BICK v BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Plaintiff: NATHAN BICK
Defendant: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2019cv03366
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS LARRY HILL on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (HILL, THOMAS)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Mailed plaintiff Letter of Transfer and Orders 1131,1135,1136 1137,1138 from 3:16md2734. (djb)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Michigan Western; Case Number 1:19-cv-00602. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 30, 2019 CASE ELECTRONICALLY TRANSFERRED to Northern District of Florida (clw) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 8/30/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Copy of Conditional Transfer Order (Certified) #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Nathan Bick (clw) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 8/30/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; certified copy received from Northern District of Florida; case transferred to Northern District of Florida under MDL No. 2734, IN RE: ABILIFY (ARIPIPRAZOLE) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (clw) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 8/30/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 COPY of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directed to the Northern District of Florida regarding case to be transferred to the Multidistrict Litigation Panel under MDL No. 2734, IN RE: ABILIFY (ARIPIPRAZOLE) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (clw) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 8/30/2019.]
July 30, 2019 Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Nathan Bick (mg) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 8/30/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 8/30/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #2 sent via U.S. Mail to Nathan Bick (mg) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 8/30/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of receipt of case (mg) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 8/30/2019.]
July 25, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Bristol-Myers Squibb and returned to plaintiff at counter (mg) Modified text on 7/26/2019 (mg). [Transferred from Michigan Western on 8/30/2019.]
July 25, 2019 RECEIPT: in the amount of $400, receipt number KZ003903; for Filing fee (mg) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 8/30/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bristol-Myers Squibb filed by Nathan Bick (mg) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 8/30/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BICK v BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By: THOMAS LARRY HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATHAN BICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?