGENE LENAGHAN, JOSEPH AARON LENTNER, ABEL LEON, STEVEN MATTHEW LEONARD, GREGORY LEROY, DANNY LESTER, JOSHUA LEUCK, JEFFERSON LEVEILLE, MARK LEWIS, SHAWN LEWIS, TODD LIBERYY, RONALD LILJA, JASON M. LIMA, JORGE LINARES, TYRONNE LINDER, STEPHEN L. LITTLE, MICHAEL JAMES LITZ, DOUGLAS LIVELY, PEDRO LIZARDA, JARED LIZOTTE, NEIL ALLEN LOCKMAN, WILLIAM RAY LOGSDON, NICHOLAS LOIZIDES, JASON LONG, PATRICK LONG, JAVIER LOPEZ, JEREMY BLAKE LOPEZ, JON LOPEZ, MICHAEL LOPEZ, RICARDO LOPEZ, ROBERT J. LOPEZ, WILLIAM LOTT, III, DAVID LOUGHMILLER, LE'KENDRICK MONDRELL LOVETT, ROBERT LOVVORN, FRANCISCO YAQUI LOZOYA, TERRY LUCAS, THOMAS MICHAEL LUCAS, WILLIAM G. LUFT, TODD LUKEN, GRAIGREY LUNA, CALEB MICHAEL LUNDAY, SCOTT LUNDY, CHRISTOPHER LUNTZ, ROBERT LUPINSKI, BENJAMIN WILEY LUSK, EDWARD LYONS, MICHAEL MABERRY, MARCUS MACAHILAS, RAFAEL MACHADO, PEDRO MACIAS, JUAN D. MACK, ROBERT MACTAMHAIS, MICHAEL MADIGAN, EDWARD MAHURIEN, CORY MAJOR, MATTHEW MAKSIM, RODNEY MALOTT, JOSHUA CHARLES MANDIA, COURTNEY MANLEY, TRAVIS ANDREW MAPES, KORY MARBLE, DENNY MARCUM, JOHN MARLEY, DAVID CHARLES MARQUEZ, STEVEN A MARQUEZ, RENE MARQUIS, WILLIS MARSH, CHRISTOPHER MARSHALL, CHRISTOPHER MARTIN, JOHN MARTIN, MILDRED MARTIN, NATHAN MARTIN, PATRICK MARTIN, SHAWN MARTIN, GABRIEL JOSEPH MARTINEZ, JAVIER MARTINEZ, SHANANN MARTINEZ, CARLOS M. MARTINEZ JR., ENOCH D. MASSINGALE re #21 Order,,,,,, Set Deadlines,,,,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (SINGLETON, GERALD)
October 18, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #17 Response in Opposition to Motion, #22 Reply to Response to Motion (djb)
October 17, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by TODD LAWRENCE, JEFFREY LAWYER, CUONG CONG LE, JAMES COURT LEAVERTON, ROBERTA LEAVERTON, BRUCE LECROY, JACQUES LEDOUX, JOHN LEDOUX, DONTRELL LEE, HONDRA LEE, JUSTIN LEE, KEVIN DEWAYNE LEE, LEONARD LEE, TONY LEGREE, RICHARD LEMKE, ROBERT LEMKE, JOHN EUGENE LENAGHAN, JOSEPH AARON LENTNER, ABEL LEON, STEVEN MATTHEW LEONARD, GREGORY LEROY, DANNY LESTER, JOSHUA LEUCK, JEFFERSON LEVEILLE, MARK LEWIS, SHAWN LEWIS, TODD LIBERYY, RONALD LILJA, JASON M. LIMA, JORGE LINARES, TYRONNE LINDER, STEPHEN L. LITTLE, MICHAEL JAMES LITZ, DOUGLAS LIVELY, PEDRO LIZARDA, JARED LIZOTTE, NEIL ALLEN LOCKMAN, WILLIAM RAY LOGSDON, NICHOLAS LOIZIDES, JASON LONG, PATRICK LONG, JAVIER LOPEZ, JEREMY BLAKE LOPEZ, JON LOPEZ, MICHAEL LOPEZ, RICARDO LOPEZ, ROBERT J. LOPEZ, WILLIAM LOTT, III, DAVID LOUGHMILLER, LE'KENDRICK MONDRELL LOVETT, ROBERT LOVVORN, FRANCISCO YAQUI LOZOYA, TERRY LUCAS, THOMAS MICHAEL LUCAS, WILLIAM G. LUFT, TODD LUKEN, GRAIGREY LUNA, CALEB MICHAEL LUNDAY, SCOTT LUNDY, CHRISTOPHER LUNTZ, ROBERT LUPINSKI, BENJAMIN WILEY LUSK, EDWARD LYONS, MICHAEL MABERRY, MARCUS MACAHILAS, RAFAEL MACHADO, PEDRO MACIAS, JUAN D. MACK, ROBERT MACTAMHAIS, MICHAEL MADIGAN, EDWARD MAHURIEN, CORY MAJOR, MATTHEW MAKSIM, RODNEY MALOTT, JOSHUA CHARLES MANDIA, COURTNEY MANLEY, TRAVIS ANDREW MAPES, KORY MARBLE, DENNY MARCUM, JOHN MARLEY, DAVID CHARLES MARQUEZ, STEVEN A MARQUEZ, RENE MARQUIS, WILLIS MARSH, CHRISTOPHER MARSHALL, CHRISTOPHER MARTIN, JOHN MARTIN, MILDRED MARTIN, NATHAN MARTIN, PATRICK MARTIN, SHAWN MARTIN, GABRIEL JOSEPH MARTINEZ, JAVIER MARTINEZ, SHANANN MARTINEZ, CARLOS M. MARTINEZ JR., ENOCH D. MASSINGALE. (SINGLETON, GERALD)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 16 MULTI-PLAINTIFF ACTIONS. For multi-plaintiff actions in which a remand motion is currently pending, the individual plaintiffs may either: Withdraw the motion to remand within 14 days of the date of this Order, and thereafter be dismissed without prejudice and with the right to file individual complaints in accordance with this Order; or File an objection to this Order, not to exceed two pages, on the docket for their original multi-plaintiff action by October 25, 2019. Any plaintiffs who object will not be severed until the objection is resolved by the Court. For any multi-plaintiff complaints filed after the date of this Order, each plaintiff will be subject to automatic severance and dismissal without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to file a copy of this Order on the master docket for the MDL, and also on the individual docket for each action refiled by a severed plaintiff pursuant to this Order, whether the action is direct filed in this district or transferred here by the Panel. It is the parties' responsibility to review and abide by all orders entered in this MDL. All orders on the master docket for the MDL may be accessed through the CM/ECF system and key orders are available on the Court's public website at http://www.flnd.uscourts.gov/mdl2885. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/15/2019. (Withdraws due by 10/29/2019.) (djb)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Reply memoranda are due by October 17, 2019 and must not exceed 5,000 words. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/10/2019. (djb)
October 10, 2019 Set Deadlines Replies due by 10/17/2019. (djb)
October 9, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #19 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Remand re #17 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand (djb)
October 8, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File re #17 Response in Opposition to Motion, to remand by TODD LAWRENCE, JEFFREY LAWYER, CUONG CONG LE, JAMES COURT LEAVERTON, ROBERTA LEAVERTON, BRUCE LECROY, JACQUES LEDOUX, JOHN LEDOUX, DONTRELL LEE, HONDRA LEE, JUSTIN LEE, KEVIN DEWAYNE LEE, LEONARD LEE, TONY LEGREE, RICHARD LEMKE, ROBERT LEMKE, JOHN EUGENE LENAGHAN, JOSEPH AARON LENTNER, ABEL LEON, STEVEN MATTHEW LEONARD, GREGORY LEROY, DANNY LESTER, JOSHUA LEUCK, JEFFERSON LEVEILLE, MARK LEWIS, SHAWN LEWIS, TODD LIBERYY, RONALD LILJA, JASON M. LIMA, JORGE LINARES, TYRONNE LINDER, STEPHEN L. LITTLE, MICHAEL JAMES LITZ, DOUGLAS LIVELY, PEDRO LIZARDA, JARED LIZOTTE, NEIL ALLEN LOCKMAN, WILLIAM RAY LOGSDON, NICHOLAS LOIZIDES, JASON LONG, PATRICK LONG, JAVIER LOPEZ, JEREMY BLAKE LOPEZ, JON LOPEZ, MICHAEL LOPEZ, RICARDO LOPEZ, ROBERT J. LOPEZ, WILLIAM LOTT, III, DAVID LOUGHMILLER, LE'KENDRICK MONDRELL LOVETT, ROBERT LOVVORN, FRANCISCO YAQUI LOZOYA, TERRY LUCAS, THOMAS MICHAEL LUCAS, WILLIAM G. LUFT, TODD LUKEN, GRAIGREY LUNA, CALEB MICHAEL LUNDAY, SCOTT LUNDY, CHRISTOPHER LUNTZ, ROBERT LUPINSKI, BENJAMIN WILEY LUSK, EDWARD LYONS, MICHAEL MABERRY, MARCUS MACAHILAS, RAFAEL MACHADO, PEDRO MACIAS, JUAN D. MACK, ROBERT MACTAMHAIS, MICHAEL MADIGAN, EDWARD MAHURIEN, CORY MAJOR, MATTHEW MAKSIM, RODNEY MALOTT, JOSHUA CHARLES MANDIA, COURTNEY MANLEY, TRAVIS ANDREW MAPES, KORY MARBLE, DENNY MARCUM, JOHN MARLEY, DAVID CHARLES MARQUEZ, STEVEN A MARQUEZ, RENE MARQUIS, WILLIS MARSH, CHRISTOPHER MARSHALL, CHRISTOPHER MARTIN, JOHN MARTIN, MILDRED MARTIN, NATHAN MARTIN, PATRICK MARTIN, SHAWN MARTIN, GABRIEL JOSEPH MARTINEZ, JAVIER MARTINEZ, SHANANN MARTINEZ, CARLOS M. MARTINEZ JR., ENOCH D. MASSINGALE. (SINGLETON, GERALD)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/25/2019. (djb)
September 25, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court, #17 Response in Opposition to Motion (djb)
September 24, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court [Public Version] filed by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Simon Gottlieb, #2 Exhibits 1-10 [Filed Under Seal], #3 Exhibit 11) (BRANSCOME, KIMBERLY) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/25/2019) (djb). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2019: #4 Response (Sealed)) (djb).
September 24, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (BRANSCOME, KIMBERLY)
September 10, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by TODD LAWRENCE, JEFFREY LAWYER, CUONG CONG LE, JAMES COURT LEAVERTON, ROBERTA LEAVERTON, BRUCE LECROY, JACQUES LEDOUX, JOHN LEDOUX, DONTRELL LEE, HONDRA LEE, JUSTIN LEE, KEVIN DEWAYNE LEE, LEONARD LEE, TONY LEGREE, RICHARD LEMKE, ROBERT LEMKE, JOHN EUGENE LENAGHAN, JOSEPH AARON LENTNER, ABEL LEON, STEVEN MATTHEW LEONARD, GREGORY LEROY, DANNY LESTER, JOSHUA LEUCK, JEFFERSON LEVEILLE, MARK LEWIS, SHAWN LEWIS, TODD LIBERYY, RONALD LILJA, JASON M. LIMA, JORGE LINARES, TYRONNE LINDER, STEPHEN L. LITTLE, MICHAEL JAMES LITZ, DOUGLAS LIVELY, PEDRO LIZARDA, JARED LIZOTTE, NEIL ALLEN LOCKMAN, WILLIAM RAY LOGSDON, NICHOLAS LOIZIDES, JASON LONG, PATRICK LONG, JAVIER LOPEZ, JEREMY BLAKE LOPEZ, JON LOPEZ, MICHAEL LOPEZ, RICARDO LOPEZ, ROBERT J. LOPEZ, WILLIAM LOTT, III, DAVID LOUGHMILLER, LE'KENDRICK MONDRELL LOVETT, ROBERT LOVVORN, FRANCISCO YAQUI LOZOYA, TERRY LUCAS, THOMAS MICHAEL LUCAS, WILLIAM G. LUFT, TODD LUKEN, GRAIGREY LUNA, CALEB MICHAEL LUNDAY, SCOTT LUNDY, CHRISTOPHER LUNTZ, ROBERT LUPINSKI, BENJAMIN WILEY LUSK, EDWARD LYONS, MICHAEL MABERRY, MARCUS MACAHILAS, RAFAEL MACHADO, PEDRO MACIAS, JUAN D. MACK, ROBERT MACTAMHAIS, MICHAEL MADIGAN, EDWARD MAHURIEN, CORY MAJOR, MATTHEW MAKSIM, RODNEY MALOTT, JOSHUA CHARLES MANDIA, COURTNEY MANLEY, TRAVIS ANDREW MAPES, KORY MARBLE, DENNY MARCUM, JOHN MARLEY, DAVID CHARLES MARQUEZ, STEVEN A MARQUEZ, RENE MARQUIS, WILLIS MARSH, CHRISTOPHER MARSHALL, CHRISTOPHER MARTIN, JOHN MARTIN, MILDRED MARTIN, NATHAN MARTIN, PATRICK MARTIN, SHAWN MARTIN, GABRIEL JOSEPH MARTINEZ, JAVIER MARTINEZ, SHANANN MARTINEZ, CARLOS M. MARTINEZ JR., ENOCH D. MASSINGALE. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5) (SINGLETON, GERALD)
September 10, 2019 Set Deadlines re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 9/24/2019.) (sdw)
September 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD B SINGLETON on behalf of All Plaintiffs (SINGLETON, GERALD)
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSIONS AND ELECTRONIC FILING. (djb)
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-02202. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-28) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. 3M Occupational Safety LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Holdings, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Holdings, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo Holding LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Intermediate, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Intermediate, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo Intermediate LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Aearo Holdings, LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC, Aearo Technologies, LLC, Aearo, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-2202 SRN/DTS. (KDS) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Gerald Singleton, Amanda M. LoCurto as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (KDS) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey County, case number 62-cv-19-5270 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7073478) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LAWRENCE v 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEONARD LEE
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMY BLAKE LOPEZ
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAWN MARTIN
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAWN LEWIS
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRY LUCAS
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENJAMIN WILEY LUSK
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID LOUGHMILLER
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD LYONS
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JARED LIZOTTE
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN A MARQUEZ
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT LUNDY
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYRONNE LINDER
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON M. LIMA
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD MAHURIEN
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA LEUCK
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCUS MACAHILAS
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEDRO MACIAS
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH AARON LENTNER
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY LAWYER
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT LOVVORN
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL MADIGAN
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON LONG
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM G. LUFT
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY LEROY
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAFAEL MACHADO
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAVIER MARTINEZ
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANANN MARTINEZ
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM LOTT, III
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLOS M. MARTINEZ JR.
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEIL ALLEN LOCKMAN
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN L. LITTLE
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK LONG
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUCE LECROY
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN MARLEY
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT MACTAMHAIS
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORGE LINARES
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABEL LEON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN MATTHEW LEONARD
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANNY LESTER
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS LOIZIDES
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MILDRED MARTIN
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL JAMES LITZ
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN MARTIN
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CUONG CONG LE
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD LILJA
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK MARTIN
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOUGLAS LIVELY
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONTRELL LEE
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCISCO YAQUI LOZOYA
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN DEWAYNE LEE
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRAIGREY LUNA
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORY MAJOR
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL MABERRY
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICARDO LOPEZ
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL LOPEZ
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD LEMKE
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONY LEGREE
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUAN D. MACK
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER MARSHALL
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAVIER LOPEZ
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID CHARLES MARQUEZ
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS MICHAEL LUCAS
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALEB MICHAEL LUNDAY
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW MAKSIM
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COURTNEY MANLEY
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN LEE
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNY MARCUM
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATHAN MARTIN
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN LEDOUX
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIS MARSH
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN EUGENE LENAGHAN
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT LEMKE
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES COURT LEAVERTON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HONDRA LEE
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK LEWIS
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT LUPINSKI
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KORY MARBLE
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GABRIEL JOSEPH MARTINEZ
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LE'KENDRICK MONDRELL LOVETT
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TODD LAWRENCE
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER MARTIN
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TODD LIBERYY
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENOCH D. MASSINGALE
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JON LOPEZ
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRAVIS ANDREW MAPES
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA CHARLES MANDIA
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFERSON LEVEILLE
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT J. LOPEZ
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER LUNTZ
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODNEY MALOTT
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEDRO LIZARDA
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TODD LUKEN
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACQUES LEDOUX
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM RAY LOGSDON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RENE MARQUIS
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERTA LEAVERTON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLOS M MARTINEZ, JR
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TODD MONROE LIBERTY
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO HOLDING LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Represented By: KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: BENJAMIN W HULSE
Represented By: S Jamal Faleel
Represented By: JERRY W BLACKWELL
Represented By: KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Represented By: BENJAMIN W HULSE
Represented By: S Jamal Faleel
Represented By: JERRY W BLACKWELL
Represented By: KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Represented By: KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Represented By: KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Represented By: KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?