BLACKWOOD et al v BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: BECKY FULCHER, JOSEPH BROWN, TIMOTHY OSHEFSKY, LINDA NEUGEBAUER, ANGELA YOUNG, BLAKE DINGER, JOSEPH GATES GOZA, PATRICK MARTIN, WILLIAM OURADNIK, JAMES BROWN, JASON BROWN, MUHSEN HASSAN, NORMA NIEVES, DONNA JOHNSON-POTEAT, SHARON CALHOUN, LATONYA CHRISTIAN, CALVIN ORTIZ ECHOLS, VERA GIVENS, JAMES MCGRUDER, DEMETRIA MATHIS, LEAVON HAIRE, HOPE PEREA, ANGELA M. JOHNSON, DENNIS BRODEUR, KENNETH BLACKWOOD, SHAWN PARKER, JOETTA PALMER, FATRAL GIBSON, TRENA CLARK, JOHNNIE SWEETEN, ELDRIDGE HENDERSON, CHRISTINE LOWERY and CHRISTINE GAGNE
Defendant: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD and OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Case Number: 3:2019cv03342
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS LARRY HILL on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (HILL, THOMAS)
October 16, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #15 MOTION for Order to Show Cause re PPFs and SPPFs (djb)
October 16, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Order to Show Cause re PPFs and SPPFs by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Plaintiffs, #2 Exhibit B - Deficiency Letter) (CAMPBELL, MATTHEW)
October 15, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #6 Notice of Filing Attorney Certification by Angela M. Johnson, #8 Notice of Filing Attorney Certification by Fatral Gibson, #9 Notice of Filing Attorney Certification by Hope Perea, #7 Notice of Filing Attorney Certification by Christine Lowery, #11 Notice of Filing Attorney Certification by Vera Givens, #10 Notice of Filing Attorney Certification by Kenneth Blackwood (djb)
October 14, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER R LIAKOS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
October 11, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #13 MOTION for Order to Show Cause re Certifications (djb)
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Order to Show Cause re Certifications by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Plaintiffs, #2 Exhibit B - Deficiency Letter) (CAMPBELL, MATTHEW)
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Attorney Jennifer Liakos - Please enter a notice of appearance on behalf of plaintiffs re: Certifications filed 10/8/2019 re: docket entries #6 through #11 . (djb)
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by VERA GIVENS (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by KENNETH BLACKWOOD (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by HOPE PEREA (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by FATRAL GIBSON (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by CHRISTINE LOWERY (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by ANGELA M. JOHNSON (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION. (djb)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:19-cv-01533. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 29, 2019 Case transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-27). Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 8/27/2019. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01531-RGA, 1:19-cv-01532-RGA, 1:19-cv-01533-RGA, 1:19-cv-01534-RGA (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]
August 16, 2019 No Summons Issued. (amf) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc., and Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2710182) - filed by Eldridge Henderson, Johnnie Sweeten, Christine Gagne, Jason Brown, Blake Dinger, Kenneth Blackwood, William Ouradnik, Vera Givens, Joseph Gates Goza, Joetta Palmer, Hope Perea, Shawn Parker, Norma Nieves, Muhsen Hassan, Angela M. Johnson, Sharon Calhoun, Timothy Oshefsky, Latonya Christian, Fatral Gibson, Angela Young, Leavon Haire, Christine Lowery, Dennis Brodeur, Calvin Ortiz Echols, Joseph Brown, Patrick Martin, Trena Clark, Linda Neugebauer, Donna Johnson-Poteat, James McGruder, Becky Fulcher, Demetria Mathis, and James Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BLACKWOOD et al v BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BECKY FULCHER
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH BROWN
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY OSHEFSKY
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA NEUGEBAUER
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA YOUNG
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLAKE DINGER
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH GATES GOZA
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK MARTIN
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM OURADNIK
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES BROWN
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON BROWN
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MUHSEN HASSAN
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORMA NIEVES
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNA JOHNSON-POTEAT
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON CALHOUN
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LATONYA CHRISTIAN
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALVIN ORTIZ ECHOLS
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VERA GIVENS
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES MCGRUDER
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEMETRIA MATHIS
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEAVON HAIRE
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOPE PEREA
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA M. JOHNSON
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS BRODEUR
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH BLACKWOOD
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAWN PARKER
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOETTA PALMER
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FATRAL GIBSON
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRENA CLARK
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHNNIE SWEETEN
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELDRIDGE HENDERSON
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINE LOWERY
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINE GAGNE
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By: THOMAS LARRY HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Represented By: MATTHEW ALAN CAMPBELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Represented By: MATTHEW ALAN CAMPBELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?