BUFORD et al v 3M COMPANY et al

Plaintiff: KENNETH WEILAND, RYAN ROCKRIVER, RANDY LAWSON, RIQUANTE BROWN, CARNELL BUFORD, DAVID SUMINSKI, SHAUN KELLEY, TROY JOBES, CHARLIE C. SAVANNAH, JUAN SANCHEZ, DUSTIN CLINGMAN, HAROLD DAHMER, GERALD ZUMBUEHL, VINCENT KIMSEY, JESUS GUAB, TCHAD MARSHALL, IRWIN JAMES CHAPMAN, JOSHUA MOMBER, DALE KATHREIN, JULIUS ARNETTE, JUAN WALTON, ANTHONY REED, BILLY CROSS, MORRIS BOOKER, DECASSALYN SANFORD, MORRIS CARRIER, DAVID KENNETH CLARK and TIMOTHY HARTRANFT
Defendant: 3M COMPANY and AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv03236
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION AND ELECTRONIC FILING. (djb)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-02159. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 21, 2019 NOTICE: The case has been transferred/extracted to the Northern District of Florida. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-28) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Aearo Technologies, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-2159 PAM/HB. (MMG) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal,, (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial District, Hennepin County, case number 27-cv-19-12811 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7062749) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) State Court Notice of Judicial Assignment, #3 Exhibit(s) State Affidavit of Service on 3M, #4 Exhibit(s) State Affidavit of Service on Aearo Technologies, #5 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BUFORD et al v 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH WEILAND
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN ROCKRIVER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDY LAWSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RIQUANTE BROWN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARNELL BUFORD
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID SUMINSKI
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAUN KELLEY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TROY JOBES
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLIE C. SAVANNAH
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUAN SANCHEZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUSTIN CLINGMAN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAROLD DAHMER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERALD ZUMBUEHL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VINCENT KIMSEY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESUS GUAB
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TCHAD MARSHALL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRWIN JAMES CHAPMAN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA MOMBER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DALE KATHREIN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIUS ARNETTE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUAN WALTON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY REED
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILLY CROSS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MORRIS BOOKER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DECASSALYN SANFORD
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MORRIS CARRIER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID KENNETH CLARK
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY HARTRANFT
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: BENJAMIN W HULSE
Represented By: JERRY W BLACKWELL
Represented By: S Jamal Faleel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?