DESPOT et al v 3M COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: ADAM MULVEY, RICHARD BUCHANAN, BRETT NORTON, MICHAEL FRANCE, JASON PERRY, JAMES PHILLIPS, BARACHIAH MACY, RODNEY WEST, SHANE ARMOUR, NATHANIEL JOHNSON, WILLIAM PROSISE, DANIEL RELINSKI, CHRISTOPHER JENNER, JESSE KESLER, MALVON PERCIVAL, SR., PATRICK ELLSWORTH, ODELLE DESPOT, ROGER SPICER, ANDREW MITCHELL, ANGEL SANCHEZ, MATTHEW BRATTON, FABIAN DIZMANG, TODD CARSTENS, SAMUEL SMIGIEL, MICHAEL TODD, JAMES HARTSOCK, BRIAN PALMERSHEIM, DOUGLAS MITCHELL, DAVID DERR, MATTHEW DAVIS, MICHAEL BACON, MARCUS FERGUSON, JEFF TOPLAK, JAMES GILBERT, KIRK PARSONS, JAMES GARNER, DIANA KEELER, THOMAS CARNES, JERRE HURST, ALBERT CLARKE, WILLIAM GREGORY, DANIEL FREEMAN, PHILLIP CAMPO, BENJAMIN STENGEL, TYLER WHEELER, ADRIAN CASTANEDA, MARCEL COOKE, GEOFFREY OAKLEY, ANTONIO SANCHEZ MAGANA and SCOTT WHITE
Defendant: 3M COMPANY and AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv03272
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 16 MULTI-PLAINTIFF ACTIONS. All plaintiffs named in any multi-plaintiff complaint currently pending in this MDL, except derivative plaintiffs, will be severed. For multi-plaintiff actions in which no remand motion is currently pending, all plaintiffs, except for the first-named plaintiff, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with the right to refile an individual short form complaint in the approved form, currently available on the master docket for the MDL at ECF No. 705. The Clerk is directed to file a copy of this Order on the master docket for the MDL, and also on the individual docket for each action refiled by a severed plaintiff pursuant to this Order, whether the action is direct filed in this district or transferred here by the Panel. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/15/2019. MATTHEW BRATTON, RICHARD BUCHANAN, PHILLIP CAMPO, THOMAS CARNES, TODD CARSTENS, ADRIAN CASTANEDA, ALBERT CLARKE, MARCEL COOKE, MATTHEW DAVIS, DAVID DERR, FABIAN DIZMANG, PATRICK ELLSWORTH, MARCUS FERGUSON, MICHAEL FRANCE, DANIEL FREEMAN, JAMES GARNER, JAMES GILBERT, WILLIAM GREGORY, JAMES HARTSOCK, JERRE HURST, CHRISTOPHER JENNER, NATHANIEL JOHNSON, DIANA KEELER, JESSE KESLER, BARACHIAH MACY, ANDREW MITCHELL, DOUGLAS MITCHELL, ADAM MULVEY, BRETT NORTON, GEOFFREY OAKLEY, BRIAN PALMERSHEIM, KIRK PARSONS, MALVON PERCIVAL, SR, JASON PERRY, JAMES PHILLIPS, WILLIAM PROSISE, DANIEL RELINSKI, ANGEL SANCHEZ, ANTONIO SANCHEZ MAGANA, SAMUEL SMIGIEL, ROGER SPICER, BENJAMIN STENGEL, MICHAEL TODD, JEFF TOPLAK, RODNEY WEST, TYLER WHEELER, SCOTT WHITE, SHANE ARMOUR and MICHAEL BACON terminated. (djb)
September 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LANIER, KATHRYN)
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by W MARK LANIER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LANIER, W)
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by CRISTINA DELISE on behalf of All Plaintiffs (DELISE, CRISTINA)
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL A AKSELRUD on behalf of All Plaintiffs (AKSELRUD, MICHAEL)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by STACY KATHRYN HAUER on behalf of All Plaintiffs (HAUER, STACY)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-02236. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-30) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Aearo Technologies, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing W. Mark Lanier; K. Rachal Lanier; Cristina Delise; Michael Akselrud as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 19-cv-2236 (DWF/BRT). (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from MN Second Judicial District, Ramsey County (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7078002) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) Summons to Aearo, #3 Exhibit(s) Notice of Service of Process (3M), #4 Exhibit(s) Notice of Service of Process (Aearo), #5 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/23/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DESPOT et al v 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM MULVEY
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD BUCHANAN
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRETT NORTON
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL FRANCE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON PERRY
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES PHILLIPS
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARACHIAH MACY
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODNEY WEST
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANE ARMOUR
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATHANIEL JOHNSON
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM PROSISE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL RELINSKI
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER JENNER
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSE KESLER
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MALVON PERCIVAL, SR.
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK ELLSWORTH
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ODELLE DESPOT
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROGER SPICER
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW MITCHELL
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGEL SANCHEZ
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW BRATTON
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FABIAN DIZMANG
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TODD CARSTENS
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMUEL SMIGIEL
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL TODD
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES HARTSOCK
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN PALMERSHEIM
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOUGLAS MITCHELL
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID DERR
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW DAVIS
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL BACON
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCUS FERGUSON
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFF TOPLAK
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES GILBERT
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIRK PARSONS
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES GARNER
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANA KEELER
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS CARNES
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERRE HURST
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBERT CLARKE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM GREGORY
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL FREEMAN
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILLIP CAMPO
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENJAMIN STENGEL
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYLER WHEELER
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADRIAN CASTANEDA
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCEL COOKE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEOFFREY OAKLEY
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTONIO SANCHEZ MAGANA
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT WHITE
Represented By: STACY KATHRYN HAUER
Represented By: Jacob R Jagdfeld
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: CRISTINA DELISE
Represented By: KATHRYN RACHEL LANIER
Represented By: MICHAEL A AKSELRUD
Represented By: W MARK LANIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: BENJAMIN W HULSE
Represented By: JERRY W BLACKWELL
Represented By: S Jamal Faleel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?