ALLEN et al v BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: KEYNA SKENANDORE, CHARLES PITTS, ERIKA BANKS, JOY JOHNSON, LOLA HENDERSON, BEVERLY BAILEY, TIMOTHY BRECKENRIDGE, JENNIE SWAILS, SHAWN TOWNS, THERESA TOWNE, RHONDA GRAY, JERRY STEPHENSON, MONA BURWELL, LINDA STOKES, MARVIN GRAY, JR., RICKY FULLER, WILLIAM GALLAGHER, TABATHA RILEY, FRANCISCO ROSADO, MARTHA M. JOHNSON, CYNTHIA CARPENTER, CYNTHIA DRIVER, RUTH MACKINS, JOY BABCOCK, RICHARD SCHOOLS, SANDRA HAVERLAND, KENDRA HUNTER, JAMES MONK, DOROTHY ALLEN, LAURA DEDONATO, MATTHEW JAMISON, MARIA PIMENTEL, BOYD THORSON and JOEL CORTES
Defendant: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD and OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Case Number: 3:2019cv03340
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS LARRY HILL on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (HILL, THOMAS)
October 16, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #29 MOTION for Order to Show Cause re PPFs and SPPFs (djb)
October 16, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Order to Show Cause re PPFs and SPPFs by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Plaintiffs, #2 Exhibit B - Deficiency Letter) (CAMPBELL, MATTHEW)
October 15, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #18 Notice of Filing Attorney Certification by Martha M. Johnson, #24 Notice of Filing Attorney Certification by Shawn Towns, #8 Notice of Filing Attorney Certification by Charles Pitts, #14 Notice of Filing Attorney Certification by Kendra Hunter, #16 Notice of Filing Attorney Certification by Linda Stokes, #19 Notice of Filing Attorney Certification by Marvin Gray, Jr., #21 Notice of Filing Attorney Certification by Mona Burwell, #17 Notice of Filing Attorney Certification by Lola Henderson, #11 Notice of Filing Attorney Certification by Jennie Swails, #23 Notice of Filing Attorney Certification by Sandra Haverland, #7 Notice of Filing Attorney Certification by Boyd Thorson, #20 Notice of Filing Attorney Certification by Matthew Jamison, #9 Notice of Filing Attorney Certification by Dorothy Allen, #15 Notice of Filing Attorney Certification by Kenya Skenandore, #12 Notice of Filing Attorney Certification by Jerry Stephenson, #22 Notice of Filing Attorney Certification by Ruth Mackins, #25 Notice of Filing Attorney Certification Tabatha Riley, #10 Notice of Filing Attorney Certification by James Monk, #13 Notice of Filing Attorney Certification by Joy Johnson, #6 Notice of Filing Attorney Certification by Beverly Bailey (djb)
October 14, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER R LIAKOS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
October 11, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #27 MOTION for Order to Show Cause re Certifications (djb)
October 10, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Order to Show Cause re Certifications by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Plaintiffs, #2 Exhibit B - Deficiency Letter) (CAMPBELL, MATTHEW)
October 9, 2019 Filing 26 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Attorney Jennifer Liakos - Please enter a notice of appearance on behalf of plaintiffs re: Certifications filed 10/8/2019 re: docket entries #6 through #25 . (djb)
October 8, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by TABATHA RILEY (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
October 8, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by SHAWN TOWNS (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
October 8, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by SANDRA HAVERLAND (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
October 8, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by RUTH MACKINS (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
October 8, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by MONA BURWELL (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
October 8, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by MATTHEW JAMISON (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
October 8, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by MARVIN GRAY, JR (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
October 8, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by MARTHA M. JOHNSON (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
October 8, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by LOLA HENDERSON (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
October 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by LINDA STOKES (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
October 8, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by KEYNA SKENANDORE (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
October 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by KENDRA HUNTER (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
October 8, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by JOY JOHNSON (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by JERRY STEPHENSON (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by JENNIE SWAILS (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by JAMES MONK (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by DOROTHY ALLEN (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by CHARLES PITTS (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by BOYD THORSON (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by BEVERLY BAILEY (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION. (djb)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:19-cv-01531. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 29, 2019 Case transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-27). Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 8/27/2019. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01531-RGA, 1:19-cv-01532-RGA, 1:19-cv-01533-RGA, 1:19-cv-01534-RGA (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]
August 16, 2019 No Summons Issued. (mal) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc., Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2710165.) - filed by Shawn Towns, Kendra Hunter, Boyd Thorson, Ricky Fuller, Erika Banks, Laura Dedonato, Dorothy Allen, Keyna Skenandore, Marvin Gray, Jr, Rhonda Gray, Jerry Stephenson, Jennie Swails, Linda Stokes, Tabatha Riley, Lola Henderson, Matthew Jamison, Mona Burwell, Richard Schools, Cynthia Carpenter, William Gallagher, Theresa Towne, Sandra Haverland, Joy Johnson, Joy Babcock, Timothy Breckenridge, Francisco Rosado, Ruth Mackins, Joel Cortes, Charles Pitts, Martha M. Johnson, Maria Pimentel, Cynthia Driver, James Monk, Beverly Bailey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALLEN et al v BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEYNA SKENANDORE
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES PITTS
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIKA BANKS
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOY JOHNSON
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOLA HENDERSON
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEVERLY BAILEY
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY BRECKENRIDGE
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIE SWAILS
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAWN TOWNS
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THERESA TOWNE
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RHONDA GRAY
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERRY STEPHENSON
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONA BURWELL
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA STOKES
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARVIN GRAY, JR.
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICKY FULLER
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM GALLAGHER
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TABATHA RILEY
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCISCO ROSADO
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTHA M. JOHNSON
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CYNTHIA CARPENTER
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CYNTHIA DRIVER
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUTH MACKINS
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOY BABCOCK
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD SCHOOLS
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA HAVERLAND
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENDRA HUNTER
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES MONK
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOROTHY ALLEN
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURA DEDONATO
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW JAMISON
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA PIMENTEL
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOYD THORSON
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOEL CORTES
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By: THOMAS LARRY HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Represented By: MATTHEW ALAN CAMPBELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Represented By: MATTHEW ALAN CAMPBELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?