HERBRAND et al v BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: PAUL CURLEE, SR., JENNA FERRIS, ROBERT REARDON, ALICIA SPITZ, JOHN MOAK, ADA DROE, JOHN GOLEMBA, JOHN MUCCIO, MARILYN ROWE, MOERIO ZEIGLER, DEVLYN ASBERRY, ANDREW JOLICOEUR, TORRENNA MACCONNEL, DANIEL HANKARD, BETTY CORBETT, LAURA ALVARADO, ASHLEY LOVELL, KERRI SULLIVAN, KERI SIMMERER, LAURA DILTZ, KATIE HERBRAND and DEBBIE SANCHEZ
Defendant: OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY and OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Case Number: 3:2019cv03343
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS LARRY HILL on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (HILL, THOMAS)
October 16, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #8 MOTION for Order to Show Cause re PPFs and SPPFs (djb)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Order to Show Cause re PPFs and SPPFs by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Plaintiffs, #2 Exhibit B - Deficiency Letter) (CAMPBELL, MATTHEW)
October 3, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #6 Attorney Certification for February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process (djb)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by BEHRAM V PAREKH on behalf of LAURA ALVARADO, DEVLYN ASBERRY, BETTY CORBETT, PAUL CURLEE, SR, LAURA DILTZ, ADA DROE, JENNA FERRIS, JOHN GOLEMBA, DANIEL HANKARD, KATIE HERBRAND, ANDREW JOLICOEUR, ASHLEY LOVELL, TORRENNA MACCONNEL, JOHN MOAK, JOHN MUCCIO, ROBERT REARDON, MARILYN ROWE, DEBBIE SANCHEZ, KERI SIMMERER, ALICIA SPITZ, KERRI SULLIVAN, MOERIO ZEIGLER (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of ATTORNEY CERTIFICATION FOR FEBRUARY 25, 2019 ORDER REGARDING CASE REVIEW PROCESS by DEVLYN ASBERRY, BETTY CORBETT, PAUL CURLEE, SR, LAURA DILTZ, ADA DROE, JENNA FERRIS, JOHN GOLEMBA, DANIEL HANKARD, KATIE HERBRAND, ANDREW JOLICOEUR, ASHLEY LOVELL, TORRENNA MACCONNEL, JOHN MOAK, JOHN MUCCIO, ROBERT REARDON, MARILYN ROWE, DEBBIE SANCHEZ, KERI SIMMERER, ALICIA SPITZ, KERRI SULLIVAN, MOERIO ZEIGLER (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION. (djb)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:19-cv-01534. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 29, 2019 Case transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-27). Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 8/27/2019. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01531-RGA, 1:19-cv-01532-RGA, 1:19-cv-01533-RGA, 1:19-cv-01534-RGA (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]
August 16, 2019 No Summons Issued. (lak) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc., Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2710184.) - filed by Kerri Sullivan, Jenna Ferris, Betty Corbett, Laura Diltz, Marilyn Rowe, Devlyn Asberry, Katie Herbrand, Debbie Sanchez, Ashley Lovell, Keri Simmerer, John Golemba, Andrew Jolicoeur, Paul Curlee, Sr, John Muccio, Alicia Spitz, Daniel Hankard, Robert Reardon, Laura Alvarado, Moerio Zeigler, Torrenna Macconnel, Ada Droe, John Moak. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HERBRAND et al v BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL CURLEE, SR.
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNA FERRIS
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT REARDON
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALICIA SPITZ
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN MOAK
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADA DROE
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN GOLEMBA
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN MUCCIO
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARILYN ROWE
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOERIO ZEIGLER
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEVLYN ASBERRY
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW JOLICOEUR
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TORRENNA MACCONNEL
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL HANKARD
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETTY CORBETT
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURA ALVARADO
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHLEY LOVELL
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KERRI SULLIVAN
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KERI SIMMERER
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURA DILTZ
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATIE HERBRAND
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBBIE SANCHEZ
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Represented By: MATTHEW ALAN CAMPBELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By: THOMAS LARRY HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Represented By: MATTHEW ALAN CAMPBELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?