HOFFMAN et al v 3M COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: RICHARD FREMONT, MATTHEW SPILLERS, TRACY NESBITT, BRUCE TIMMS, MICHEAL LONG, FRED THURMOND, NATHAN KANE, KEVIN KELLY, CLIFFORD POINDEXTER, PATRICK BROWN, WILLIAM O'KELLEY, JAMES RUDE, LARRY WAYNE, JR, MICHAEL INGERSOLL, DUSTIN BAUMBACH, DAVID FREDERICKS, SCOTT BOWMAN, CHRISTOPHER AYALA, TIMOTHY GOLDSTEIN, STEVEN HIBLER, CHAD RICKARD, DANIEL COX, ERIC BIAS, MICHAEL ANDERSON, BRENT ESCOBEDO, GABRIEL SIERRAS, ADAM CLAYTON, JOHN WATTS, JOSEPH DAVEY, KOWONNO GREENE, JOSHUA BRADFUTE, JOHNNY BERRY, PHILIP COOPER, CHRISTOPHER DOVER, VERNON SHOCKLEY, JOSHUA KESLER, TODD MANES, BLAKE FISHER, JAMES DAWSON, SION HENDERSON, KENNETH FINCH, MICHAEL ALVAREZ, JEREMY ROBERTSON, MARK BREWINGTON, DYLAN ANDERSON, FRAY KELCHNER, MATTHEW PRUITT, GREGORY DAILEY, ALEXANDER HOFFMAN and LOUIS MURRELL
Defendant: 3M COMPANY and AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv03266
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 16 MULTI-PLAINTIFF ACTIONS. All plaintiffs named in any multi-plaintiff complaint currently pending in this MDL, except derivative plaintiffs, will be severed. For multi-plaintiff actions in which no remand motion is currently pending, all plaintiffs, except for the first-named plaintiff, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with the right to refile an individual short form complaint in the approved form, currently available on the master docket for the MDL at ECF No. 705. The Clerk is directed to file a copy of this Order on the master docket for the MDL, and also on the individual docket for each action refiled by a severed plaintiff pursuant to this Order, whether the action is direct filed in this district or transferred here by the Panel. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/15/2019. MICHAEL ANDERSON, CHRISTOPHER AYALA, DUSTIN BAUMBACH, JOHNNY BERRY, ERIC BIAS, SCOTT BOWMAN, JOSHUA BRADFUTE, MARK BREWINGTON, PATRICK BROWN, ADAM CLAYTON, PHILIP COOPER, DANIEL COX, GREGORY DAILEY, JOSEPH DAVEY, JAMES DAWSON, CHRISTOPHER DOVER, BRENT ESCOBEDO, KENNETH FINCH, BLAKE FISHER, DAVID FREDERICKS, RICHARD FREMONT, TIMOTHY GOLDSTEIN, KOWONNO GREENE, SION HENDERSON, STEVEN HIBLER, MICHAEL INGERSOLL, NATHAN KANE, FRAY KELCHNER, KEVIN KELLY, JOSHUA KESLER, MICHEAL LONG, TODD MANES, LOUIS MURRELL, TRACY NESBITT, WILLIAM O'KELLEY, CLIFFORD POINDEXTER, MATTHEW PRUITT, CHAD RICKARD, JEREMY ROBERTSON, JAMES RUDE, VERNON SHOCKLEY, GABRIEL SIERRAS, MATTHEW SPILLERS, FRED THURMOND, BRUCE TIMMS, JOHN WATTS, LARRY WAYNE, JR, MICHAEL ALVAREZ and DYLAN ANDERSON terminated. (djb)
September 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LANIER, KATHRYN)
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by W MARK LANIER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LANIER, W)
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by CRISTINA DELISE on behalf of All Plaintiffs (DELISE, CRISTINA)
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL A AKSELRUD on behalf of All Plaintiffs (AKSELRUD, MICHAEL)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by STACY KATHRYN HAUER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (HAUER, STACY)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-02245. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-30) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Aearo Technologies, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing W. Mark Lanier, K. Rachel Lanier, Cristina Delise, Michael Akselrud as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-2245 PJS/LIB. (CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey, case number N/A (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7079509) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOFFMAN et al v 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD FREMONT
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW SPILLERS
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACY NESBITT
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUCE TIMMS
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHEAL LONG
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRED THURMOND
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATHAN KANE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN KELLY
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLIFFORD POINDEXTER
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK BROWN
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM O'KELLEY
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES RUDE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY WAYNE, JR
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL INGERSOLL
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUSTIN BAUMBACH
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID FREDERICKS
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT BOWMAN
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER AYALA
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY GOLDSTEIN
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN HIBLER
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHAD RICKARD
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL COX
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC BIAS
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL ANDERSON
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENT ESCOBEDO
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GABRIEL SIERRAS
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM CLAYTON
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN WATTS
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH DAVEY
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KOWONNO GREENE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA BRADFUTE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHNNY BERRY
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILIP COOPER
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER DOVER
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VERNON SHOCKLEY
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA KESLER
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TODD MANES
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLAKE FISHER
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES DAWSON
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SION HENDERSON
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH FINCH
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL ALVAREZ
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMY ROBERTSON
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK BREWINGTON
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DYLAN ANDERSON
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRAY KELCHNER
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW PRUITT
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY DAILEY
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXANDER HOFFMAN
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOUIS MURRELL
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: BENJAMIN W HULSE
Represented By: JERRY W BLACKWELL
Represented By: S Jamal Faleel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?