ARAGON et al v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: WILLIAM O'BRIEN, MICHELLE BARBEE, JOE ARAGON, STEVE EHNES, DEBRA SMITH, MABLE WILLIANS, KATHIE SUPER, ANTHONY IPPOLITO, DEBORAH WIETING, MARK YOUNGBLOOD and SUSAN WRIGHT
Defendant: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC and OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Case Number: 3:2019cv03341
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS LARRY HILL on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (HILL, THOMAS)
October 16, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #14 MOTION for Order to Show Cause re PPFs and SPPFs (djb)
October 16, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Order to Show Cause re PPFs and SPPFs by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Plaintiffs, #2 Exhibit B - Deficiency Letter) (CAMPBELL, MATTHEW)
October 15, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #9 Notice of Attorney Certification by Joe Aragon, #10 Notice of Attorney Certification by Michelle Barbee, #7 Notice of Attorney Certification by Deborah Wieting, #6 Notice of Attorney Certification by Anthony Ippolito, #8 Notice of Attorney Certification by Debra Smith (djb)
October 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER R LIAKOS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
October 11, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #12 MOTION for Order to Show Cause re Certifications (djb)
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Order to Show Cause re Certifications by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Plaintiffs, #2 Exhibit B - Deficiency Letter) (CAMPBELL, MATTHEW)
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Attorney Jennifer Liakos - Please enter a notice of appearance on behalf of plaintiffs re: Certifications filed 10/8/2019 re: docket entries #6 through #10 . (djb)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by MICHELLE BARBEE (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by JOE ARAGON (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by DEBRA SMITH (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by DEBORAH WIETING (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by ANTHONY IPPOLITO (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION. (djb)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:19-cv-01532. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 29, 2019 Case transferred to United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-27). Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 8/27/2019. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01531-RGA, 1:19-cv-01532-RGA, 1:19-cv-01533-RGA, 1:19-cv-01534-RGA (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]
August 16, 2019 No Summons Issued. (amf) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc., and Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2710182) - filed by Debra Smith, Mark Youngblood, Michelle Barbee, Anthony Ippolito, William O'Brien, Mable Willians, Deborah Wieting, Joe Aragon, Susan Wright, Kathie Super, and Steve Ehnes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ARAGON et al v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By: THOMAS LARRY HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Represented By: MATTHEW ALAN CAMPBELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Represented By: MATTHEW ALAN CAMPBELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM O'BRIEN
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELLE BARBEE
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOE ARAGON
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVE EHNES
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBRA SMITH
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MABLE WILLIANS
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHIE SUPER
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY IPPOLITO
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH WIETING
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK YOUNGBLOOD
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN WRIGHT
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?