GIBSON et al v 3M COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: CECIL GILBERT, DARIUS HART, DEVONTE SHEROD HARRIS, WILL GIECK, ROBERT GLASS, BRICE GRAVEN HARRIS, RANDY GRAVES, TRAVIS GILLILAND, KENNI GRAHAM, PAUL DAVID GIBSON, ROBERT S. HARRISON, HUGHLEY GRATIC, VERNAL HAIRSTON, STEVEN MICHAEL HARDY, JOSEPH GUERRA, EVERETT GILLIAM, TERRENCE HAYES, CHRISTOPHER HARRIS, JOSE PAUL GONZALEZ, MARY GROVE-ARMSTRONG, WILTON BROOKS HARRISON, II, JEFFERY JOSEPH HALEY, ROBERT GILBERT, KENNETH HARRIS, GARY LEE GROSS, ERIK HANSEN, CRAIG HARRISON, RUDY GOTTFRIED, VICTOR M. GUTIERREZ, JR., JASON HANSON, TIAWUAN GOINS, MATTHEW GRIMES, PERRY GILL, TIMOTHY JOSEPH HAGOOD, ROBERT GREEN, EVAN HARTSON, VERNON HAYES, AMBER GROVE, KYLE WILLIAM GRECO, JEFFREY HAWES, JARED GOSS, CHAUNCIE GREER, DAVID HARTSHORN, DAVID LEE HAYNES, DAVID HARRISON, PAUL GRIMM, BRANDON HAMMACK, JAMES HARRIS, JR., SEAN MICHAEL GREEN, EVERETT HAMLEY, RICKY GRUETZMACHER, APOLLO GONZALEZ, WILLIAM GISH, TIMOTHY GROVE, TROY E. GREEN, FRANKLIN KEITH GODFREY, CHRISTOPHER GUFFY, ROBERT MAURICE HARRIS, ROBERT RAMON HARRIS, III, SEQUOIA HARRY, CHRISTOPHER D. HANKINS, ERIC HANSON, COURTNEY GROVES, SHANE GILMORE, BRANDON JOSEPH HAMBLIN, RONALD GRIFFIN, KYLE HATFIELD, CORY HART, MICHAEL GILES, TRAVIS GREGORY, KURT GUILBEAU, KENNETH GREY, RANDALL H. HARDIE, JR., BRADY HADRAVA, CHAD STEVEN HANSEN, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL GRUBBS, BRADLY ALLEN GROUT, KEVIN GODDARD, HEATH GILBIN, ASHER HART, JOSHUA GORDON, CAROLYN HARDWICK, TRAVIS WILLIAM GROFT, DARREN GRANT, SHAUN GILFILLAN, JEAN GRAFALS, MARLON HAWKINS, ANTHONY MORAN HALE, NOAH GILSON, JEFFREY GIBSON, DEVAN GREER, JUAN CARLOS GONZALEZ, BURTON K. HANOHANO, CARLOS GONZALEZ, DENNIS ROCKY HATFIELD and JOHN HARLEAUX
Defendant: AEARO HOLDING LLC, 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC and DOES 1-50
Case Number: 3:2019cv03245
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #23 Plaintiffs' Objections to #21 Pretrial Order No. 16 - Multi-Plaintiff Actions (djb)
October 25, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE by JEFFREY GIBSON, PAUL DAVID GIBSON, WILL GIECK, CECIL GILBERT, ROBERT GILBERT, HEATH GILBIN, MICHAEL GILES, SHAUN GILFILLAN, PERRY GILL, EVERETT GILLIAM, TRAVIS GILLILAND, SHANE GILMORE, NOAH GILSON, WILLIAM GISH, ROBERT GLASS, KEVIN GODDARD, FRANKLIN KEITH GODFREY, TIAWUAN GOINS, APOLLO GONZALEZ, CARLOS GONZALEZ, JOSE PAUL GONZALEZ, JUAN CARLOS GONZALEZ, JOSHUA GORDON, JARED GOSS, RUDY GOTTFRIED, JEAN GRAFALS, KENNI GRAHAM, DARREN GRANT, HUGHLEY GRATIC, RANDY GRAVES, KYLE WILLIAM GRECO, ROBERT GREEN, SEAN MICHAEL GREEN, TROY E. GREEN, CHAUNCIE GREER, DEVAN GREER, TRAVIS GREGORY, KENNETH GREY, RONALD GRIFFIN, MATTHEW GRIMES, PAUL GRIMM, TRAVIS WILLIAM GROFT, GARY LEE GROSS, BRADLY ALLEN GROUT, AMBER GROVE, TIMOTHY GROVE, MARY GROVE-ARMSTRONG, COURTNEY GROVES, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL GRUBBS, RICKY GRUETZMACHER, JOSEPH GUERRA, CHRISTOPHER GUFFY, KURT GUILBEAU, VICTOR M. GUTIERREZ, JR, BRADY HADRAVA, TIMOTHY JOSEPH HAGOOD, VERNAL HAIRSTON, ANTHONY MORAN HALE, JEFFERY JOSEPH HALEY, BRANDON JOSEPH HAMBLIN, EVERETT HAMLEY, BRANDON HAMMACK, CHRISTOPHER D. HANKINS, BURTON K. HANOHANO, CHAD STEVEN HANSEN, ERIK HANSEN, ERIC HANSON, JASON HANSON, RANDALL H. HARDIE, JR, CAROLYN HARDWICK, STEVEN MICHAEL HARDY, JOHN HARLEAUX, BRICE GRAVEN HARRIS, CHRISTOPHER HARRIS, DEVONTE SHEROD HARRIS, JAMES HARRIS, JR, KENNETH HARRIS, ROBERT RAMON HARRIS, III, ROBERT MAURICE HARRIS, CRAIG HARRISON, DAVID HARRISON, ROBERT S. HARRISON, WILTON BROOKS HARRISON, II, SEQUOIA HARRY, ASHER HART, CORY HART, DARIUS HART, DAVID HARTSHORN, EVAN HARTSON, DENNIS ROCKY HATFIELD, KYLE HATFIELD, JEFFREY HAWES, MARLON HAWKINS, TERRENCE HAYES, VERNON HAYES, DAVID LEE HAYNES re #21 Order,,,,,, Set Deadlines,,,,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (SINGLETON, GERALD)
October 18, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #17 Response in Opposition to Motion, #22 Reply to Response to Motion (djb)
October 17, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by JEFFREY GIBSON, PAUL DAVID GIBSON, WILL GIECK, CECIL GILBERT, ROBERT GILBERT, HEATH GILBIN, MICHAEL GILES, SHAUN GILFILLAN, PERRY GILL, EVERETT GILLIAM, TRAVIS GILLILAND, SHANE GILMORE, NOAH GILSON, WILLIAM GISH, ROBERT GLASS, KEVIN GODDARD, FRANKLIN KEITH GODFREY, TIAWUAN GOINS, APOLLO GONZALEZ, CARLOS GONZALEZ, JOSE PAUL GONZALEZ, JUAN CARLOS GONZALEZ, JOSHUA GORDON, JARED GOSS, RUDY GOTTFRIED, JEAN GRAFALS, KENNI GRAHAM, DARREN GRANT, HUGHLEY GRATIC, RANDY GRAVES, KYLE WILLIAM GRECO, ROBERT GREEN, SEAN MICHAEL GREEN, TROY E. GREEN, CHAUNCIE GREER, DEVAN GREER, TRAVIS GREGORY, KENNETH GREY, RONALD GRIFFIN, MATTHEW GRIMES, PAUL GRIMM, TRAVIS WILLIAM GROFT, GARY LEE GROSS, BRADLY ALLEN GROUT, AMBER GROVE, TIMOTHY GROVE, MARY GROVE-ARMSTRONG, COURTNEY GROVES, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL GRUBBS, RICKY GRUETZMACHER, JOSEPH GUERRA, CHRISTOPHER GUFFY, KURT GUILBEAU, VICTOR M. GUTIERREZ, JR, BRADY HADRAVA, TIMOTHY JOSEPH HAGOOD, VERNAL HAIRSTON, ANTHONY MORAN HALE, JEFFERY JOSEPH HALEY, BRANDON JOSEPH HAMBLIN, EVERETT HAMLEY, BRANDON HAMMACK, CHRISTOPHER D. HANKINS, BURTON K. HANOHANO, CHAD STEVEN HANSEN, ERIK HANSEN, ERIC HANSON, JASON HANSON, RANDALL H. HARDIE, JR, CAROLYN HARDWICK, STEVEN MICHAEL HARDY, JOHN HARLEAUX, BRICE GRAVEN HARRIS, CHRISTOPHER HARRIS, DEVONTE SHEROD HARRIS, JAMES HARRIS, JR, KENNETH HARRIS, ROBERT RAMON HARRIS, III, ROBERT MAURICE HARRIS, CRAIG HARRISON, DAVID HARRISON, ROBERT S. HARRISON, WILTON BROOKS HARRISON, II, SEQUOIA HARRY, ASHER HART, CORY HART, DARIUS HART, DAVID HARTSHORN, EVAN HARTSON, DENNIS ROCKY HATFIELD, KYLE HATFIELD, JEFFREY HAWES, MARLON HAWKINS, TERRENCE HAYES, VERNON HAYES, DAVID LEE HAYNES. (SINGLETON, GERALD)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 16 MULTI-PLAINTIFF ACTIONS. For multi-plaintiff actions in which a remand motion is currently pending, the individual plaintiffs may either: Withdraw the motion to remand within 14 days of the date of this Order, and thereafter be dismissed without prejudice and with the right to file individual complaints in accordance with this Order; or File an objection to this Order, not to exceed two pages, on the docket for their original multi-plaintiff action by October 25, 2019. Any plaintiffs who object will not be severed until the objection is resolved by the Court. For any multi-plaintiff complaints filed after the date of this Order, each plaintiff will be subject to automatic severance and dismissal without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to file a copy of this Order on the master docket for the MDL, and also on the individual docket for each action refiled by a severed plaintiff pursuant to this Order, whether the action is direct filed in this district or transferred here by the Panel. It is the parties' responsibility to review and abide by all orders entered in this MDL. All orders on the master docket for the MDL may be accessed through the CM/ECF system and key orders are available on the Court's public website at http://www.flnd.uscourts.gov/mdl2885. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/15/2019. (Withdraws due by 10/29/2019.) (djb)
October 10, 2019 Set Deadlines Replies due by 10/17/2019. (djb)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Reply memoranda are due by October 17, 2019 and must not exceed 5,000 words. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/10/2019. (djb)
October 9, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #19 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Remand re #17 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand (djb)
October 8, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File re #17 Response in Opposition to Motion, to remand by JEFFREY GIBSON, PAUL DAVID GIBSON, WILL GIECK, CECIL GILBERT, ROBERT GILBERT, HEATH GILBIN, MICHAEL GILES, SHAUN GILFILLAN, PERRY GILL, EVERETT GILLIAM, TRAVIS GILLILAND, SHANE GILMORE, NOAH GILSON, WILLIAM GISH, ROBERT GLASS, KEVIN GODDARD, FRANKLIN KEITH GODFREY, TIAWUAN GOINS, APOLLO GONZALEZ, CARLOS GONZALEZ, JOSE PAUL GONZALEZ, JUAN CARLOS GONZALEZ, JOSHUA GORDON, JARED GOSS, RUDY GOTTFRIED, JEAN GRAFALS, KENNI GRAHAM, DARREN GRANT, HUGHLEY GRATIC, RANDY GRAVES, KYLE WILLIAM GRECO, ROBERT GREEN, SEAN MICHAEL GREEN, TROY E. GREEN, CHAUNCIE GREER, DEVAN GREER, TRAVIS GREGORY, KENNETH GREY, RONALD GRIFFIN, MATTHEW GRIMES, PAUL GRIMM, TRAVIS WILLIAM GROFT, GARY LEE GROSS, BRADLY ALLEN GROUT, AMBER GROVE, TIMOTHY GROVE, MARY GROVE-ARMSTRONG, COURTNEY GROVES, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL GRUBBS, RICKY GRUETZMACHER, JOSEPH GUERRA, CHRISTOPHER GUFFY, KURT GUILBEAU, VICTOR M. GUTIERREZ, JR, BRADY HADRAVA, TIMOTHY JOSEPH HAGOOD, VERNAL HAIRSTON, ANTHONY MORAN HALE, JEFFERY JOSEPH HALEY, BRANDON JOSEPH HAMBLIN, EVERETT HAMLEY, BRANDON HAMMACK, CHRISTOPHER D. HANKINS, BURTON K. HANOHANO, CHAD STEVEN HANSEN, ERIK HANSEN, ERIC HANSON, JASON HANSON, RANDALL H. HARDIE, JR, CAROLYN HARDWICK, STEVEN MICHAEL HARDY, JOHN HARLEAUX, BRICE GRAVEN HARRIS, CHRISTOPHER HARRIS, DEVONTE SHEROD HARRIS, JAMES HARRIS, JR, KENNETH HARRIS, ROBERT RAMON HARRIS, III, ROBERT MAURICE HARRIS, CRAIG HARRISON, DAVID HARRISON, ROBERT S. HARRISON, WILTON BROOKS HARRISON, II, SEQUOIA HARRY, ASHER HART, CORY HART, DARIUS HART, DAVID HARTSHORN, EVAN HARTSON, DENNIS ROCKY HATFIELD, KYLE HATFIELD, JEFFREY HAWES, MARLON HAWKINS, TERRENCE HAYES, VERNON HAYES, DAVID LEE HAYNES. (SINGLETON, GERALD)
September 25, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court, #17 Response in Opposition to Motion (djb)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/25/2019. (djb)
September 24, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court [Public Version] filed by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Simon Gottlieb, #2 Exhibits 1-10 [Filed Under Seal], #3 Exhibit 11) (BRANSCOME, KIMBERLY) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/25/2019) (djb). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2019: #4 Response (Sealed)) (djb).
September 24, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (BRANSCOME, KIMBERLY)
September 10, 2019 Set Deadlines re #15 MOTION To Remand To State Court (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 9/24/2019). (MB)
September 10, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by JEFFREY GIBSON, PAUL DAVID GIBSON, WILL GIECK, CECIL GILBERT, ROBERT GILBERT, HEATH GILBIN, MICHAEL GILES, SHAUN GILFILLAN, PERRY GILL, EVERETT GILLIAM, TRAVIS GILLILAND, SHANE GILMORE, NOAH GILSON, WILLIAM GISH, ROBERT GLASS, KEVIN GODDARD, FRANKLIN KEITH GODFREY, TIAWUAN GOINS, APOLLO GONZALEZ, CARLOS GONZALEZ, JOSE PAUL GONZALEZ, JUAN CARLOS GONZALEZ, JOSHUA GORDON, JARED GOSS, RUDY GOTTFRIED, JEAN GRAFALS, KENNI GRAHAM, DARREN GRANT, HUGHLEY GRATIC, RANDY GRAVES, KYLE WILLIAM GRECO, ROBERT GREEN, SEAN MICHAEL GREEN, TROY E. GREEN, CHAUNCIE GREER, DEVAN GREER, TRAVIS GREGORY, KENNETH GREY, RONALD GRIFFIN, MATTHEW GRIMES, PAUL GRIMM, TRAVIS WILLIAM GROFT, GARY LEE GROSS, BRADLY ALLEN GROUT, AMBER GROVE, TIMOTHY GROVE, MARY GROVE-ARMSTRONG, COURTNEY GROVES, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL GRUBBS, RICKY GRUETZMACHER, JOSEPH GUERRA, CHRISTOPHER GUFFY, KURT GUILBEAU, VICTOR M. GUTIERREZ, JR, BRADY HADRAVA, TIMOTHY JOSEPH HAGOOD, VERNAL HAIRSTON, ANTHONY MORAN HALE, JEFFERY JOSEPH HALEY, BRANDON JOSEPH HAMBLIN, EVERETT HAMLEY, BRANDON HAMMACK, CHRISTOPHER D. HANKINS, BURTON K. HANOHANO, CHAD STEVEN HANSEN, ERIK HANSEN, ERIC HANSON, JASON HANSON, RANDALL H. HARDIE, JR, CAROLYN HARDWICK, STEVEN MICHAEL HARDY, JOHN HARLEAUX, BRICE GRAVEN HARRIS, CHRISTOPHER HARRIS, DEVONTE SHEROD HARRIS, JAMES HARRIS, JR, KENNETH HARRIS, ROBERT RAMON HARRIS, III, ROBERT MAURICE HARRIS, CRAIG HARRISON, DAVID HARRISON, ROBERT S. HARRISON, WILTON BROOKS HARRISON, II, SEQUOIA HARRY, ASHER HART, CORY HART, DARIUS HART, DAVID HARTSHORN, EVAN HARTSON, DENNIS ROCKY HATFIELD, KYLE HATFIELD, JEFFREY HAWES, MARLON HAWKINS, TERRENCE HAYES, VERNON HAYES, DAVID LEE HAYNES. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5) (SINGLETON, GERALD)
September 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD B SINGLETON on behalf of All Plaintiffs (SINGLETON, GERALD)
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION AND ELECTRONIC FILING. (djb)
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-02212. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-29) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. 3M Occupational Safety LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Holdings, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Holdings, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo Holding LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Intermediate, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Intermediate, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo Intermediate LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Aearo Holdings, LLC, Aearo Intermediate, LLC, Aearo Technologies, LLC, Aearo, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Gerald Singleton; Amanda M. LoCurto as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 19-cv-2212 (DSD/SER). (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Second Judicial District, Ramsey County, case number 62-cv-19-5264 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7074321) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) State Notice of Service of Process on 3M, #3 Exhibit(s) State Notice of Service of Process on 3M Occupational Safety, #4 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/22/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GIBSON et al v 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CECIL GILBERT
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARIUS HART
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEVONTE SHEROD HARRIS
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILL GIECK
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT GLASS
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRICE GRAVEN HARRIS
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDY GRAVES
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRAVIS GILLILAND
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNI GRAHAM
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL DAVID GIBSON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT S. HARRISON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUGHLEY GRATIC
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VERNAL HAIRSTON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN MICHAEL HARDY
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH GUERRA
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVERETT GILLIAM
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRENCE HAYES
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER HARRIS
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE PAUL GONZALEZ
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY GROVE-ARMSTRONG
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILTON BROOKS HARRISON, II
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFERY JOSEPH HALEY
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT GILBERT
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH HARRIS
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY LEE GROSS
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIK HANSEN
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRAIG HARRISON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUDY GOTTFRIED
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTOR M. GUTIERREZ, JR.
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON HANSON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIAWUAN GOINS
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW GRIMES
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PERRY GILL
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY JOSEPH HAGOOD
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT GREEN
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVAN HARTSON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VERNON HAYES
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMBER GROVE
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KYLE WILLIAM GRECO
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY HAWES
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JARED GOSS
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHAUNCIE GREER
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID HARTSHORN
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID LEE HAYNES
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID HARRISON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL GRIMM
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON HAMMACK
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES HARRIS, JR.
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEAN MICHAEL GREEN
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVERETT HAMLEY
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICKY GRUETZMACHER
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APOLLO GONZALEZ
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM GISH
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY GROVE
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TROY E. GREEN
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANKLIN KEITH GODFREY
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER GUFFY
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT MAURICE HARRIS
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT RAMON HARRIS, III
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEQUOIA HARRY
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER D. HANKINS
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC HANSON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COURTNEY GROVES
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANE GILMORE
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON JOSEPH HAMBLIN
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD GRIFFIN
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KYLE HATFIELD
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORY HART
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL GILES
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRAVIS GREGORY
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KURT GUILBEAU
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH GREY
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDALL H. HARDIE, JR.
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRADY HADRAVA
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHAD STEVEN HANSEN
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL GRUBBS
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRADLY ALLEN GROUT
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN GODDARD
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEATH GILBIN
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHER HART
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA GORDON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROLYN HARDWICK
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRAVIS WILLIAM GROFT
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARREN GRANT
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAUN GILFILLAN
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEAN GRAFALS
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARLON HAWKINS
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY MORAN HALE
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOAH GILSON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY GIBSON
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEVAN GREER
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUAN CARLOS GONZALEZ
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BURTON K. HANOHANO
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLOS GONZALEZ
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS ROCKY HATFIELD
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN HARLEAUX
Represented By: Timothy M Phillips
Represented By: GERALD B SINGLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO HOLDING LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Represented By: KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: BENJAMIN W HULSE
Represented By: S Jamal Faleel
Represented By: JERRY W BLACKWELL
Represented By: KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Represented By: KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Represented By: KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Represented By: KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Represented By: KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?