MCDERMOTT et al v 3M COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: JORY MATHIS, LELAND MARSHALL, CHRIS KELLEY, SCOTT LOVE, JAMES LONG, MARK KIRKLAND, DENNIS KLEYH, JR, FRANK KARLUK, JAMES KING, MATTHEW KEATING, DESHON MASSEY, THOMAS KRISS, MORGAN LERETTE, JAMES KOONCE, MATTHEW MACHUTA, BRIAN MCCAULEY, TEDDY LAWRENCE, JASON KNIGHT, ROBERT KNAPP, DANIEL KING, SPENCER MALTAGLIATI, RAYMOND KOZLOWSKI, JOSEPH MAYFIELD, ROBERT MCCAIN, LISA MAYNES, PHILIP KOUBA, DANIEL LENHARDT, JONATHAN MARLEY, SASCHA MARLOW, JASON LYMAN, SCOTT MCALOON, COLIN MACKAY, ERNESTO MARTINEZ, PETER MARAMAN, ERIC LABONTE, REMINGTON KEEBLE, DANIELLE MANNING, AARON LARSEN, NATHAN LINE, ERIC KLIMASZEWSKI, CHRIS LAWSON, DAVID LANE, KRISTOFER KEMP, KENNETH KEELING, JEFFREY MARTIN, TYLER MARDEN, JOHN KIESEBACH, KEVIN KASAL, THOMAS MCDERMOTT and BRYAN KING
Defendant: 3M COMPANY and AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv03261
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 16 MULTI-PLAINTIFF ACTIONS. All plaintiffs named in any multi-plaintiff complaint currently pending in this MDL, except derivative plaintiffs, will be severed. For multi-plaintiff actions in which no remand motion is currently pending, all plaintiffs, except for the first-named plaintiff, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with the right to refile an individual short form complaint in the approved form, currently available on the master docket for the MDL at ECF No. 705. The Clerk is directed to file a copy of this Order on the master docket for the MDL, and also on the individual docket for each action refiled by a severed plaintiff pursuant to this Order, whether the action is direct filed in this district or transferred here by the Panel. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/15/2019. MATTHEW KEATING, REMINGTON KEEBLE, KENNETH KEELING, CHRIS KELLEY, KRISTOFER KEMP, JOHN KIESEBACH, BRYAN KING, DANIEL KING, JAMES KING, MARK KIRKLAND, DENNIS KLEYH, JR, ERIC KLIMASZEWSKI, ROBERT KNAPP, JASON KNIGHT, JAMES KOONCE, PHILIP KOUBA, RAYMOND KOZLOWSKI, THOMAS KRISS, ERIC LABONTE, DAVID LANE, AARON LARSEN, TEDDY LAWRENCE, CHRIS LAWSON, DANIEL LENHARDT, MORGAN LERETTE, NATHAN LINE, JAMES LONG, SCOTT LOVE, JASON LYMAN, MATTHEW MACHUTA, COLIN MACKAY, SPENCER MALTAGLIATI, DANIELLE MANNING, PETER MARAMAN, TYLER MARDEN, JONATHAN MARLEY, SASCHA MARLOW, LELAND MARSHALL, JEFFREY MARTIN, ERNESTO MARTINEZ, DESHON MASSEY, JORY MATHIS, JOSEPH MAYFIELD, LISA MAYNES, SCOTT MCALOON, ROBERT MCCAIN, BRIAN MCCAULEY, FRANK KARLUK and KEVIN KASAL terminated. (djb)
September 16, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LANIER, KATHRYN)
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by W MARK LANIER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LANIER, W)
September 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by CRISTINA DELISE on behalf of All Plaintiffs (DELISE, CRISTINA)
September 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL A AKSELRUD on behalf of All Plaintiffs (AKSELRUD, MICHAEL)
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by STACY KATHRYN HAUER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (HAUER, STACY)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION AND ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT. (djb)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-02251. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-30) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Aearo Technologies, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing W. Mark Lanier, K. Rachel Lanier, Cristina Delise, Michael Akselrud as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (ACH) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-2251 PJS/TNL. (ACH) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey, case number N/A (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7080015) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCDERMOTT et al v 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORY MATHIS
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LELAND MARSHALL
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRIS KELLEY
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT LOVE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES LONG
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK KIRKLAND
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS KLEYH, JR
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK KARLUK
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES KING
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW KEATING
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DESHON MASSEY
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS KRISS
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MORGAN LERETTE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES KOONCE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW MACHUTA
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN MCCAULEY
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TEDDY LAWRENCE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON KNIGHT
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT KNAPP
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL KING
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPENCER MALTAGLIATI
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAYMOND KOZLOWSKI
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH MAYFIELD
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT MCCAIN
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA MAYNES
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILIP KOUBA
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL LENHARDT
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN MARLEY
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SASCHA MARLOW
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON LYMAN
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT MCALOON
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLIN MACKAY
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERNESTO MARTINEZ
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PETER MARAMAN
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC LABONTE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REMINGTON KEEBLE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIELLE MANNING
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AARON LARSEN
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATHAN LINE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC KLIMASZEWSKI
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRIS LAWSON
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID LANE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISTOFER KEMP
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH KEELING
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY MARTIN
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYLER MARDEN
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN KIESEBACH
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN KASAL
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS MCDERMOTT
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYAN KING
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: BENJAMIN W HULSE
Represented By: JERRY W BLACKWELL
Represented By: S Jamal Faleel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?