ZIMMERMAN et al v 3M COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: DENVER WILLIAMS, THOMAS MAY, TROY MULLINS, LEWIS TRIVETT, GARY SMITH, GARY LINDEMAN, WILLIAM SEESE, MICHAEL MAROTTA, ESTEBAN ROMERO, HAROLD SCHULER, RICKY MAGGART, STEPHEN MONTOYA, DERRICK LUKE, RICHARD SONNIER, JASON REEVES, DARNELL WILLIAMS, LUIS PISARRA, MALCOLM MCNABB, JAMES LENGELE, STEPHEN REAGAN, CARL RUSSELL, RANDY LOUSHIN, JONATHAN WEST, RICHARD REYES, ANTONIO STURGIS, PHILLIP ZIMMERMAN, IRMON TIPPY, RICHARD LOGAN, TIMOTHY PRAIRIE, ANDREW WILLIAMS, GARY WYNN, AMANDA MOORE, WILLIAM LONGLEY, CHACE SHIVELY, DAVID LOWE, MICHAEL THOMLINSON, CRISTOPHER SOUTHERS, JAMES MEEGAN, JOHN VAUGHN, JOSHUA STAPF, JAMIE LEWIS, DEAN VAZQUEZ, CHRIS QUESENBERRY, SHAWN RHIVES, JACOB MCLEOD, JASON SPROUSE, CHRISTOPHER MOORE, JOSHUA SNEED, MICHAEL MCBRIDE and JEROME PUTNAM
Defendant: 3M COMPANY and AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv03269
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 16 MULTI-PLAINTIFF ACTIONS. All plaintiffs named in any multi-plaintiff complaint currently pending in this MDL, except derivative plaintiffs, will be severed. For multi-plaintiff actions in which no remand motion is currently pending, all plaintiffs, except for the first-named plaintiff, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with the right to refile an individual short form complaint in the approved form, currently available on the master docket for the MDL at ECF No. 705. The Clerk is directed to file a copy of this Order on the master docket for the MDL, and also on the individual docket for each action refiled by a severed plaintiff pursuant to this Order, whether the action is direct filed in this district or transferred here by the Panel. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/15/2019. GARY LINDEMAN, RICHARD LOGAN, WILLIAM LONGLEY, RANDY LOUSHIN, DAVID LOWE, DERRICK LUKE, RICKY MAGGART, MICHAEL MAROTTA, THOMAS MAY, MICHAEL MCBRIDE, JACOB MCLEOD, MALCOLM MCNABB, JAMES MEEGAN, STEPHEN MONTOYA, AMANDA MOORE, CHRISTOPHER MOORE, TROY MULLINS, LUIS PISARRA, TIMOTHY PRAIRIE, JEROME PUTNAM, CHRIS QUESENBERRY, STEPHEN REAGAN, JASON REEVES, RICHARD REYES, SHAWN RHIVES, ESTEBAN ROMERO, CARL RUSSELL, HAROLD SCHULER, WILLIAM SEESE, CHACE SHIVELY, GARY SMITH, JOSHUA SNEED, RICHARD SONNIER, CRISTOPHER SOUTHERS, JASON SPROUSE, JOSHUA STAPF, ANTONIO STURGIS, MICHAEL THOMLINSON, IRMON TIPPY, LEWIS TRIVETT, JOHN VAUGHN, DEAN VAZQUEZ, JONATHAN WEST, ANDREW WILLIAMS, DARNELL WILLIAMS, DENVER WILLIAMS, GARY WYNN, JAMES LENGELE and JAMIE LEWIS terminated. (djb)
September 17, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LANIER, KATHRYN)
September 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by W MARK LANIER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LANIER, W)
September 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by CRISTINA DELISE on behalf of All Plaintiffs (DELISE, CRISTINA)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL A AKSELRUD on behalf of All Plaintiffs (AKSELRUD, MICHAEL)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by STACY KATHRYN HAUER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (HAUER, STACY)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-02241. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-30) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Aearo Technologies, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing W. Mark Lanier; K. Rachal Lanier; Cristina Delise; Michael Akselrud as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 19-cv-2241 (ECT/KMM). (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Second Judicial District, Ramsey County (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7079335) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) State Notice of Service of Process on 3M, #3 Exhibit(s) State Notice of Service of Process on Aearo Technologies, #4 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZIMMERMAN et al v 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENVER WILLIAMS
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS MAY
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TROY MULLINS
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEWIS TRIVETT
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY SMITH
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY LINDEMAN
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM SEESE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL MAROTTA
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTEBAN ROMERO
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAROLD SCHULER
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICKY MAGGART
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN MONTOYA
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DERRICK LUKE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD SONNIER
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON REEVES
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARNELL WILLIAMS
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUIS PISARRA
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MALCOLM MCNABB
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES LENGELE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN REAGAN
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARL RUSSELL
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDY LOUSHIN
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN WEST
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD REYES
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTONIO STURGIS
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILLIP ZIMMERMAN
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRMON TIPPY
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD LOGAN
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY PRAIRIE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW WILLIAMS
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY WYNN
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMANDA MOORE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM LONGLEY
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHACE SHIVELY
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID LOWE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL THOMLINSON
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRISTOPHER SOUTHERS
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES MEEGAN
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN VAUGHN
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA STAPF
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMIE LEWIS
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEAN VAZQUEZ
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRIS QUESENBERRY
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAWN RHIVES
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACOB MCLEOD
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON SPROUSE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER MOORE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA SNEED
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL MCBRIDE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEROME PUTNAM
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: BENJAMIN W HULSE
Represented By: JERRY W BLACKWELL
Represented By: S Jamal Faleel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?